Tigabu Tesfu v. JPMorgan Chase
Plaintiff: Tigabu Tesfu
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. erroneously named JP Morgan Chase and J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc., J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc., JP Morgan Chase and DOES 1-50, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv03408
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Referring Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 7/9/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
April 22, 2020 Filing 9 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 16, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE Notice to Adverse Party of Case Assignment filed by Defendant J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc., JP Morgan Chase. (Rudman, Jamie)
April 16, 2020 Filing 7 DECLARATION of Jamie Rudman re: Notice to State Court and Adverse Party of Removal of Civil Action to Federal Court filed by Defendants J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc., JP Morgan Chase. (Attachments: #1 Attachment 1)(Rudman, Jamie)
April 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (jtil)
April 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint filed by Defendant JP Morgan Chase in Los Angeles Superior Court on 4/13/2020, attached as Exhibit 3. (jtil)
April 14, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Tigabu Tesfu in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/12/2020, attached as Exhibit 1. (jtil)
April 14, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. erroneously named JP Morgan Chase and J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc., identifying JPMorgan Chase & Co.. (Rudman, Jamie)
April 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. erroneously named JP Morgan Chase and J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc.. (Rudman, Jamie)
April 14, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Los Angeles, case number 20STCV10161 Receipt No: ACACDC-26080851 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. erroneously named JP Morgan Chase and J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4) (Attorney Jamie Rudman added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. erroneously named JP Morgan Chase and J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc.(pty:dft))(Rudman, Jamie)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tigabu Tesfu v. JPMorgan Chase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. erroneously named JP Morgan Chase and J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.P. Morgan Chase National Corporate Services, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JP Morgan Chase
Represented By: Jamie Rudman
Represented By: Jasmine S Horton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1-50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tigabu Tesfu
Represented By: Jihad M Smaili
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?