Legendary Transport, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Plaintiff: Legendary Transport, LLC
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,, Citibank N.A., WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A, JPMorgan Chase & Co., BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,, Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Does 1 to 1000, inclusive, Bank of America, N.A. and JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03636
Filed: April 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jacqueline Chooljian
Referring Judge: Otis D Wright
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:15
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER GRANTING JOINT MOTION TO STAY PENDING JPML RULING. The Parties shall notify the Court of the JPMLs decision within 5 business days of its receipt #37 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II (lc)
June 15, 2020 Filing 37 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending JMPL Ruling filed by Specially Appearing Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
May 11, 2020 Filing 36 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. upon JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 4/30/2020, answer due 6/29/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Karin Bohmholdt, Esq. (Dolce, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 35 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint #33 as to defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (lc) Modified on 4/28/2020 (lc).
April 28, 2020 Filing 34 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Amended Complaint/Petition,, #33 filed by PLAINTIFF Legendary Transport, LLC. (Dolce, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 33 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC (Attachments: #1 Exhibit March 31, 2020 Email, #2 Exhibit April 1, 2020 Email, #3 Exhibit April 2, 2020 Email, #4 Exhibit April 3, 2020 Inquiry Screen, #5 Exhibit Inquiry Confirmation 1, #6 Exhibit Inquiry Confirmation 2, #7 Exhibit April 7, 2020 Email, #8 Exhibit April 10, 2020 Email, #9 Exhibit April 8, 2020 Error Screen, #10 Exhibit April 17, 2020 Email)(Dolce, Adam)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-03588 ODW(JCx). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish to Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian for Discovery. The case number will now read as follows: 2:20-cv-03636 ODW(JCx). Signed by Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (rn)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER DENYING APPLICATION FOR TEMPORARY RESTRAINING ORDER AND PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION #17 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II . (lc) .Modified on 4/24/2020 (lc).
April 24, 2020 Filing 30 DECLARATION of ADAM DOLCE IN SUPPORT OF First APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #17 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A - NY TImes Article)(Dolce, Adam)
April 24, 2020 Filing 29 REPLY IN SUPPORT OF First APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #17 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Dolce, Adam)
April 24, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Notice of Entry of Decision or Ruling by a Judge of this Court, [27-1]. The following error(s) was/were found: Filer attached previous issued minutes from another case as an exhibit, however prior active electronic headers to that filing remain intact, thus making the current electronic headers illegible to the exhibit. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 24, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Entry of RULING filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1: Order Denying Ex Parte Application for Temporary Restraining Order in Outlet Tile Center v. JPMorgan Chase & Co., et al., (CV 20-3603-GW-MAAx), entered April 23, 2020 at ECF Dkt. No. 12)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Robert J Herrington on behalf of Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party JPMorgan Chase & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Robert J Herrington added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Herrington, Robert)
April 23, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #17 filed by Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Paul Beinstein, #2 Declaration Karin L. Bohmholdt-Part 1 w/ Exhibits 1 -8, #3 Declaration Karin L. Bohmholdt-Part 2 w/ Exhibits 9-11)(Bohmholdt, Karin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 24 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 23 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Specially Appearing Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying Legendary Transport, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Citibank, N.A.. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Specially Appearing Defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co., identifying Legendary Transport, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Citibank, N.A.. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Specially Appearing Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., identifying Legendary Transport, LLC, JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank, N.A., Citibank, N.A.. (Bohmholdt, Karin)
April 23, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Karin Bohmholdt on behalf of Defendants JPMorgan Chase & Co., JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Attorney Karin Bohmholdt added to party JPMorgan Chase & Co.(pty:dft), Attorney Karin Bohmholdt added to party JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.(pty:dft))(Bohmholdt, Karin)
April 22, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order #17 . The following error(s) was/were found: Hearing information is missing, incorrect, or not timely. Other error(s) with document(s): Docket entry has set ex parte application for erroneous hearing date of 5/11/20 1:30 PM which Does NOT appear on the pdf document itself. Otherwise the ex parte filing remains pending Judge's ruling. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
April 22, 2020 Filing 17 First APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. Application set for hearing on 5/11/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order TRO and OSC) (Dolce, Adam)
April 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Otis D Wright, II: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright II. Counsel are STRONGLY encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information.. The parties may consent to proceed before a Magistrate Judge appearing on the voluntary consent list. PLEASE refer to Local Rule 79-5 for the submission of CIVIL ONLY SEALED DOCUMENTS. CRIMINAL SEALED DOCUMENTS will remain the same. Please refer to the Judges procedures and schedules for detailed instructions for submission of sealed documents. (lc)
April 21, 2020 Filing 15 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. (esa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (esa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant JPMorgan Chase & Co. (esa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Citibank N.A. (esa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Bank of America, N.A. (esa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 21, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Otis D. Wright, II and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
April 20, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Dolce, Adam)
April 20, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Dolce, Adam)
April 20, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Dolce, Adam)
April 20, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Dolce, Adam)
April 20, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Dolce, Adam)
April 20, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC, (Dolce, Adam)
April 20, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Dolce, Adam)
April 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26150950 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Legendary Transport, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9) (Attorney Adam D Dolce added to party Legendary Transport, LLC(pty:pla))(Dolce, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Legendary Transport, LLC v. JPMorgan Chase & Co. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Citibank N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: WELLS FARGO BANK, N.A
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase & Co.
Represented By: Karin Bohmholdt
Represented By: Robert J Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 1000, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Karin Bohmholdt
Represented By: Robert J Herrington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Legendary Transport, LLC
Represented By: Adam D Dolce
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?