Paradise Valley Hospital et al v. Alex M. Azar, II
Plaintiff: Memorial Hospital, Huntington Beach Hospital, Metrohealth System, Chino Valley Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, The Queen's Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, San Dimas Community Hospital, Paradise Valley Hospital, University Medical Center, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, Lafayette General Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Akron General Medical Center Inc, Yavapai Regional Medical Center, Robinson Memorial Hospital, The Queens Medical Center and Akron General Medical Center
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services and Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2020cv03410
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 20, 2020 Filing 23 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Huntington Beach Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Dallas Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, Metrohealth System, Akron General Medical Center, Shannon Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Memorial Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center, University Medical Center, The Queens Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Lafayette General Medical Center, Robinson Memorial Hospital, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Sonoma Valley Hospital, North Oaks Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, upon Defendant Alex M. Azar, II served on 4/24/2020, answer due 6/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to C. Veloz, Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to U.S. Department of Justice. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Caroline White. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Disbrow, Matthew)
May 15, 2020 Filing 22 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel A Beck counsel for Defendant Alex M. Azar, II. Adding Daniel A. Beck as counsel of record for Alex M. Azar II, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Alex M. Azar II, Secretary of the United States Department of Health and Human Services. (Attorney Daniel A Beck added to party Alex M. Azar, II(pty:dft))(Beck, Daniel)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr: granting #15 Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth R. Marcus APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center and Yavapai Regional Medical Center, designating Matthew S Disbrow as local counsel. (lom)
April 28, 2020 Filing 20 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR. United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judge's initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. She can be reached at 213-894-5276. Judge Hatter's courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, 350 West 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. Additional information about Judge Hatter's procedures and schedules can be found on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. COUNSEL READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. See order for further details. (shb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #14 , Summons Request, #13 . The following error(s) was found: Nichola T Hanna, and William Bar are not named defendants. The Summons issued to Alex M. Azar, II, Secretary of Health and Human Services should also be served upon the Attorney General and the Civil Process Clerk. (shb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 18 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II. (shb)
April 16, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiffs Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. correcting APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth R. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Ce #15 (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 16, 2020 Filing 16 DECLARATION of Matthew S. Disbrow in support of APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth R. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Ce #15 filed by Plaintiffs Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth R. Marcus to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26096560) filed by Plaintiff Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Order) (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 14 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 13 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 15, 2020 Filing 12 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Akron General Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queens Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 14, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth R. Marcus. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
April 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #5 , Summons Request, #4 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
April 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request, #3 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
April 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
April 14, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (lh)
April 13, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Akron General Medical Center Inc, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queen's Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center, identifying Prime Healthcare Services. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Akron General Medical Center Inc, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queen's Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Akron General Medical Center Inc, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queen's Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiff Akron General Medical Center Inc, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queen's Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Akron General Medical Center Inc, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Centinela Hospital Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, Dallas Medical Center, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Huntington Beach Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Lafayette General Medical Center, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Memorial Hospital, Metrohealth System, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, North Oaks Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Robinson Memorial Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queen's Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Yavapai Regional Medical Center. (Disbrow, Matthew)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26064535 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Huntington Beach Hospital, San Dimas Community Hospital, Dallas Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, Metrohealth System, Akron General Medical Center Inc, Shannon Medical Center, Paradise Valley Hospital, Montclair Hospital Medical Center, Sherman Oaks Hospital, Memorial Hospital, La Palma Intercommunity Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center, University Medical Center, The Queen's Medical Center, Chino Valley Medical Center, West Anaheim Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Encino Hospital Medical Center, Lafayette General Medical Center, Robinson Memorial Hospital, Lima Memorial Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, East Valley Hospital Medical Center, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Sonoma Valley Hospital, North Oaks Medical Center, Garden Grove Hospital and MC, Centinela Hospital Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Akron General Medical Center Inc(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Aspirus Wausau Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Baton Rouge General Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Centinela Hospital Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Chino Valley Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Dallas Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party East Valley Hospital Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Encino Hospital Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Garden Grove Hospital and MC(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Huntington Beach Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party La Palma Intercommunity Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Lafayette General Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Lima Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Lodi Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Metrohealth System(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Montclair Hospital Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party North Oaks Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Paradise Valley Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Robinson Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party San Dimas Community Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Shannon Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Sherman Oaks Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Sonoma Valley Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party The Queen's Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Torrance Memorial Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party University Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party West Anaheim Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Yavapai Regional Medical Center(pty:pla))(Disbrow, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Paradise Valley Hospital et al v. Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Huntington Beach Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metrohealth System
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chino Valley Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sherman Oaks Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Centinela Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: North Oaks Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Queen's Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: West Anaheim Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dallas Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: La Palma Intercommunity Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonoma Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspirus Wausau Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: East Valley Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baton Rouge General Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lima Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Encino Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: San Dimas Community Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paradise Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Montclair Hospital Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrance Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lafayette General Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Garden Grove Hospital and MC
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodi Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akron General Medical Center Inc
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yavapai Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Robinson Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Queens Medical Center
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akron General Medical Center
Represented By: Kenneth R Marcus
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ALEX M. AZAR, in his official capacity as the Secretary of the Department of Health and Human Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Represented By: Daniel A Beck
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?