Olivia Van Iderstine et al v. Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Olivia Van Iderstine and Mitch Oberstein
Defendant: Ticketmaster LLC and Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv03888
Filed: April 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Gail J Standish
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Anti-Trust
Cause of Action: 15:0001
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 25, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Response as to MOTION for Discovery regarding Whether a Valid Arbitration Agreement Exists #29 , NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #25 filed by Plaintiffs Mitch Oberstein, Olivia Van Iderstine. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Adam Wolfson, #2 Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Adam)
June 24, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Discovery regarding Whether a Valid Arbitration Agreement Exists filed by Plaintiffs Mitch Oberstein, Olivia Van Iderstine. Motion set for hearing on 8/3/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Proposed Order)(Wolfson, Adam)
June 19, 2020 Filing 28 DECLARATION of Timothy L. O'Mara in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #25 filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(O'Mara, Timothy)
June 19, 2020 Filing 27 DECLARATION of Shawn Moon in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #25 filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (O'Mara, Timothy)
June 19, 2020 Filing 26 DECLARATION of Kimberly Tobias in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration #25 filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24, #25 Exhibit 25, #26 Exhibit 26, #27 Exhibit 27, #28 Exhibit 28, #29 Exhibit 29, #30 Exhibit 30, #31 Exhibit 31, #32 Exhibit 32, #33 Exhibit 33, #34 Exhibit 34, #35 Exhibit 35, #36 Exhibit 36, #37 Exhibit 37, #38 Exhibit 38, #39 Exhibit 39, #40 Exhibit 40, #41 Exhibit 41, #42 Exhibit 42, #43 Exhibit 43, #44 Exhibit 44, #45 Exhibit 45, #46 Exhibit 46, #47 Exhibit 47, #48 Exhibit 48, #49 Exhibit 49, #50 Exhibit 50, #51 Exhibit 51)(O'Mara, Timothy) Modified on 6/22/2020 (jag).
June 19, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2020 at 08:30 AM before Judge George H. Wu. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (O'Mara, Timothy)
June 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER ON JOINT STIPULATION SETTING BRIEFING SCHEDULE #23 by Judge George H. Wu. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the Joint Stipulation is GRANTED. The Court orders as follows: a. Defendants shall file their motion to compel arbitration on or before June 19, 2020. b. Plaintiffs shall file any opposition on or before July 17, 2020. c. Defendants shall file any reply on or before July 31, 2020. d. Any hearing on Defendants' motion to compel arbitration shall be held as the Court's calendar allows. e. Defendants need not otherwise respond to the Complaint while their motion to compel arbitration is pending. See order for details. (lom)
May 29, 2020 Filing 23 Joint STIPULATION for Order Setting Briefing Schedule filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Timothy L. O'Mara, #2 Proposed Order)(O'Mara, Timothy)
May 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu. (lom)
May 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:18-cv-09052 GW(GJSx). Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to Judge George H. Wu for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-03888 GW(GJSx). Signed by Judge George H. Wu (rn)
May 6, 2020 Filing 20 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Olivia Van Iderstine, Mitch Oberstein, upon Defendant Ticketmaster LLC served on 5/1/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Krystal Parker, Authorized Employee at Corporate Creations Networks, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wolfson, Adam)
May 6, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Olivia Van Iderstine, Mitch Oberstein, upon Defendant Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. served on 5/1/2020, answer due 6/19/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Krystal Parker, Authorized Employee at Corporate Creations Networks, Inc., Registered Agent in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Wolfson, Adam)
May 6, 2020 Filing 18 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Ticketmaster LLC answer now due 6/19/2020; Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. answer now due 6/19/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants Ticketmaster LLC; Live Nation Entertainment, Inc..(O'Mara, Timothy)
May 3, 2020 Filing 17 REPLY filed by Plaintiffs Mitch Oberstein, Olivia Van Iderstine to Response #16 Reply Regarding Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Cases (Wolfson, Adam)
May 1, 2020 Filing 16 RESPONSE filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (Defendants' Response to Plaintiffs' Notice of Related Cases #9 ) (O'Mara, Timothy)
May 1, 2020 Filing 15 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (O'Mara, Timothy)
May 1, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC, identifying Liberty Media Corporation. (O'Mara, Timothy)
May 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Christopher B Campbell on behalf of Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (Attorney Christopher B Campbell added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Christopher B Campbell added to party Ticketmaster LLC(pty:dft))(Campbell, Christopher)
May 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andrew Michael Gass on behalf of Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (Attorney Andrew Michael Gass added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Michael Gass added to party Ticketmaster LLC(pty:dft))(Gass, Andrew)
May 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy L O'Mara on behalf of Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (Attorney Timothy L O'Mara added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Timothy L O'Mara added to party Ticketmaster LLC(pty:dft))(O'Mara, Timothy)
May 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Daniel M Wall on behalf of Defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC (Attorney Daniel M Wall added to party Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Daniel M Wall added to party Ticketmaster LLC(pty:dft))(Wall, Daniel)
April 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Olivia Van Iderstine. Related Case(s): 2:15-cv-09814-DSF-AGR 2:18-cv-09052-GW-GJS (Wolfson, Adam)
April 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (See document for details) (mrgo)
April 29, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster LLC. (esa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
April 29, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
April 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Mitch Oberstein, Olivia Van Iderstine, (Wolfson, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiffs Mitch Oberstein, Olivia Van Iderstine. (Wolfson, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Mitch Oberstein, Olivia Van Iderstine. (Wolfson, Adam)
April 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26258067 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs Olivia Van Iderstine, Mitch Oberstein. (Attorney Adam B Wolfson added to party Mitch Oberstein(pty:pla), Attorney Adam B Wolfson added to party Olivia Van Iderstine(pty:pla))(Wolfson, Adam)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Olivia Van Iderstine et al v. Live Nation Entertainment, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ticketmaster LLC
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Timothy L O'Mara
Represented By: Daniel M Wall
Represented By: Christopher B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By: Andrew Michael Gass
Represented By: Timothy L O'Mara
Represented By: Daniel M Wall
Represented By: Christopher B Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Olivia Van Iderstine
Represented By: Adam B Wolfson
Represented By: Kevin Y Teruya
Represented By: Frederick A Lorig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mitch Oberstein
Represented By: Adam B Wolfson
Represented By: Kevin Y Teruya
Represented By: Frederick A Lorig
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?