Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists v. Bounty Killer, LLC
Petitioner: Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
Respondent: Bounty Killer, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04354
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 10 JUDGMENT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, in favor of Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists against Bounty Killer, LLC in the principal amount of $14,243.36, interest in the amount of $0.00, attorneys fees of $2,400.00, costs of $400.00 for a total judgment of $17,043.36. (MD JS-6, Case Terminated). (shb)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further details. (shb)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING NOTICE BY TEXT ONLY ENTRY (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: On the Court's own motion, The Motion for Order Confirming Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith #1 set for hearing June 15, 2020, is hereby taken off calendar, hearing date is vacated and will be decided without oral argument. No appearances necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 21, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, re Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #2 , Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #3 served on May 15, 2020. (Kokish, Iris)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF HEARING on Motion for Order Confirming Arbitration Award and for Entry of Judgment in Conformity Therewith; Memorandum of Points and Authorities; and Declaration of Iris R Kokish in Support of Thereof by Clerk of Court. Counsel is hereby notified that the Application/Motion/Request (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 is set for hearing. Motion set for hearing on 6/15/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ghap) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Kokish, Iris)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists, (Kokish, Iris)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION FOR ORDER CONFIRMING ARBITRATION AWARD AND FOR ENTRY OF JUDGMENT IN CONFORMITY THEREWITH; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; AND DECLARATION OF IRIS R. KOKISH IN SUPPORT THEREOF Receipt No: ACACDC-26442518 - Fee: $400, filed by petitioner Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Proposed Order) (Attorney Iris R Kokish added to party Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists(pty:pet))(Kokish, Iris)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists v. Bounty Killer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Screen Actors Guild - American Federation of Television and Radio Artists
Represented By: Iris R Kokish
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Bounty Killer, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?