Lance Williams v. R. Farley et al
Plaintiff: Lance E Williams
Defendant: D. Arebalo, D. Davis, M. Williams, J. Graves and Correctional Officer R. Farley
Case Number: 2:2020cv04490
Filed: May 19, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato: granting #2 REQUEST for Leave to Proceed without Prepayment of Filing Fee.. IT IS FURTHER ORDERED that, in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915, the prisoner- plaintiff owes the Court the total filing fee of $350.00. An initial partial filing fee of $0.00 must be paid within thirty (30) days of the date this order is filed. Failure to remit the initial partial filing fee may result in dismissal of the case. Thereafter, monthly payments shall be forwarded to the Court in accordance with 28 U.S.C. 1915(b)(2). (dts)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 INITIAL CIVIL RIGHTS CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (dts)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Lance E Williams. (dts)
May 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER Failure to File Request to Proceed In Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights),, #1 if Plaintiff wishes to proceed with this lawsuit, within thirty (30) days of the date of this Order he must (1) pay the full $400.00 filing fee; (2) file a request for in forma pauperis status along with the necessary accompanying documents1; or (3) show cause in writing why he is unable to do so. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application 60P) (dts)
May 19, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (lh)
May 19, 2020 Filing 2 CDCR INMATE STATEMENT REPORT, filed by Plaintiff Lance Williams. (lh)
May 19, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants D. Arebalo(Lieutenant Corrections Officer, individual), D. Arebalo(Lieutenant Corrections Officer, official capacity), D. Davis(Classification Staff Representative, official capacity), D. Davis(Classification Staff Representative, individual), R. Farley(official capacity), R. Farley(individual ), J. Graves(AJ-Seg Correctional Officer, official capacity), J. Graves(AJ-Seg Correctional Officer, individual), M. Williams(Correctional Counselor Two, individual ), M. Williams(Correctional Counselor Two, official capacity) pursuant to 42:1983. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. Filed by Plaintiff Lance Williams. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lance Williams v. R. Farley et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Arebalo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J. Graves
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Correctional Officer R. Farley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lance E Williams
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?