Lamonte Sims v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lamonte Sims and Duse M
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc., Soundcloud Inc., Does 1 through 50, inclusive and YouTube, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04389
Filed: May 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Alka Sagar
Referring Judge: George H Wu
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17 U.S.C. ยง 501
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 25, 2020 Filing 13 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Lamonte Sims. (Lum, A)
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER RE FINAL PRE-TRIAL CONFERENCES FOR CIVIL JURY TRIALS by Judge George H. Wu. (et)
May 19, 2020 Filing 11 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Amazon.com, Inc., Soundcloud Inc., YouTube, LLC. (lom)
May 18, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lamonte Sims. (Lum, A)
May 18, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lamonte Sims. (Lum, A)
May 15, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
May 15, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #3 . The following error(s) was found: Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (lh)
May 15, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 15, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge George H. Wu and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (lh)
May 15, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Lamonte Sims, (Lum, A)
May 14, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Lamonte Sims. (Lum, A)
May 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Lamonte Sims. (Lum, A)
May 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26451623 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Lamonte Sims. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B) (Attorney A Justin Lum added to party Lamonte Sims(pty:pla))(Lum, A)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lamonte Sims v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lamonte Sims
Represented By: Cindy N Tran
Represented By: A Justin Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Duse M
Represented By: Cindy N Tran
Represented By: A Justin Lum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Soundcloud Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 50, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: YouTube, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?