Amazon.com, Inc. v. Derrick S. Lee
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Defendant: Derrick S. Lee
Case Number: 2:2020cv03718
Filed: April 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale S Fischer
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 12, 2020 Filing 16 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal from Superior Court. (et)
May 22, 2020 Filing 15 Receipt of Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court. (jp)
May 18, 2020 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED - TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 20 STRO 00703. (jp)
May 18, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Amended - Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) #12 was docketed and stated the Superior Court Address in error. The document will be re-docketed with correct the Superior Court Address. (jp)
May 5, 2020 Filing 12 AMENDED - TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 20 STRO 00703. (jp)
May 5, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Letter of Transmittal - Remand to Superior Court (CV-103) #10 was docketed and stated the Superior court case number in error. The document will be re-docketed with correct the State Case number. (jp)
April 29, 2020 Filing 10 TRANSMITTAL of documents to Los Angeles County Superior Court. A certified copy of the order of remand and a copy of the docket sheet from this court was sent to Los Angeles County Superior Court - Stanley Mosk Courthouse. Case number: 20STR000703. (jp)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer that the request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis #3 is hereby DENIED. FURTHER ORDERED that this case is hereby REMANDED to State Court. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated.) See order for specifics. (jp)
April 23, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (esa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF MOTION to Vacate Default Judgment Obtained by Fraud filed by defendant Derrick S. Lee. (esa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF MOTION to Dismiss pursuant to FRCP 12(b)(6) filed by defendant Derrick S. Lee. (esa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF MOTION for Dissolving Temporary Restraining Order issued by a State Court filed by defendant Derrick S. Lee. (esa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by defendant Derrick S. Lee. (esa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by defendant Derrick S. Lee. (esa)
April 23, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Superior Court of California Los Angeles County, case number 20STRO00703 with copies of Restraining Order and Small Claims Complaint.Case assigned to Judge Dale S. Fischer, Discovery to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, filed by defendant Derrick S. Lee. (Attachments: #1 part 2, #2 CV71) (esa)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amazon.com, Inc. v. Derrick S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Phillis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Derrick S. Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?