Jose Gonzalez Vega v. Patrick H. Lobdell et al
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez Vega
Defendant: CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC., Patrick H. Lobdell and Does 1 to 30
Case Number: 2:2020cv04101
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Andre Birotte
Referring Judge: Rozella A Oliver
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 26 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Richard W Vanis, Jr counsel for Counter Claimants CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., Patrick H. Lobdell, Defendants CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., Patrick H. Lobdell. Ashton L. McKinnon is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant and Counter Claimant Patrick H. Lobdell and CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc.. (Vanis, Richard)
July 1, 2020 Filing 25 Notice of Electronic Filing re Notice of Clerical Error (G-11), #21 , Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #19 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #22 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #23 , Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #20 , Answer to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), Counterclaim #24 e-mailed to amckinnon@mvjllp.com bounced due to 5.1.0 - Unknown address error 550-'5.1.1 <: Recipient address rejected: User unknown'. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ew) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 29, 2020 Filing 24 ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #19 , COUNTERCLAIM against Jose Gonzalez Vega filed by Defendants and Counter-Claimants Patrick H. Lobdell, CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc..(Vanis, Richard)
June 29, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #19 . The following error(s) was/were found: This appears to be a duplicative filing to document number 18, filed 6/25/2020. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 29, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Other Complaint Filings > Amended Complaint. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Local Rule 19-1 Complaint/Petition includes more than 10 Does or fictitiously named parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 29, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR Re: Notice to Filer of Deficiencies in Electronically Filed Documents filed 6/29/2020 #20 . Due to clerical error, an incomplete form was attached to the docket entry. Clerk shall re-issue the G-112A Form electronically. (gk)
June 29, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #18 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Other Complaint Filings > Amended Complaint. Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Local Rule 19-1 Complaint/Petition includes more than 10 Does or fictitiously named parties. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 26, 2020 Filing 19 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 05/27/2020, receipt number 26583506), filed by Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez Vega.(Guerrero, Alex)
June 25, 2020 Filing 18 COMPLAINT with filing fee previously paid ($400 paid on 05/27/2020, receipt number 26583506), filed by Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez Vega.(Guerrero, Alex)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order Striking Third Amended Complaint and Answer by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: The Court hereby STRIKES Plaintiff's Third Amended Complaint #11 as it is incorrectly captioned, and should instead be captioned "Second Amended Complaint." For the same incorrect captioning, the Court also STRIKES Defendant's Answer #15 . The Court ORDERS the Plaintiff to file the Second Amended Complaint, and Defendant to file Answer and Counterclaim to Plaintiff's Second Amended Complaint by 6/29/2020. Court Reporter: N/A. (gk)
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Scheduling Conference set for 9/18/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 17, 2020 Filing 15 * STRICKEN * ANSWER to Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 , COUNTERCLAIM against Jose Gonzalez Vega filed by Defendants Patrick H. Lobdell, CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc..(McKinnon, Ashton) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE CIVIL MINUTES OF 6/24/2020 #17 ** Modified on 6/24/2020 (gk).
June 5, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Miscellaneous Document #12 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Notice of Association of Counsel.. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (ak)
May 27, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #11 . The following error(s) was/were found: The docket does not reflect the opposing party's consent nor leave of court to amend, F.R.Civ.P. 15(a)(2). In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
May 27, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Association of Counsel filed by Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez Vega (Guerrero, Alex)
May 27, 2020 Filing 11 * STRICKEN * COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26583506 - Fee: $400, filed by Jose Gonzalez Vega Jose Gonzalez Vega. (Attorney Alex D Guerrero added to party Jose Gonzalez Vega(pty:pla))(Guerrero, Alex) ** DOCUMENT STRICKEN PURSUANT TO THE CIVIL MINUTES OF 6/24/2020 #17 ** Modified on 6/24/2020 (gk).
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND DEADLINE FOR DEFENDANTS' RESPONSE TO PLAINTIFF'S FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Andre Birotte Jr.: Upon Stipulation #9 , the Court ORDERS that Plaintiff shall file and serve his revised pleading in accordance with this Court's Standing Order by 6/5/2020 and upon receipt, Defendants shall serve an Answer within 21 days after service of the summons and complaint pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 12(a)(1)(A)(i). Plaintiff shall not initiate default proceedings against Defendants based upon the 5/12/2020 initial deadline for Defendants' answer pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 81(c)(2). (gk)
May 11, 2020 Filing 9 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Defendants' Response to Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendants CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., Patrick H. Lobdell. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(McKinnon, Ashton)
May 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
May 6, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 6, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Rozella A. Oliver. (car)
May 5, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants CRST Lincoln Sales, Inc., Does 1 to 30, Patrick H. Lobdell amending Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez Vega. Filed in State Court on 4/6/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 5, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants CRST Lincoln Sawes, Inc., Does 1 to 30, Patrick H. Lobdell, filed by Plaintiff Jose Gonzalez Vega. Filed in State Court on 9/9/19 Submitted with Attachment 1 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 5, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Pendency of Other Actions filed by Defendants CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC., Patrick H. Lobdell. (McKinnon, Ashton)
May 5, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendants CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC., Patrick H. Lobdell. (McKinnon, Ashton)
May 5, 2020 Filing 3 DEMAND for Jury Trial filed by Defendants CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC., Patrick H. Lobdell.. (McKinnon, Ashton)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC., Patrick H. Lobdell, identifying Jose Gonzalez Vega. (McKinnon, Ashton)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 19STCV33292 Receipt No: ACACDC-26336573 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Patrick H. Lobdell, CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint, #2 Exhibit POS Lobdell, #3 Exhibit FAC, #4 Exhibit CHP TCR, #5 Exhibit SOS Search CRST, #6 Exhibit Cert of Title CRST) (Attorney Ashton Leslie McKinnon added to party CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC.(pty:dft), Attorney Ashton Leslie McKinnon added to party Patrick H. Lobdell(pty:dft))(McKinnon, Ashton)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jose Gonzalez Vega v. Patrick H. Lobdell et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRST LINCOLN SALES, INC.
Represented By: Ashton Leslie McKinnon
Represented By: Kevin L Place
Represented By: Richard W Vanis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick H. Lobdell
Represented By: Ashton Leslie McKinnon
Represented By: Kevin L Place
Represented By: Richard W Vanis, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 30
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jose Gonzalez Vega
Represented By: Giancarlo J Mendez
Represented By: Alex D. Guerrero
Represented By: Michael Anthony Sanchez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?