Produce Alliance, LLC v. West Central Produce, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Produce Alliance, LLC
Defendant: Michael Perry Dodo, West Central Produce, Inc. and Jamie Purcell
Case Number: 2:2020cv02921
Filed: March 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 11, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE Notice of Consent Order Relating to Establishing a PACA Trust Claims Procedure and Granting Related Relief, Without Prejudice filed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Golubow, Richard)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #22 Non-Resident Attorney Louis William Diess, III APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC, designating Richard H Golubow as local counsel. (bm)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #21 Non-Resident Attorney Kate Ellis APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC, designating Richard H Golubow as local counsel. (bm)
May 6, 2020 Filing 22 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Louis William Diess, III to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26350709) filed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Golubow, Richard)
May 6, 2020 Filing 21 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kate Ellis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26350517) filed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Golubow, Richard)
May 4, 2020 Filing 20 Verification of Service List for Potential PACA Creditor Claims re: Order #13 (Haberbush, David)
May 1, 2020 Filing 19 DECLARATION OF SERVICE filed by Defendants Michael Perry Dodo, Jamie Purcell, West Central Produce, Inc., re Order #13 served on May 1, 2020. (Haberbush, David)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #16 Non-Resident Attorney Bruce W Akerly APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants West Central Produce Inc., Michael Perry Dodo, and Jamie Purcell, designating David R Haberbush as local counsel. (bm)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Carrie R McNair APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants West Central Produce Inc., Michael Perry Dodo, and Jamie Purcell, designating David R Haberbush as local counsel. (bm)
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Bruce W. Akerly to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Michael Perry Dodo, Jamie Purcell, West Central Produce, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. BCACDC-26288367) filed by Defendants Michael Perry Dodo, Jamie Purcell, West Central Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Haberbush, David)
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Carrie R. McNair to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Michael Perry Dodo, Jamie Purcell, West Central Produce, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26288176) filed by Defendants Michael Perry Dodo, Jamie Purcell, West Central Produce, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order (Proposed) Order on Application of Non-Resident Attorney to Appear in a Specific Case Pro Hac Vice) (Haberbush, David)
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David Richard Haberbush counsel for Defendants Michael Perry Dodo, Jamie Purcell, West Central Produce, Inc.. Adding David R. Haberbush as counsel of record for West Central Produce, Inc., Michael Perry Dodo, and Jamie Purcell for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants West Central Produce, Inc., Michael Perry Dodo, and Jamie Purcell. (Attorney David Richard Haberbush added to party Michael Perry Dodo(pty:dft), Attorney David Richard Haberbush added to party Jamie Purcell(pty:dft), Attorney David Richard Haberbush added to party West Central Produce, Inc.(pty:dft))(Haberbush, David)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CONSENT ORDER RELATING TO ESTABLISHING A PACA TRUST CLAIMS PROCEDURE AND GRANTING RELATED RELIEF, WITHOUT PREJUDICE by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS SO ORDERED. (bm)
April 24, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF LODGING filed Notice of Lodgment of Consent Order Relating to Establishing a PACA Trust Claims Procedure and Granting Related Relief, Without Prejudice re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Golubow, Richard)
April 24, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC, upon Defendant Jamie Purcell served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jamie Purcell, CFO, Reported Principal in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Golubow, Richard)
April 24, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC, upon Defendant Michael Perry Dodo served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Michael Perry Dodo, CEO, Secretary, Reported Principal in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Golubow, Richard)
April 24, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC, upon Defendant West Central Produce, Inc. served on 4/8/2020, answer due 4/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon West Central Produce, Inc. in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Golubow, Richard)
April 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
March 31, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Michael Perry Dodo, Jamie Purcell, West Central Produce, Inc. (et)
March 31, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (et)
March 27, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC, identifying Produce Alliance, LLC, West Coast Central Produce, Inc., Michael Perry Dodo, Jamie Purcell, HSBC Bank. (Golubow, Richard)
March 27, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC. (Golubow, Richard)
March 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC. (Golubow, Richard)
March 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25890235 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Produce Alliance, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D) (Attorney Richard H Golubow added to party Produce Alliance, LLC(pty:pla))(Golubow, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Produce Alliance, LLC v. West Central Produce, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael Perry Dodo
Represented By: Bruce W Akerly
Represented By: Carey Renee McNair
Represented By: David Richard Haberbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: West Central Produce, Inc.
Represented By: Bruce W Akerly
Represented By: Carey Renee McNair
Represented By: David Richard Haberbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jamie Purcell
Represented By: Bruce W Akerly
Represented By: Carey Renee McNair
Represented By: David Richard Haberbush
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Produce Alliance, LLC
Represented By: Richard H Golubow
Represented By: Garrick A Hollander
Represented By: Kate Ellis
Represented By: Louis W Diess, III
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?