Scott Kesterson et al v. Johnson and Johnson et al
Plaintiff: SCOTT KESTERSON and KATHERINE KESTERSON
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., Bayer Healthcare LLC, Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc., Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Chattem, Inc., Johnson & Johnson, Dr. Scholl's LLC, Cyprus Mines Corporation, BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC., Glaxosmithkline LLC, Brenntag North America, Inc., Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C., Merck & Co., Inc., Does 1-450, Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc., Dr. Scholls LLC, Merck and Co., Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., CVS Pharmacy, Inc., The Gold Bond Company, Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co., Imnc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company, MSD Consumer Care, Inc., Schering-Plough Corporation and Bayer Consumer Care LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv03555
Filed: April 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 41 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Defendant Chattem, Inc. filed by Defendant Chattem, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/17/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Affidavit) (Coggshall, William)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 40 (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TAKING PLAINTIFFS' MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE REMAND TO STATE COURT (DKT. #32 ) UNDER SUBMISSION by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court has considered the matters raised with respect to the Motion and has concluded that pursuant to Local Rule 7.15, the matter can be decided without oral argument. The Court advises counsel that the Motion, noticed for hearing on June 12, 2020, has been taken under submission and off its motion calendar. No appearance by counsel is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (cb) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 4, 2020 Filing 39 Second STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chattem, Inc. answer now due 6/12/2014, re Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by defendant Chattem, Inc..(Coggshall, William)
May 29, 2020 Filing 38 REPLY in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #32 filed by Plaintiffs Scott Kesterson, Katherine Kesterson. (Attachments: #1 Plaintiffs Objections to Evidence Submitted by Defendants in Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Remand Case to State Court)(Rahmes, Mary)
May 22, 2020 Filing 37 Opposition Opposition to Motion for Remand to State Court re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #32 filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Bryan L. King in Support of Opposition to Motion for Remand to State Court, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A to King Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit B to King Declaration, #4 Exhibit Exhibit C to King Declaration, #5 Exhibit Exhibit D to King Declaration, #6 Exhibit Exhibit E to King Declaration, #7 Exhibit Exhibit F to King Declaration, #8 Exhibit Exhibit G to King Declaration, #9 Exhibit Exhibit H to King Declaration, #10 Proposed Order [Proposed] Order Denying Motion for Remand to State Court)(King, Bryan)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER DEEMING PLAINTIFFS' NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR IMMEDIATE REMAND TO STATE COURT AND ALL SUPPORTING DOCUMENTS FILED AND SERVED ON 5/15/2020 by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Having read the Declaration of Mary T. Rahmes Pursuant to Central District Local Rule 5-4.6.2 Regarding Central District of California CM/ECF Failure On 5/15/2020 and Plaintiffs' Attempts to Electronically Timely File Plaintiffs' Motion For Immediate Remand To State Court And Documents In Support Thereof #34 , the Court hereby GRANTS Plaintiffs' request to have Plaintiffs' notice of motion and motion for immediate remand to state court #32 and all supporting documents deemed timely filed and served on 5/15/2020. It is therefore ORDERED that Plaintiffs' notice of motion and motion for immediate remand to state court and all supporting documents are deemed timely filed and served on 5/15/2020. (gk)
May 18, 2020 Filing 35 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Rahmes, Mary)
May 18, 2020 Filing 34 DECLARATION of Mary T. Rahmes in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #32 filed by Plaintiffs Scott Kesterson, Katherine Kesterson. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Rahmes, Mary)
May 18, 2020 Filing 33 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #32 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. 6/12/2020 hearing date is untimely, Local Rule 6-1. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 16, 2020 Filing 32 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Scott Kesterson, Katherine Kesterson. Motion set for hearing on 6/12/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Declaration of Mary Rahmes, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 Exhibit 3, #6 Exhibit 4, #7 Exhibit 5, #8 Exhibit 6, #9 Exhibit 7, #10 Exhibit 8, #11 Exhibit 9, #12 Exhibit 10, #13 Plaintiffs' Objections to Evidence submitted by Defendants, #14 Proposed Order) (Blumenfeld-James, Jordan)
May 14, 2020 Filing 31 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Chattem, Inc. answer now due 6/5/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by defendant Chattem, Inc..(Attorney William L Coggshall added to party Chattem, Inc.(pty:dft))(Coggshall, William)
May 14, 2020 Filing 30 SUPPLEMENT to Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,, #1 filed by Defendants CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Further Declaration of Thomas Moffatt in Support of Notice of Removal)(Noureddini, Noushan)
May 12, 2020 Filing 29 INITIAL DISCLOSURE of PURSUANT TO FED.R.CIV.P 26(A)(1) filed by Defendant Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc. (Berkes, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURY filed by Defendant Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Berkes, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 27 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc... (Berkes, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc., identifying ndicate names of Corporate Parent, Affiliate and/or other interested parties: Brilliant National Services, Inc.. (Berkes, Robert)
May 12, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert Harvey Berkes on behalf of Defendant Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc. (Attorney Robert Harvey Berkes added to party Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc.(pty:dft))(Berkes, Robert)
May 5, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradford J DeJardin counsel for Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. Adding Bradford J. DeJardin as counsel of record for Cyprus Mines Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. (DeJardin, Bradford)
May 4, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Appearance #22 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel G123. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 4, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karleen Frances Murphy on behalf of Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation (Murphy, Karleen)
May 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation, identifying Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Freeport Minerals Corporation and Freeport-McMoRan Inc.. (Murphy, Karleen)
April 30, 2020 Filing 20 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Dr. Scholls LLC identifying Bayer AG as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC identifying Bayer AG as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 18 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC identifying Bayer AG as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 17 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Merck and Co., Inc. identifying Merck & Co. Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
April 30, 2020 Filing 16 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholls LLC, Merck and Co., Inc.. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for Merck & Co. Inc.; Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC (f/k/a Bayer Consumer Care LLC f/k/a MSD Consumer Care, Inc.); Bayer Healthcare LLC, a subsidiary of Bayer AG; and Dr. Scholl's LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Merck & Co. Inc.; Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC (f/k/a Bayer Consumer Care LLC f/k/a MSD Consumer Care, Inc.); Bayer Healthcare LLC, a subsidiary of Bayer AG; and Dr. Scholl's LLC. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Bayer Healthcare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Dr. Scholls LLC(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
April 30, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Dr. Scholls LLC, Merck and Co., Inc.. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Merck & Co. Inc.; Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC (f/k/a Bayer Consumer Care LLC f/k/a MSD Consumer Care, Inc.); Bayer Healthcare LLC, a subsidiary of Bayer AG; and Dr. Scholl's LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Merck & Co. Inc.; Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC (f/k/a Bayer Consumer Care LLC f/k/a MSD Consumer Care, Inc.); Bayer Healthcare LLC, a subsidiary of Bayer AG; and Dr. Scholl's LLC. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Bayer Healthcare LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Dr. Scholls LLC(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
April 27, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE Notice of Notice to State Court Clear and Adverse Parties of Removal of Entire Action to Federal Court filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.. (King, Bryan)
April 24, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc., Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C., identifying CVS Health Corporation. (Attorney Noushan Noureddini added to party Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C.(pty:dft), Attorney Noushan Noureddini added to party Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C.(pty:dft))(Noureddini, Noushan)
April 22, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Electronic Filing re Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Complaint - (Discovery),, Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Attorney/Party Information Update Request, Notice (Other) #11 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #7 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Initial Order Setting R26 Scheduling Conference - form only #10 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Deficiency in Attorney Case Opening - optional html form, #6 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #5 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #4 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),, Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #8 , Initial Order upon Filing of Complaint - form only #9 , Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)), Answer to Complaint (Discovery), Answer to Complaint (Discovery), e-mailed to James Francis Murdica at jmuridca@btlaw.com bounced due to Typo in email address. Primary e-mail address corrected. Notice of Electronic Filing resent addressed to jmurdica@btlaw.com. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
April 20, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE Notice of Court's Standing Order filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.. (King, Bryan)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 8/21/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
April 17, 2020 Filing 8 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.. (King, Bryan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.. (King, Bryan)
April 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachment 1 Civil Cover Sheet should be e-filed separately and in the correct event. The correct event is located under Civil Events Other Filings Miscellaneous Filings. (car)
April 17, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
April 17, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Merck and Co., Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ebony Hill Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 10 Exhibit CC to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Bayer Healthcare LLC served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kaitlyn Mannix Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 10 Exhibit BB to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren Corporate Operations Manager in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 10 Exhibit AA to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Plaintiffs Brenntag Specialties, Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Ebony Hill Registered Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 10 Exhibit Z to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 4/17/2020 (car).
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Brenntag North America, Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren Corporate Operations Manager Authorized in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit Y to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Cyprus Amax Minerals Company served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon ReJustin Woods Office Manager Authorized in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit X to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant GlaxoSmithKline LLC served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lyanne Gares Litigation Management Services Leader in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit W to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Dr. Scholls LLC served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lyanne Gares Litigation Management Services Leader in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit V to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Johnson and Johnson served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kathleen Leshik Agent in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit U to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez Authorized in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit T to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Justin Woods Office Manager Authorized in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit S to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lyanne Gares Litigation Management Services Leader in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit R to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C. served on 11/12/2019, answer due 12/3/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Gabriela Sanchez Authorized in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit Q to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF PROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson, upon Defendant Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc. served on 11/13/2019, answer due 12/4/2019. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Koren J Murrhy Authorized to Accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity. Original Summons NOT returned. Filed in State Court on 11/19/19 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit P to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) as to Cyprus Amax Minerals Company Without Prejudice. Filed in State Court on 2/14/2020 Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit M to Notice of Removal #1 (car) Modified on 4/17/2020 (car).
April 16, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, by Defendant Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc. Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit K to Notice of Removal #1 .(car)
April 16, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendant Johnson and Johnson. Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit J to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit I to Notice of Removal #1 .(Attorney Viiu Spangler Khare added to party Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc.(pty:dft))(car)
April 16, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, by Defendant Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC. Submitted with Attachment 9 Exhibit H to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa D O'Donnell added to party Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC(pty:dft))(car)
April 16, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, by Defendant Merck and Co., Inc. Submitted with Attachment 8 Exhibit G to Notice of Removal #1 .(Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Merck and Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Alyssa D O'Donnell added to party Merck and Co., Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Merck and Co., Inc.(pty:dft))(car)
April 16, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),, filed by Defendant CVS Pharmacy, Inc. Submitted with Attachment 8 Exhibit E to Notice of Removal #1 .(Attorney James Francis Murdica added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Sandra Meeyoun Ko added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Kelley S Olah added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Noushan Noureddini added to party CVS Pharmacy, Inc.(pty:dft))(car)
April 16, 2020 NON-CONFORMED COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), by Defendant Cyprus Mines Corporation. Submitted with Attachment 8 Exhibit D to Notice of Removal #1 (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party Cyprus Mines Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Karleen Frances Murphy added to party Cyprus Mines Corporation(pty:dft))(car) Modified on 4/17/2020 (car).
April 16, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC, Bayer Healthcare LLC, Brenntag North America, Inc., Brenntag Specialties, Inc., CVS Health Corporation, Chattem, Inc., Cyprus Amax Minerals Company, Cyprus Mines Corporation, Does, Dr. Scholls LLC, GlaxoSmithKline LLC, Johnson and Johnson, Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc., Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C., Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C., Merck and Co., Inc., Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Katherine Kesterson, Scott Kesterson. Filed in State Court on 10/25/19 Submitted with Attachment 5 Exhibit C to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
April 16, 2020 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., Johnson & Johnson (King, Bryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants, Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC., Johnson & Johnson, (King, Bryan)
April 16, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles, case number 19STCV38328 Receipt No: ACACDC-26118530 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants, Johnson & Johnson and Johnson & Johnson Consumer Inc. Johnson & Johnson, JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet CV-71, #2 Declaration Declaration of Bryan L. King in Support of Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Bryan L. King, #4 Exhibit Exhibit B to Declaration of Bryan L. King, #5 Exhibit Exhibit C (part 1) to Declaration of Bryan L. King, #6 Exhibit Exhibit C (part 2) to Declaration of Bryan L. King, #7 Exhibit Exhibit C (part 3) to Declaration of Bryan L. King, #8 Exhibit Exhibits D-G to Declaration of Bryan L. King, #9 Exhibit Exhibits H-Y to Declaration of Bryan L. King, #10 Exhibit Exhibits Z - NN to Declaration of Bryan L. King) (Attorney Bryan Lawrence King added to party JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Bryan Lawrence King added to party Johnson & Johnson(pty:dft))(King, Bryan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Scott Kesterson et al v. Johnson and Johnson et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Health Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JOHNSON & JOHNSON CONSUMER INC.
Represented By: Bryan Lawrence King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Healthcare LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Consumer Care Holdings LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark & Daniels, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longs Drug Stores California, L.L.C.
Represented By: Noushan Noureddini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chattem, Inc.
Represented By: William L Coggshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson & Johnson
Represented By: Bryan Lawrence King
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scholl's LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Mines Corporation
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Karleen Frances Murphy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BRENNTAG SPECIALTIES, INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Glaxosmithkline LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brenntag North America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longs Drug Stores, L.L.C.
Represented By: Noushan Noureddini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-450
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whittaker Clark and Daniels, Inc.
Represented By: Viiu Spangler Khare
Represented By: Robert Harvey Berkes
Represented By: Narine Levonyan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dr. Scholls LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Merck and Co., Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson
Represented By: Bryan Lawrence King
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Johnson and Johnson Consumer Inc.
Represented By: Bryan Lawrence King
Represented By: Julia Elizabeth Romano
Represented By: Alexander G Calfo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CVS Pharmacy, Inc.
Represented By: Sandra Meeyoun Ko
Represented By: James Francis Murdica
Represented By: Noushan Noureddini
Represented By: Kelley S Olah
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Gold Bond Company
Represented By: William L Coggshall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cyprus Amax Minerals Company sued individually, doing business as, and as successor to American Talc Company, Metropolitan Talc Co., Imnc. and Charles Mathieu Inc. and Sierra Talc Company and United Talc Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MSD Consumer Care, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Schering-Plough Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bayer Consumer Care LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Alyssa D O'Donnell
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SCOTT KESTERSON
Represented By: Lisa M Barley
Represented By: Mary T Rahmes
Represented By: Stuart J Purdy
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KATHERINE KESTERSON
Represented By: Lisa M Barley
Represented By: Mary T Rahmes
Represented By: Stuart J Purdy
Represented By: Jordan Blumenfeld-James
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?