J.W. v. County of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Jayla W. and J.W.
Defendant: Lolita Suico, Karla Genovez, County of Los Angeles, Esperanza Gonzalez and DOES 1-10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv03002
Filed: March 31, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. Scheduling Conference set for 7/13/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER GRANTING IN PART and DENYING IN PART Motion to Dismiss (Dkt. 10) by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Court accordingly GRANTS Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Plaintiff's third claim, against the County of Los Angeles, and DISMISSES that claim, WITH LEAVE TO AMEND. The Court DENIES Defendants' Motion to Dismiss all remaining claims against all Defendants. Plaintiff shall file any Amended Complaint, amending the third claim only, no later than June 15, 2020. (bm)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. On it's own motion, the Court hereby continues the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Dismiss Complaint #10 to 6/1/2020 at 2:00 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cch) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: On its own motion, the Court hereby continues the hearing on Defendants Motion to Dismiss Complaint #9 to 6/1/2020 at 2:00 PM. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
April 27, 2020 Filing 13 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 #10 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Karla Genovez, Esperanza Gonzalez. (Bakman, Yelena)
April 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff J.W., (Garrotto, Greg)
April 17, 2020 Filing 11 Opposition In opposition to re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 #10 filed by Plaintiff J.W.. (Garrotto, Greg)
April 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #9 filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Karla Genovez, Esperanza Gonzalez. Motion set for hearing on 5/11/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Bakman, Yelena)
April 7, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Karla Genovez, Esperanza Gonzalez. Motion set for hearing on 5/4/2020 at 02:00 PM before Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Bakman, Yelena)
April 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
April 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. (jtil)
March 31, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff J.W. in Los Angeles Superior Court on 1/2/2020, attached as Exhibit A. (jtil)
March 31, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Karla Genovez, Esperanza Gonzalez, re Notice (Other) #4 served on March 31, 2020. (Bakman, Yelena)
March 31, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Karla Genovez, Esperanza Gonzalez. (Bakman, Yelena)
March 31, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Karla Genovez, Esperanza Gonzalez, (Bakman, Yelena)
March 31, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants County of Los Angeles, Karla Genovez, Esperanza Gonzalez. (Bakman, Yelena)
March 31, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV00123 Receipt No: ACACDC-25915031 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Esperanza Gonzalez, Karla Genovez, County of Los Angeles. (Attorney Yelena Bakman added to party County of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Yelena Bakman added to party Karla Genovez(pty:dft), Attorney Yelena Bakman added to party Esperanza Gonzalez(pty:dft))(Bakman, Yelena)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: J.W. v. County of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lolita Suico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karla Genovez
Represented By: Yelena Bakman
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Los Angeles
Represented By: Yelena Bakman
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Esperanza Gonzalez
Represented By: Yelena Bakman
Represented By: Jill Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jayla W.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: J.W.
Represented By: Greg Wegner Garrotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?