Daniel O'Connor v. Warner Bros. Animation Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Connor
Defendant: Warner Bros. Animation Inc., Does 1 through 100 inclusive and Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv03980
Filed: April 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER DISMISSING ACTION ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by Judge Cormac J. Carney. The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been resolved by a Notice of Voluntary Dismissal #13 , hereby orders this action dismissed without prejudice. The Court hereby orders all proceedings in the case vacated and taken off calendar. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
June 10, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Daniel O'Connor. Dismissal is without prejudice. (Van Vleck, Brian)
May 22, 2020 Filing 12 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #11 filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
May 22, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/29/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Cormac J. Carney. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jane Lee, #2 Proposed Order) (Luevano, Emma)
May 7, 2020 Filing 10 Joint STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Warner Bros. Animation Inc. answer now due 5/22/2020, filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc..(Luevano, Emma)
May 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Cormac J. Carney for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-03980 CJC(ASx). (rn)
May 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (jtil)
May 4, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (jtil)
May 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Compliance Re Removal filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
April 30, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Daniel O'Connor in Los Angeles Superior Court on 3/23/2020, attached as Exhibit 3. (jtil)
April 30, 2020 Filing 5 DECLARATION of Jane Lee re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
April 30, 2020 Filing 4 DECLARATION of Emma Luevano re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening),, #2 filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
April 30, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc., identifying Warner Bros. Entertainment Inc. and AT&T Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)
April 30, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20BBCV00239 with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 04/30/2020, receipt number ACACDC-26286783), filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Case Cover Sheet, #3 Complaint, #4 Notice of Case Assignment, #5 Notice of Case Management Conference, #6 Order to Show Cause for Failure to File Proof of Service, #7 Proof of Personal Service on Warner Bros. Animation Inc.) (Attorney Emma Luevano added to party Warner Bros. Animation Inc.(pty:dft))(Luevano, Emma)
April 30, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Warner Bros. Animation Inc.. (Luevano, Emma)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Daniel O'Connor v. Warner Bros. Animation Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Daniel O'Connor
Represented By: Stuart Harris Kluft
Represented By: Brian F Van Vleck
Represented By: Daniel John Turner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warner Bros. Animation Inc.
Represented By: Emma Luevano
Represented By: Louise Truong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 100 inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?