Calportland Company v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Plaintiff: Calportland Company
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company, BNSF Railway Company and CSX Transportation, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03659
Filed: April 21, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 8, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 8, 2020 Filing 16 TEXT-ONLY ENTRY - RECEIVED Notice of Receipt of Electronic Case Transfer from District of Columbia, 1:20-cv-01206 filed 5/8/2020. (iv)
May 4, 2020 Filing 15 Conditional Transfer Order - (CTO-9) from the United States Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation, MDL 2925, transferring case to USDC, District of Columbia for coordinated or consolidated pretrial proceedings, and with the consent of that court, and assigned to Honorable Beryl A. Howell. Case transferred electronically. (MD JS-6. Case Terminated.) (jp)
April 30, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Calportland Company, upon Defendant Union Pacific Railroad Company served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Caseria, Leo)
April 30, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Calportland Company, upon Defendant Norfolk Southern Railway Company served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Corp. Service Company, Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Caseria, Leo)
April 30, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Calportland Company, upon Defendant CSX Transportation, Inc. served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp., Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Caseria, Leo)
April 30, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Calportland Company, upon Defendant BNSF Railway Company served on 4/23/2020, answer due 5/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon CT Corp, Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Caseria, Leo)
April 30, 2020 Filing 10 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:19-cv-01880 JLS(KESx). Case transferred from Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-03659 JLS(KESx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
April 22, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants BNSF Railway Company, CSX Transportation, Inc., Norfolk Southern Railway Company, Union Pacific Railroad Company. (Attachments: #1 Summons for Defendant CSX Transportation Inc, #2 Summons for Defendant Norfolk Railway Company, #3 Summons for Union Pacific Railroad Company) (et)
April 22, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (et)
April 21, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Calportland Company. Related Case(s): 19-cv-01880, 19-cv-01881, 19-02305 (Attachments: #1 Attachment A, #2 Attachment B)(Caseria, Leo)
April 21, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Calportland Company, identifying Taiheiyo Cement USA, Inc., Taiheiyo Cement Corporation. (Caseria, Leo)
April 21, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Calportland Company. (Caseria, Leo)
April 21, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Calportland Company. (Caseria, Leo)
April 21, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26164157 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Calportland Company. (Attorney Leo D Caseria added to party Calportland Company(pty:pla))(Caseria, Leo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Calportland Company v. BNSF Railway Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Pacific Railroad Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BNSF Railway Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CSX Transportation, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Calportland Company
Represented By: Leo D Caseria
Represented By: Joy O Siu
Represented By: Helen Cho Eckert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?