Ben Piazza et al v. CBS Broadcasting Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Kenneth Latka, Leslie Nourse, Nancy Perry, Vicki Kaufman, Peter Mallard, Marc Beruti, Kevin Bellotti, Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Roberto Bosio, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Ron Nugent, Joel Binger, Sharon O'Daniel, Julian Salas, Frederick Smith, -, Richard Labgold, Linda Russ, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Dave Golba, Wayne Getchell, Tracy Lawrence, Denise Stones, Ben Piazza, Frederick Smith and Sharon ODaniel
Defendant: Television City Services, LLC, Television City Studios, LLC, Hackman Capital Partners, LLC, CBS Broadcasting Inc., Michael Hackman & Associates, Television City Productions, LLC, Michael Hackman and Associates and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv02920
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 6, 2020 Filing 16 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Plaintiffs Jerilynne Akutagawa, Kevin Bellotti, Marc Beruti, Joel Binger, Roberto Bosio, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell, Dave Golba, Vicki Kaufman, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Tracy Lawrence, Jody Lawrence-Miller, Peter Mallard, Edward Nelson, Leslie Nourse, Ron Nugent, Sharon ODaniel, Nancy Perry, Ben Piazza, Linda Russ, Julian Salas, Frederick Smith, Denise Stones, Jimmy Velarde.. (Kreger, Wayne)
April 6, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiffs Jerilynne Akutagawa, Kevin Bellotti, Marc Beruti, Joel Binger, Roberto Bosio, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell, Dave Golba, Vicki Kaufman, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Tracy Lawrence, Jody Lawrence-Miller, Peter Mallard, Edward Nelson, Leslie Nourse, Ron Nugent, Sharon ODaniel, Nancy Perry, Ben Piazza, Linda Russ, Julian Salas, Frederick Smith, Denise Stones, Jimmy Velarde (Kreger, Wayne)
April 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer GRANTING Joint Stipulation Regarding Response to First Amended Complaint, Motion to Dismiss, and Motion for Sanctions #13 . (SEE ORDER FOR SPECIFICS). (jp)
April 3, 2020 Filing 13 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Michael Hackman and Associates answer now due 5/1/2020; Television City Productions, LLC answer now due 5/1/2020; Television City Studios, LLC answer now due 5/1/2020; Television City Services, LLC answer now due 5/1/2020; Hackman Capital Partners, LLC answer now due 5/1/2020, filed by Defendants Michael Hackman and Associates ; Television City Productions, LLC; Television City Studios, LLC; Television City Services, LLC; Hackman Capital Partners, LLC.(Bu, Lily)
April 3, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Stepanie P. Priel (Supplemental) re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Supplemental Declaration of Stephanie P. Priel)(Priel, Stephanie)
April 2, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response to First Amended Complaint and Regarding Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Sanctions filed by Defendants Hackman Capital Partners, LLC, Michael Hackman and Associates, Television City Productions, LLC, Television City Services, LLC, Television City Studios, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order, #2 Declaration of Lily Bu In Support of Joint Stipulation)(Attorney Lily Bu added to party Hackman Capital Partners, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lily Bu added to party Michael Hackman and Associates (pty:dft), Attorney Lily Bu added to party Television City Productions, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lily Bu added to party Television City Services, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Lily Bu added to party Television City Studios, LLC(pty:dft))(Bu, Lily)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:19-cv-08423 DSF(ASx). Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to Judge Dale S. Fischer for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-02920 DSF(ASx). Signed by Judge Dale S. Fischer (rn)
March 31, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
March 31, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
March 30, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc., re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,, #1 served on 03/30/2020. (Priel, Stephanie)
March 30, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Co-Defendants' Consent to Removal filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc.. (Priel, Stephanie)
March 27, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to First Amended Complaint, filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc. (SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Linda Russ, Joel Binger, Ben Piazza, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Leslie Nourse, Marc Beruti, Sharon ODaniel, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Peter Mallard, Frederick Smith, Vicki Kaufman, Roberto Bosio, Tracy Lawrence, Nancy Perry, Kevin Bellotti, Dave Golba, Julian Salas, Denise Stones, Ron Nugent, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell, upon Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc. served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Linda Russ, Joel Binger, Ben Piazza, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Leslie Nourse, Marc Beruti, Sharon ODaniel, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Peter Mallard, Frederick Smith, Vicki Kaufman, Roberto Bosio, Tracy Lawrence, Nancy Perry, Kevin Bellotti, Dave Golba, Julian Salas, Denise Stones, Ron Nugent, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell, upon Defendant Michael Hackman and Associates served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/312020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Linda Russ, Joel Binger, Ben Piazza, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Leslie Nourse, Marc Beruti, Sharon ODaniel, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Peter Mallard, Frederick Smith, Vicki Kaufman, Roberto Bosio, Tracy Lawrence, Nancy Perry, Kevin Bellotti, Dave Golba, Julian Salas, Denise Stones, Ron Nugent, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell, upon Defendant Television City Productions, LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Linda Russ, Joel Binger, Ben Piazza, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Leslie Nourse, Marc Beruti, Sharon ODaniel, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Peter Mallard, Frederick Smith, Vicki Kaufman, Roberto Bosio, Tracy Lawrence, Nancy Perry, Kevin Bellotti, Dave Golba, Julian Salas, Denise Stones, Ron Nugent, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell, upon Defendant Television City Services, LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Linda Russ, Joel Binger, Ben Piazza, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Leslie Nourse, Marc Beruti, Sharon ODaniel, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Peter Mallard, Frederick Smith, Vicki Kaufman, Roberto Bosio, Tracy Lawrence, Nancy Perry, Kevin Bellotti, Dave Golba, Julian Salas, Denise Stones, Ron Nugent, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell, upon Defendant Television City Studios, LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Linda Russ, Joel Binger, Ben Piazza, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Leslie Nourse, Marc Beruti, Sharon ODaniel, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Peter Mallard, Frederick Smith, Vicki Kaufman, Roberto Bosio, Tracy Lawrence, Nancy Perry, Kevin Bellotti, Dave Golba, Julian Salas, Denise Stones, Ron Nugent, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell, upon Defendant Hackman Capital Partners, LLC served on 1/28/2020, answer due 2/18/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Daisy Montenegro, Authorized Agent for Service of Process in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/31/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants CBS Broadcasting Inc., Hackman Capital Partners, LLC, Michael Hackman and Associates, Television City Productions, LLC, Television City Services, LLC, Television City Studios, LLC amending Complaint - (Discovery),,,, filed by Plaintiffs Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Linda Russ, Joel Binger, Ben Piazza, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Leslie Nourse, Marc Beruti, Sharon ODaniel, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Peter Mallard, Frederick Smith, Vicki Kaufman, Roberto Bosio, Tracy Lawrence, Nancy Perry, Kevin Bellotti, Dave Golba, Julian Salas, Denise Stones, Ron Nugent, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 1/27/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 )(lh)
March 27, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CBS Broadcasting Inc., Does, Hackman Capital Partners, LLC, Michael Hackman and Associates, Television City Productions, LLC, Television City Services, LLC, Television City Studios, LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by Plaintiffs Jody Lawrence-Miller, Edward Nelson, Linda Russ, Joel Binger, Ben Piazza, Jerilynne Akutagawa, Leslie Nourse, Marc Beruti, Sharon ODaniel, Richard Labgold, Kenneth Latka, Peter Mallard, Frederick Smith, Vicki Kaufman, Roberto Bosio, Tracy Lawrence, Nancy Perry, Kevin Bellotti, Dave Golba, Julian Salas, Denise Stones, Ron Nugent, Jimmy Velarde, Barbra Cimo, Wayne Getchell. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 11/27/2019 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
March 27, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc.. Related Case(s): Brian Bagwell v. CBS Corporation, 2:19-cv- 08423-DFS-AS (Priel, Stephanie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc., (Priel, Stephanie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc. identifying ViacomCBS Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Priel, Stephanie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc.. (Priel, Stephanie)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 19STCV42511 Receipt No: ACACDC-25890149 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - Court Order Re Complex Case Designation, #3 Exhibit C - Plaintiff Motion for Peremptory Challenge, #4 Exhibit D - Court Order Re Peremptory Challenge, #5 Exhibit E - First Amended Complaint, #6 Exhibit F - Proofs of Service Re: Television City Studios, LLC, Television City Services, LLC, Television City Productions, LLC, Michael Hackman & Associates, and Hackman Capital Partners, LCC, #7 Exhibit G - Proof of Service Re: CBS Broadcasting, Inc., #8 Exhibit H - Court Order Setting Initial Status Conference, #9 Exhibit I - Email Re: Accepting Service, #10 Exhibit J - Robinson Application for Pro Hac Vice, #11 Exhibit K - Stipulation and Order Continuing Initial Status Conference, #12 Exhibit L - Court Order Continuing Initial Status Conference, #13 Exhibit M - Plaintiff Status Conference Report, #14 Exhibit N - Notice of Appearance of Catherine Conway and Lily Bu, #15 Exhibit O - Notice of Appearance of Stephanie Priel and Lara Grines, #16 Exhibit P - CBS Broadcasting Inc.'s Answer to First Amended Complaint, #17 Declaration of Blair J. Robinson in Support of Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc.'s Notice of Removal, #18 Declaration of Kevin Oldis in Support of Defendant CBS Broadcasting Inc.'s Notice of Removal) (Attorney Stephanie P Priel added to party CBS Broadcasting Inc.(pty:dft))(Priel, Stephanie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ben Piazza et al v. CBS Broadcasting Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Latka
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leslie Nourse
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Perry
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Kaufman
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Peter Mallard
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Beruti
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Bellotti
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jody Lawrence-Miller
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward Nelson
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roberto Bosio
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jerilynne Akutagawa
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ron Nugent
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joel Binger
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon O'Daniel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Julian Salas
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Smith, -
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Labgold
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Russ
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jimmy Velarde
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Barbra Cimo
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dave Golba
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wayne Getchell
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tracy Lawrence
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Denise Stones
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ben Piazza
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frederick Smith
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sharon ODaniel
Represented By: Wayne S Kreger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Television City Services, LLC
Represented By: Catherine A Conway
Represented By: Lily Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Television City Studios, LLC
Represented By: Catherine A Conway
Represented By: Lily Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hackman Capital Partners, LLC
Represented By: Catherine A Conway
Represented By: Lily Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Broadcasting Inc.
Represented By: Stephanie P Priel
Represented By: Blair J Robinson
Represented By: Lara A Grines
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hackman & Associates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Television City Productions, LLC
Represented By: Catherine A Conway
Represented By: Lily Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Hackman and Associates
Represented By: Catherine A Conway
Represented By: Lily Bu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?