Stephen Plum et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar, Richard Miller, William Oliver, Morgan Bailey, Steven E Moyer, Stephen Plum and Steven Moyer
Defendant: Medtronic Minimed, Inc. and Medtronic, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04120
Filed: May 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #14 , the Court hereby orders that the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sever #7 is rescheduled to 7/24/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (gk)
June 30, 2020 Filing 18 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Ilana H. Eisenstein to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27013140) filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Pigott, Ginger)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 MEMORANDUM in Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff #7 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Tabura, Richard)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b), 8(a), and 9(b) #15 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Tabura, Richard)
June 26, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case Pursuant to FRCP 12(b), 8(a), and 9(b) filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 7/24/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points & Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Tabura, Richard)
June 22, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION to Continue Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sever from July 10, 2020 to July 24, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff #7 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Tabura, Richard)
June 16, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF ERRATA TO PLAINTIFFS MEMORANDUM OF LAW IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.S MOTION TO SEVER filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar. (Zaic, Julia)
June 12, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff #7 filed by Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Zaic, Julia)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER CONTINUING THE HEARING ON MEDTRONIC MINIMED, INC. AND MEDTRONIC, INC.'S MOTION TO SEVER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #8 , the hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sever #7 is rescheduled to 7/10/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. Plaintiffs' Opposition shall be due 6/12/2020. Defendants' Reply shall be due on 6/26/2020. (gk)
June 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Haverty to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Stephen Plum, William Oliver, Steven Moyer, Morgan Bailey, Pamela Weisshar, Richard Miller, and Jennifer Topel, designating Julia Reed Zaic as local counsel #9 . (gk)
June 3, 2020 Filing 9 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Kevin Haverty to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26673042) filed by Attorney for Plaintiffs Morgan Bailey, Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, William Oliver, Stephen Plum, Jennifer Topel, Pamela Weisshar. (Zaic, Julia)
June 2, 2020 Filing 8 STIPULATION to Continue Motion to Sever from June 26, 2020 to July 10, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff #7 filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Continuing the Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Sever)(Tabura, Richard)
May 29, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Sever the Claims Asserted by Each Individual Plaintiff filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 6/26/2020 at 09:30 AM before Judge Dolly M. Gee. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Sever, #2 Proposed Order Granting Defendants' Motion to Sever) (Tabura, Richard)
May 21, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Medtronic, Inc. answer now due 6/26/2020; Medtronic Minimed, Inc. answer now due 6/26/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery), filed by Defendants Medtronic, Inc.; Medtronic Minimed, Inc..(Tabura, Richard)
May 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
May 6, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 6, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (lh)
May 5, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc. Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Richard Miller, Steven Moyer, Jennifer Topel, William Oliver, Morgan Bailey, Stephen Plum, Pamela Weisshar. (FILED IN LOS ANGELES COUNTY SUPERIOR COURT ON 4/20/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF REMOVAL #1 ) (lh)
May 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Medtronic Minimed, Inc., Medtronic, Inc., (Tabura, Richard)
May 5, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from California, case number 20STCV15293 Receipt No: ACACDC-26342107 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendants Medtronic, Inc., Medtronic Minimed, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 and 2, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (Attorney Richard R Tabura added to party Medtronic Minimed, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Richard R Tabura added to party Medtronic, Inc.(pty:dft))(Tabura, Richard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Stephen Plum et al v. Medtronic, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jennifer Topel
Represented By: Laura Smith
Represented By: Julia Reed Zaic
Represented By: Kevin Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Pamela Weisshar
Represented By: Laura Smith
Represented By: Julia Reed Zaic
Represented By: Kevin Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard Miller
Represented By: Laura Smith
Represented By: Julia Reed Zaic
Represented By: Kevin Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Oliver
Represented By: Laura Smith
Represented By: Julia Reed Zaic
Represented By: Kevin Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Morgan Bailey
Represented By: Laura Smith
Represented By: Julia Reed Zaic
Represented By: Kevin Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven E Moyer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Plum
Represented By: Laura Smith
Represented By: Julia Reed Zaic
Represented By: Kevin Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Moyer
Represented By: Laura Smith
Represented By: Julia Reed Zaic
Represented By: Kevin Haverty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic Minimed, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R Tabura
Represented By: Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott
Represented By: Thomas Richard Pack
Represented By: Ilana H Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Medtronic, Inc.
Represented By: Richard R Tabura
Represented By: Ginger Florence Heyman Pigott
Represented By: Thomas Richard Pack
Represented By: Ilana H Eisenstein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?