Jesus Mendoza v. HF Foods Group Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jesus Mendoza
Defendant: HF Foods Group Inc., Caixuan Xu, Zhou Min Ni, Xiao Mou Zhang, Jian Ming (Jonathan) Ni and Jian Ming Ni
Case Number: 2:2020cv02929
Filed: March 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Securities/Commodities
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D. Wright, II: The parties are ORDERED to SHOW CAUSE, why this case, 2:20-cv-02929, should not be consolidated with the related case, 2:20-cv-03967, in writing only, no later than June 1, 2020. The parties must file their responses in 2:20-cv-02929. No hearing will be held. TheCourt will discharge this order upon the filing of the Parties responses. (lc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John A. Jordak, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang and designating Charles W. Cox as local counsel #11 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel C. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang and designating Charles W. Cox as local counsel #13 by Judge Otis D. Wright, IIr Pro Hac Vice designating Charles W. Cox as local counsel. (lc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER GRANTING APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Courtney E. Quiros to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang and designating Charles W. Cox as local counsel. #12 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
May 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Minutes of In Chambers Order by Judge Wilson #15 was Docketed on this case in error should have been under 2:20-cv-02919-SVW-RAO, Bouyer vs Kip Partnership L.P. Therefore the erroneous OSC in writing deadline is not applicable in this case and has been terminated by clerk. (lc)
May 3, 2020 Filing 20 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Jesus Mendoza. upon Xiao Mou Zhang waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John A. Jordak, Jr.. (Rosen, Laurence)
May 3, 2020 Filing 19 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Jesus Mendoza. upon Caixuan Xu waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John A. Jordak, Jr.. (Rosen, Laurence)
May 3, 2020 Filing 18 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Jesus Mendoza. upon Jian Ming Ni waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John A. Jordak, Jr.. (Rosen, Laurence)
May 3, 2020 Filing 17 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Jesus Mendoza. upon Zhou Min Ni waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John A. Jordak, Jr.. (Rosen, Laurence)
May 3, 2020 Filing 16 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by plaintiff Jesus Mendoza. upon HF Foods Group Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/8/2020, answer due 6/8/2020. Waiver of Service signed by John A. Jordak, Jr.. (Rosen, Laurence)
May 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 (DOCKETED ON THIS CASE IN ERROR, SEE CLERICAL ERROR DOCKET NO. 21 )MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR LACK OF PROSECUTION. Plaintiff(s) to show cause in writing no later than May 8, 2020 why this action should not be dismissed as to all remaining defendants for lack of prosecution. As an alternative to a written response by plaintiff(s), the Court will accept one of the following, if it is filed on or before the above date: Proof of service of summons and complaint (applicable for defendant(s) who have not been served); In cases removed from State Court, responsive pleadings filed by all defendants; Request for entry of default by plaintiff(s) (applicable where defendants have been served but not answered); Motion for default judgment. (SEE DOCUMENT FOR OTHER SPECIFICS) (lc) Modified on 5/1/2020 (lc). Modified on 5/4/2020 (lc).
April 28, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel C. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 4/28/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-26254577) filed by Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cox, Charles)
April 28, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Samuel C. Feldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26254577) filed by Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cox, Charles)
April 28, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Courtney E. Quiros to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26254292) filed by Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cox, Charles)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney John A. Jordak, Jr. to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26254060) filed by Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Cox, Charles)
April 28, 2020 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang, identifying Jesus Mendoza, HF Foods Group Inc., Zhou Min Ni, Xiao Mou Zhang, Caixuan Xu, Jian Ming Ni. (Cox, Charles)
April 28, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Charles W Cox, II counsel for Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang. Adding Charles W. Cox as counsel of record for HF Foods Group Inc., Zhou Min Ni, Xiao Mou Zhang, Caixuan Xu, Jian Ming Ni for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Zhou Min Ni, Xiao Mou Zhang, Caixuan Xu, Jian Ming Ni. (Attorney Charles W Cox, II added to party HF Foods Group Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Charles W Cox, II added to party Jian Ming Ni(pty:dft), Attorney Charles W Cox, II added to party Zhou Min Ni(pty:dft), Attorney Charles W Cox, II added to party Caixuan Xu(pty:dft), Attorney Charles W Cox, II added to party Xiao Mou Zhang(pty:dft))(Cox, Charles)
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 1, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants HF Foods Group Inc., Jian Ming Ni, Zhou Min Ni, Caixuan Xu, Xiao Mou Zhang. (lh)
April 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 1, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
March 29, 2020 Filing 4 Certification and NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Jesus Mendoza, (Rosen, Laurence)
March 29, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Jesus Mendoza. (Rosen, Laurence)
March 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Jesus Mendoza. (Rosen, Laurence)
March 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-25894311 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Jesus Mendoza. (Attachments: #1 PSLRA Certification) (Attorney Laurence M Rosen added to party Jesus Mendoza(pty:pla))(Rosen, Laurence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jesus Mendoza v. HF Foods Group Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jesus Mendoza
Represented By: Laurence M Rosen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: HF Foods Group Inc.
Represented By: Samuel C Feldman
Represented By: Charles W Cox, II
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney E Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caixuan Xu
Represented By: Samuel C Feldman
Represented By: Charles W Cox, II
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney E Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Zhou Min Ni
Represented By: Samuel C Feldman
Represented By: Charles W Cox, II
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney E Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Xiao Mou Zhang
Represented By: Samuel C Feldman
Represented By: Charles W Cox, II
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney E Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Ming (Jonathan) Ni
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jian Ming Ni
Represented By: Samuel C Feldman
Represented By: Charles W Cox, II
Represented By: John A. Jordak, Jr.
Represented By: Courtney E Quiros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?