Brandon Michael Wyse v. Andrew M. Saul
Plaintiff: Brandon Michael Wyse
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv03696
Filed: April 22, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Alexander F MacKinnon
Nature of Suit: Social Security: HIA
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 15, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-3696 AFM on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
May 14, 2020 Filing 13 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (Attorney Tina Naicker added to party Andrew M. Saul(pty:dft))(Naicker, Tina)
May 7, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Brandon Michael Wyse, upon Defendant Andrew M. Saul served on 5/4/2020, answer due 9/1/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt NOT attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Ruzin, Irene)
April 28, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff Brandon Michael Wyse. (Ruzin, Irene)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 SUPPLEMENTAL ORDER REGARDING FURTHER PROCEEDINGS by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (See order for details.) (es)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE: PROCEDURES IN SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (es)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Andrew M. Saul. (es)
April 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon: GRANTING #5 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (es)
April 22, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Alexander F. MacKinnon. (esa)
April 22, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Brandon Michael Wyse. (Ruzin, Irene)
April 22, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Brandon Michael Wyse, (Ruzin, Irene)
April 22, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Brandon Michael Wyse. (Ruzin, Irene)
April 22, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Brandon Michael Wyse. (Ruzin, Irene)
April 22, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by plaintiff Brandon Michael Wyse. (Attorney Irene Ruzin added to party Brandon Michael Wyse(pty:pla))(Ruzin, Irene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brandon Michael Wyse v. Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Tina Naicker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brandon Michael Wyse
Represented By: Irene Ruzin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?