David Farrell v. BJ's Restaurant Operations Company
Plaintiff: David Farrell
Defendant: BJS RESTAURANT OPERATIONS COMPANY, DOES 1 through 10, inclusive and BJ's Restaurant Operations Company
Alternative Dispute Resolution (Adr) Provider: Robert D Coviello
Case Number: 2:2020cv03771
Filed: April 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 05 U.S.C. ยง 704 Labor Litigation
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 28, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Orders #31 , #33 and #34 were not properly flattened. The clerk will replace with a flattened version. (jp)
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 FINAL JUDGMENT by Judge Dale S. Fischer. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). See Final Judgment for specifics. (jp)
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings July 11, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. re Transcript #39 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Cuneo, Patricia) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
September 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on July 11, 2022 at 1:30 p.m. Court Reporter: PAT CUNEO CSR 1600, OFFICIAL REPORTER, www.patcuneo.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 10/5/2022. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 10/17/2022. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 12/13/2022. (Cuneo, Patricia)
September 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS): ORDER VACATING HEARING by Judge Dale S. Fischer. In light of the amended documents filed on 9/6/2022, the Order to Show Cause Hearing currently set for 9/12/2022 at 1:30 p.m. is VACATED. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pk)
September 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 Amendment to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of PAGA Settlement #27 #32 filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Hamner, #2 Proposed Order)(Hamner, Christopher)
August 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE: SANCTIONS before Judge Dale S. Fischer: Plaintiffs counsel is to file corrected documents by 9/6/2022, a further Order to Show Cause Hearing will be held on 9/12/2022 at 1:30 PM. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (jp)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 Amendment to Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of PAGA Settlement #27 #32 filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Hamner, #2 Proposed Order)(Hamner, Christopher)
August 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 AMENDED ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE SANCTIONS by Judge Dale S. Fischer. See order for specifics. (lom) (Main Document 34 replaced on 9/28/2022) (jp).
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 Order by Judge Dale S. Fischer to Show Cause re Sanctions. Plaintiffs counsel is therefore ordered to show cause in writing no later than 8/24/2022, why he should not be sanctioned in the amount of $750 for his failure to comply with this Court's orders. A hearing on this Order to Show Cause will be held on 8/22/2022 at 1:30 PM. See Order for specifics. (jp) (Main Document 33 replaced on 9/28/2022) (jp).
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of PAGA Settlement #27 filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Hamner, #2 Proposed Order) (Hamner, Christopher)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Amended Notice of Motion and Motion #30 . The Amended Memorandum of Points and Authorities is not searchable as required by Local Rule 5-4.3.1 and is therefore stricken. Counsel must file a new motion correcting all of the deficiencies identified by the Court. (jp) (Main Document 31 replaced on 9/28/2022) (jp).
July 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Amended NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Approve PAGA Settlement filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Hamner, #2 Proposed Order) (Hamner, Christopher)
July 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of PAGA Settlement and Release #27 before Judge Dale S. Fischer. See Order for specifics. Court Reporter: Pat Cuneo. (jp)
July 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Plaintiff's Motion for Approval of PAGA Settlement and Release #27 currently set for hearing on July 11, 2022 at 3:00 p.m. will proceed in person. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vv)
June 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Settlement Approval of PAGA Settlement filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. Motion set for hearing on 7/11/2022 at 01:30 PM before Judge Dale S. Fischer. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Christopher J. Hamner, #2 Proposed Order) (Hamner, Christopher)
June 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 26 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANT BJ's Restaurant Operations Company amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff David Farrell(Hamner, Christopher)
May 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer as follows Plaintiff is permitted to file the First Amended Complaint, attached as Exhibit 1 to the Stipulation #24 . (jp)
May 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 24 Joint STIPULATION for Leave to to File First Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Hamner, Christopher)
April 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 STATUS REPORT Joint Report re Status of Arbitration filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (Lewis, Bryanne)
January 12, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STATUS REPORT Joint Report re Status of Arbitration filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (Lewis, Bryanne)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STATUS REPORT Joint Report re Status of Arbitration filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (Lewis, Bryanne)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATUS REPORT Joint Report re Status of Arbitration f filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (Lewis, Bryanne)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer. The parties were ordered to file a status report every 90 days. The most recent status report was filed on February 1, 2021. Failure to file a status report by July 15, 2021 (and every 90 days thereafter) is likely to result in sanctions, which may include dismissal. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (dd) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STATUS REPORT Joint Report re Status of Arbitration filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (Lewis, Bryanne)
October 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 STATUS REPORT of Arbitration proceedings filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (Lewis, Bryanne)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 STATUS REPORT of Arbitration proceedings filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (Lewis, Bryanne)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT of Panel Mediator. Mediator (ADR Panel) Robert D Coviello has been assigned to serve as Panel Mediator. (lst)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER/REFERRAL to ADR Procedure No 2 by Judge Dale S. Fischer. Case ordered to Court Mediation Panel for mediation. (rfi)
May 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer re Joint Stipulation to Arbitrate Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismissing Class/Collective Action Claims and Staying PAGA Claim Pending Completion of Arbitration #10 . The parties are to file a joint status report every 90 days with the first status report due 8/3/2020. (See Order for Specifics). (jp)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION REGARDING SELECTION of Panel Mediator filed. Parties stipulate that Robert Coviello may serve as Panel Mediator. Plaintiff obtained the Panel Mediators consent to serve. All parties and the Panel Mediator have agreed that the mediation will be held on 7/21/2020 and counsel will submit mediation statements seven (7) calendar days before the session. Filed by Plaintiff David Farrell(Hamner, Christopher)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company, identifying BJs Restaurant Operations Company. (Lewis, Bryanne)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending to Arbitrate Plaintiff's Individual Claims, Dismissing Class/Collective Action Claims, and Staying PAGA Claim Pending Completion of Arbitration filed by Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - BJ's Mutual Arbitration Agreement, #2 Proposed Order)(Attorney Bryanne Lewis added to party BJ's Restaurant Operations Company(pty:dft))(Lewis, Bryanne)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff David Farrell, upon Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company served on 5/6/2020, answer due 5/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jesse Gastelum, Agent, National Registered Agents, Inc. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Hamner, Christopher)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening. The following error(s) was found: No Notice of Interested Parties has been filed. A Notice of Interested Parties must be filed with every partys first appearance. See Local Rule 7.1-1. Counsel must file a Notice of Interested Parties immediately. Failure to do so may be addressed by judicial action, including sanctions. See Local Rule 83-7. (jtil)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant BJ's Restaurant Operations Company. (jtil)
April 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
April 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (jtil)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. (Hamner, Christopher)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. (Hamner, Christopher)
April 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26217502 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff David Farrell. (Attorney Christopher J Hamner added to party David Farrell(pty:pla))(Hamner, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: David Farrell v. BJ's Restaurant Operations Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJS RESTAURANT OPERATIONS COMPANY
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BJ's Restaurant Operations Company
Represented By: Matthew Martin Sonne
Represented By: Bryanne Lewis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Farrell
Represented By: Christopher J Hamner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Alternative dispute resolution (adr) provider: Robert D Coviello
Represented By: Robert Dominick Coviello
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?