Susan Baker et al v. Dean Meiling et al
Plaintiff: Leonard A. Semas, Jim Kless, Ed Quintal, Clint Hubbard, Vicki Mills, Jim Bradt, Donna Hagens, Warren E. Sisson Jr., George Burkhardt, Ray Weismann, Bruce Boston, Elaine Grand, Kenneth Kuhn, Buel Barnett, Sandra R. Price, Martha B. Sisson, Alan P. Wolochuk, Caroll Burkhardt, Linda Kane, Stephen Gran, Brenda Canaris, Stanley Groen, Lawrence Lehner, James L. Murphy, Dorothy D. Shelley, Christine Eckhout, Carolyn Noyes, Eleanor Weismann, Kathryn Kuhn, Joseph Sims, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Larry Smith, Joan Dotson, Anke Hagedorn, Diane Smith, Lee Sadeg, Joan Dietrich, Giovanna Schenini, Roger B. Fosdick, Karen Y. Mallory, Susan Baker, Bonnie Bradt, Maria Groen, William Noyes, Richard L. Shelley, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Jim W. Edwards III, David Kane, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher and Mary France Gomez
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive, DSM P GP LLC, Janet Chubb, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, Dean Meiling, James Proctor, Suite B, LLC, Meridian Advantage, Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Madylon Meiling, Armstrong Teasdale, LLP and Tiffany Schwartz
Case Number: 2:2020cv04335
Filed: May 13, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Karen E Scott
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 11, 2020 Filing 32 DECLARATION of Marc Lazo In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 Special Motion to Strike filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
July 11, 2020 Filing 31 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case #30 Special Motion to Strike filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F)(Lazo, Marc)
July 10, 2020 Filing 30 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Motion set for hearing on 11/6/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Lazo, Marc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 29 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CounterClaim #28 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3)(Lazo, Marc)
June 30, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss CounterClaim filed by Plaintiff/CounterClaim Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Motion set for hearing on 10/30/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo) (Lazo, Marc)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER (1) DENYING Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Advance hearing Date (Doc. #24 ) and (2) CONTINUING Hearing on Defendants' Motion to Transfer (Doc. #13 ) by Judge Josephine L. Staton: Plaintiffs' Application is DENIED. Instead, the Court continues the hearing on Defendants' motion to transfer venue from 8/14/2020, at 10:30 AM., to 9/11/2020 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
June 26, 2020 Filing 26 REPLY Reply in Support Of EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Remand from September 11, 2020 to a date prior to August 14, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 #24 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Lazo, Marc)
June 26, 2020 Filing 25 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Remand from September 11, 2020 to a date prior to August 14, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 #24 Defendants' Joint Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application to Advance the Hearing Date on the Motion to Remand filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Hodel, Matthew)
June 25, 2020 Filing 24 EX PARTE APPLICATION to Continue Motion to Remand from September 11, 2020 to a date prior to August 14, 2020 Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Marc Lazo, #2 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Lazo, Marc)
June 24, 2020 Filing 23 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Plaintiffs, re Answer to Complaint (Discovery),,,, Counterclaim,,, #16 filed by Plaintiffs James L. Murphy, Vicki Mills, Stanley Groen, Kathleen Delle Donne, Caroll Burkhardt, Karen Y. Mallory, Linda Kane, Bonnie Bradt, Eleanor Weismann, Elaine Grand, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Martha B. Sisson, Alan P. Wolochuk, Jim Kless, Ed Quintal, Carolyn Noyes, Clint Hubbard, Maria Groen, Larry Smith, William Noyes, Jim Bradt, Sandra R. Price, Christine Eckhout, Kenneth Kuhn, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Ray Weismann, Stephen Gran, Kathryn Kuhn, Susan Baker, David Kane, George Burkhardt, Lee Sadeg, Jim W. Edwards III, Bruce Boston, Richard L. Shelley, Lawrence Lehner, Roger B. Fosdick, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Nancy J. Wolochuk, Dorothy D. Shelley, Brenda Canaris, Buel Barnett, Mary France Gomez, Leonard A. Semas, Anke Hagedorn, Joseph Sims, Stan Canaris, Donna Hagens, Giovanna Schenini, Diane Smith.(Lazo, Marc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court #21 filed by Counter Defendants Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Lazo, Marc)
June 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Remand Case to Los Angeles Superior Court filed by Plaintiffs Susan Baker, Buel Barnett, Bruce Boston, Bonnie Bradt, Jim Bradt, Caroll Burkhardt, George Burkhardt, Brenda Canaris, Stan Canaris, Kathleen Delle Donne, Joan Dietrich, Joan Dotson, Christine Eckhout, Jim W. Edwards III, Roger B. Fosdick, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Mary France Gomez, Stephen Gran, Elaine Grand, Maria Groen, Stanley Groen, Anke Hagedorn, Donna Hagens, Clint Hubbard, David Kane, Linda Kane, Jim Kless, Kathryn Kuhn, Kenneth Kuhn, Lawrence Lehner, Karen Y. Mallory, Vicki Mills, James L. Murphy, Carolyn Noyes, William Noyes, Sandra R. Price, Ed Quintal, Lee Sadeg, Giovanna Schenini, Leonard A. Semas, Dorothy D. Shelley, Richard L. Shelley, Joseph Sims, Martha B. Sisson, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Diane Smith, Larry Smith, Eleanor Weismann, Ray Weismann, Alan P. Wolochuk, Nancy J. Wolochuk. Motion set for hearing on 9/11/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Marc Harris, #2 Declaration Marc Lazo) (Lazo, Marc)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER GRANTING Joint Stipulation to Continue July 10, 2020 Scheduling Conference to September 11, 2020 #19 by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the Scheduling Conference scheduled for 7/10/2020 at 10:30 AM., shall be continued to 9/11/2020 at 10:30 AM. (jp)
June 4, 2020 Filing 19 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Scheduling Conference from July 10, 2020 to September 11, 2020 filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Joint Stipulation to Continue July 10, 2020 Scheduling Conference to September 11, 2020)(Merlo, Ashley)
May 26, 2020 Filing 18 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 filed by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, Suite B, LLC. (Donahey, Teague)
May 26, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendants Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, Suite B, LLC, identifying Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC. (Donahey, Teague)
May 26, 2020 Filing 16 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,, , COUNTERCLAIM against All Plaintiffs filed by Defendants Suite B, LLC, Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, Dean Meiling, DSM P GP LLC, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, DSM Partners, LP, Madylon Meiling. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Answer)(Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party DSM P GP LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party DSM Partners, LP(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Dean Meiling(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Madylon Meiling(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Meiling Family Partners, LTD(pty:dft), Attorney Teague I Donahey added to party Suite B, LLC(pty:dft))(Donahey, Teague)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Josephine L. Staton. Scheduling Conference is set for 7/10/2020 at 10:30 a.m. See attached Order for details. (tg)
May 20, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada #13 filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Request For Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Request For Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Request For Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Request For Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Request For Judicial Notice, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F to Request For Judicial Notice, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G to Request For Judicial Notice, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H to Request For Judicial Notice, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I to Request For Judicial Notice, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J to Request For Judicial Notice, #11 Exhibit Exhibit K to Request For Judicial Notice)(Hodel, Matthew)
May 20, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Transfer Case to U.S. District Court of Nevada filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. Motion set for hearing on 8/14/2020 at 10:30 AM before Judge Josephine L. Staton. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #2 Declaration Declaration of Ashley E. Merlo in Support of Motion to Transfer Venue, #3 Exhibit Exhibit A to Declaration of Ashley E. Merlo) (Hodel, Matthew)
May 20, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,, Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Janet Chubb and Tiffany Schwartz's Answer to Complaint filed by Specially Appearing Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP.(Hodel, Matthew)
May 20, 2020 Filing 11 INITIAL STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOSEPHINE L. STATON. (tg)
May 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:18-cv-02073 JLS(KESx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar to Judge Josephine L. Staton and Magistrate Judge Karen E. Scott for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04335 JLS(KESx). Signed by Judge Josephine L. Staton (rn)
May 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
May 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (car)
May 13, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC, Janet Chubb, DSM P GP LLC, DSM Partners, LP, Does 1-100, inclusive, Dean Meiling, Madylon Meiling, Meiling Family Partners, LTD, Meridian Advantage, James Proctor, Tiffany Schwartz, Suite B, LLC, filed by Plaintiffs James L. Murphy, Vicki Mills, Stanley Groen, Caroll Burkhardt, Linda Kane, Elaine Grand, Fumiko Fosdick Fisher, Martha B. Sisson, Jim Kless, Maria Groen, Christine Eckhout, Karen Y. Mallory, William Noyes, Kathleen Delle Donne, Ray Weismann, Kathryn Kuhn, Alan P. Wolochuk, Lee Sadeg, Richard L. Shelley, Joan Dietrich, Roger B. Fosdick, Warren E. Sisson Jr., Stephen Gran, Buel Barnett, Mary France Gomez, Susan Baker, Lawrence Lehner, David Kane, Kenneth Kuhn, Leonard A. Semas, Jim W. Edwards III, Eleanor Weismann, Clint Hubbard, Anke Hagedorn, Dorothy D. Shelley, Larry Smith, Donna Hagens, Joan Dotson, George Burkhardt, Bruce Boston, Sandra R. Price, Stan Canaris, Nancy J. Wolochuk, Diane Smith, Brenda Canaris, Giovanna Schenini, Jim Bradt, Carolyn Noyes, Ed Quintal, Joseph Sims, Bonnie Bradt. Filed in State Court on 2/6/2020 Submitted with Attachment 3 Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal #1 (car)
May 13, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, served on May 13, 2020. (Hodel, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE Request For Judicial Notice In Support of Notice of Removal filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A to Request For Judicial Notice, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B to Request For Judicial Notice, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C to Request For Judicial Notice, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D to Request For Judicial Notice, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E to Request For Judicial Notice)(Hodel, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE Notice of Pendency of Actions or Proceedings filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Hodel, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. Related Case(s): 8:18-cv-02073-JLS-KES; 8:19-cv-00595-JLS-SEM (Hodel, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP, identifying SUSAN BAKER, an individual; BUEL BARNETT, an individual; BRUCE BOSTON, an individual; JIM BRADT, an individual; BONNIE BRADT, an individual; GEORGE BURKHARDT, an individual; CAROLL BURKHARDT, an individual; BRENDA CANARIS, an individual; STAN CANARIS, an individual; CHRISTINE ECKHOUT, an individual; KATHLEEN DELLE DONNE, an individual; JOAN DIETRICH, an individual; JOAN DOTSON, an individual; JIM W. EDWARDS III, an individual; ROGER B. FOSDICK, an individual; FUMIKO FOSDICK-FISHER, an individual; MARY FRANCE GOMEZ, an individual; ELAINE GRAND, an individual; STEPHEN GRAN, an individual; MARIA GROEN, an individual; STANLEY GROEN, an individual; ANKE HAGEDORN, an individual; DONNA HAGENS, an individual; CLINT HUBBARD, an individual; DAVID KANE, an individual; LINDA KANE, an individual; JIM KLESS, an individual; KENNETH KUHN, an individual; KATHRYN KUHN, an individual; LAWRENCE LEHNER, an individual; KAREN Y. MALLORY, an individual; VICKI MILLS, an individual; JAMES L. MURPHY, an individual; CAROLYN NOYES, an individual; WILLIAM NOYES, an individual; SANDRA R. PRICE, an individual; ED QUINTAL, an individual; GIOVANNA SCHENINI, an individual; LEE SADEG, an individual; LEONARD A. SEMAS, an individual; RICHARD L. SHELLEY, an individual; DOROTHY D. SHELLEY, an individual; JOSEPH SIMS, an individual; MARTHA B. SISSON, an individual; WARREN E. SISSON, JR., an individual; LARRY SMITH, an individual; DIANE SMITH, an individual; RAY WEISMANN, an individual; ELEANOR WEISMANN, an individual; ALAN P. WOLOCHUK, an individual; NANCY J. WOLOCHUK, an individual, DEAN MEILING, an individual; MADYLON MEILING, an individual; MEILING FAMILY PARTNERS, LTD; JAMES PROCTOR, an individual; JANET CHUBB, an individual; TIFFANY SCHWARTZ, an individual; CHEMEON SURFACE TECHNOLOGY, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company; DSM PARTNERS, LP, a Nevada Limited Partnership; DSM P GP LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company; ARMSTRONG TEASDALE, LLP, a Missouri Limited Liability Partnership; MERIDIAN ADVANTAGE, an unknown entity; SUITE B, LLC, a Nevada Limited Liability Company, and Attorneys' Liability Assurance Society. (Hodel, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Hodel, Matthew)
May 13, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles Superior Court, case number 20STCV05126 Receipt No: ACACDC-26434522 - Fee: $400, filed by defendant Armstrong Teasdale, LLP. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Notice of Removal, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Notice of Removal, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Notice of Removal) (Attorney Matthew A Hodel added to party Armstrong Teasdale, LLP(pty:dft))(Hodel, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Susan Baker et al v. Dean Meiling et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leonard A. Semas
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Kless
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ed Quintal
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Clint Hubbard
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vicki Mills
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim Bradt
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donna Hagens
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Warren E. Sisson Jr.
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Burkhardt
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ray Weismann
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bruce Boston
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elaine Grand
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kenneth Kuhn
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Buel Barnett
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra R. Price
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Martha B. Sisson
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Alan P. Wolochuk
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Caroll Burkhardt
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Linda Kane
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stephen Gran
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brenda Canaris
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stanley Groen
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lawrence Lehner
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James L. Murphy
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dorothy D. Shelley
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Christine Eckhout
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Carolyn Noyes
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eleanor Weismann
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathryn Kuhn
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joseph Sims
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Stan Canaris
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Delle Donne
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry Smith
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Dotson
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Anke Hagedorn
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Diane Smith
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lee Sadeg
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan Dietrich
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giovanna Schenini
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roger B. Fosdick
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Karen Y. Mallory
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Susan Baker
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bonnie Bradt
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Groen
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: William Noyes
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Richard L. Shelley
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy J. Wolochuk
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jim W. Edwards III
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Kane
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fumiko Fosdick Fisher
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary France Gomez
Represented By: Marc Y Lazo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-100, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSM P GP LLC
Represented By: Teague I Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Janet Chubb
Represented By: Matthew A Hodel
Represented By: Ashley E Merlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meiling Family Partners, LTD
Represented By: Teague I Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Meiling
Represented By: Teague I Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: James Proctor
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suite B, LLC
Represented By: Teague I Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Meridian Advantage
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chemeon Surface Technology, LLC
Represented By: Teague I Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DSM Partners, LP
Represented By: Teague I Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Madylon Meiling
Represented By: Teague I Donahey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong Teasdale, LLP
Represented By: Matthew A Hodel
Represented By: Ashley E Merlo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tiffany Schwartz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?