Torrance Memorial Medical Center et al v. Alex M. Azar, II
Plaintiff: Yavapai Regional Medical Center East, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Akron General Medical Center, Metrohealth Medical Center, Manchester Memorial Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, Central Maine Medical Center, Shannon Medical Center, Marin General Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center West, The Queen's Medical Center, University Medical Center of Southern Nevada, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, Rockville General Hospital, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, Baton Rouge General Medical Center and The Queens Medical Center
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Case Number: 2:2020cv04463
Filed: May 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Contract: Recovery Medicare
Cause of Action: 42:1395
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 13, 2020 Filing 10 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) -NEW CASE BEFORE JUDGE HATTER: This action has been assigned to the calendar of the HONORABLE TERRY J. HATTER, JR., United States District Judge. Please include the initials TJH in all documents pertaining to this case, as documents are routed using the judges initials, it is imperative that the correct initials TJH be used on all subsequent filings to prevent any delays in the processing of documents. Judge Hatter's Courtroom Deputy Clerk is Yolanda Skipper. She can be reached at (213) 894-5276. Counsel shall not attempt to contact the Court or its chambers staff by telephone or by any other ex parte means, although counsel may contact the Courtroom Deputy, Yolanda Skipper, at: yolanda_skipper@cacd.uscourts.gov, with appropriate inquiries. Judge Hatters courtroom is located on the 9th Floor, at 350 W. 1st Street, United States Courthouse, Courtroom No. 9B. See order for further details. (shb)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-03410 TJH(JPRx). Case transferred from Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04463 TJH(JPRx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn)
June 16, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff The Queens Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center West, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center of Southern Nevada, Shannon Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center East, Rockville General Hospital, Central Maine Medical Center, Akron General Medical Center, Metrohealth Medical Center, Marin General Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, Manchester Memorial Hospital, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, upon Defendant Alex M. Azar, II served on 6/15/2020, answer due 8/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Emily Sase. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Front Desk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Disbrow, Matthew)
May 19, 2020 Filing 7 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant Alex M. Azar, II. (ghap)
May 19, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
May 19, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (ghap)
May 18, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs All Plaintiffs, (Disbrow, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening),,,,,,,, #1 filed by Plaintiffs Akron General Medical Center, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Central Maine Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Manchester Memorial Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Metrohealth Medical Center, Rockville General Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queen's Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center of Southern Nevada, Yavapai Regional Medical Center East, Yavapai Regional Medical Center West. (Disbrow, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Akron General Medical Center, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Central Maine Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Manchester Memorial Hospital, Marin General Hospital, Metrohealth Medical Center, Rockville General Hospital, Shannon Medical Center, Sonoma Valley Hospital, The Queen's Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center of Southern Nevada, Yavapai Regional Medical Center East, Yavapai Regional Medical Center West. (Disbrow, Matthew)
May 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26476171 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiffs The Queen's Medical Center, Aspirus Wausau Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center West, Baton Rouge General Medical Center, Torrance Memorial Medical Center, University Medical Center of Southern Nevada, Shannon Medical Center, Lodi Memorial Hospital, Yavapai Regional Medical Center East, Rockville General Hospital, Central Maine Medical Center, Akron General Medical Center, Metrohealth Medical Center, Marin General Hospital, Sonoma Valley Hospital, Manchester Memorial Hospital, Arrowhead Regional Medical Center. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Akron General Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Arrowhead Regional Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Aspirus Wausau Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Baton Rouge General Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Central Maine Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Lodi Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Manchester Memorial Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Marin General Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Metrohealth Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Rockville General Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Shannon Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Sonoma Valley Hospital(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party The Queen's Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Torrance Memorial Medical Center(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party University Medical Center of Southern Nevada(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Yavapai Regional Medical Center East(pty:pla), Attorney Matthew Scott Disbrow added to party Yavapai Regional Medical Center West(pty:pla))(Disbrow, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Torrance Memorial Medical Center et al v. Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yavapai Regional Medical Center East
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aspirus Wausau Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lodi Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Akron General Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Metrohealth Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Manchester Memorial Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sonoma Valley Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Central Maine Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shannon Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marin General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Yavapai Regional Medical Center West
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Queen's Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: University Medical Center of Southern Nevada
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Torrance Memorial Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rockville General Hospital
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Arrowhead Regional Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Baton Rouge General Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: The Queens Medical Center
Represented By: Matthew Scott Disbrow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex M. Azar, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?