Christine Beirne et al v. County of Ventura et al
Plaintiff: Christine Beirne and Kevin Beirne
Defendant: County of Ventura, DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive and Sheriff William Ayub
Estate Plaintiff: Estate of Alexander Beirne
Case Number: 2:2020cv03428
Filed: April 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to County of Ventura answer now due 6/30/2020; Sheriff William Ayub answer now due 6/30/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants County of Ventura; Sheriff William Ayub.(Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party Sheriff William Ayub(pty:dft), Attorney Rocco Zambito, Jr added to party County of Ventura(pty:dft))(Zambito, Rocco)
June 3, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Christine Beirne, Estate of Alexander Beirne, Kevin Beirne, upon Defendant Sheriff William Ayub acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Jim Eicher, Attorney. (Lessem, Jeremy)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Christine Beirne, Estate of Alexander Beirne, Kevin Beirne, upon Defendant County of Ventura acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 5/21/2020, answer due 6/11/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Jim Eicher, Attorney. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 5, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant County of Ventura. (lc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to defendant Sheriff William Ayub. (lc)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Christine Beirne, Kevin Beirne, Estate of Alexander Beirne. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 5, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Christine Beirne, Kevin Beirne, Estate of Alexander Beirne. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 4, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 , Summons Request #8 . The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. 1) Plaintiff's area names a plaintiff and has "et al" but MISSING (see attached); defendant's area only names one defendant, but MISSING "et al" ( however has (see attached). Please correct accordingly. 2) RE No. 8..Please name the defendant exactly as in the complaint, Filer has instead of putting the NAMED defendant Sheriff William Ayub at the first Line of TO: area.. has erroneously put the named defendant as C/O and indicated the Ventura County Sheriffs Administration as the defendant. 3)PAGE 3 erroneously names a defendant as "ROBB WEBB" who is NOT a named defendant in this case. Please remove the name and Please Do NOT fill in proof of service prior to clerk issuing a summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lc)
May 1, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Christine Beirne, Kevin Beirne, Estate of Alexander Beirne. (Lessem, Jeremy)
May 1, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #2 filed by Plaintiffs Christine Beirne, Kevin Beirne, Estate of Alexander Beirne. (Lessem, Jeremy)
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (jtil)
April 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Christine Beirne, Kevin Beirne, Estate of Alexander Beirne, (Lessem, Jeremy)
April 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Christine Beirne, Kevin Beirne, Estate Plaintiff Estate of Alexander Beirne. (Lessem, Jeremy)
April 13, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26067818 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Christine Beirne, Estate of Alexander Beirne, Kevin Beirne. (Attorney Jeremy Ian Lessem added to party Christine Beirne(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Ian Lessem added to party Kevin Beirne(pty:pla), Attorney Jeremy Ian Lessem added to party Estate of Alexander Beirne(pty:estp))(Lessem, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Christine Beirne et al v. County of Ventura et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Ventura
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 100, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sheriff William Ayub
Represented By: Rocco Zambito, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Beirne
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen C Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kevin Beirne
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen C Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Estate plaintiff: Estate of Alexander Beirne
Represented By: Jeremy Ian Lessem
Represented By: Jamal L Tooson
Represented By: Karen C Joynt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?