Rhiannon Enriquez v. United States of America
Plaintiff: Rhiannon Enriquez
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Case Number: 2:2020cv04654
Filed: May 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1331
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 13, 2020 Filing 7 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rhiannon Enriquez, upon Defendant United States of America served on 6/8/2020, answer due 8/7/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Crystal Veloz. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Unknown. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Unknown. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certified Service)(Karlin, Marc)
May 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
May 26, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Attorney Case Opening RE: Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . The following error(s) was found: Other error(s) with document(s): Attachments No. 1 Summons, No. 2 Civil Cover Sheet and No. 3 Certificate should not have been attached to Docket Entry No. 1. Each document should have been filed separately. You are not required to take any action to correct this deficiency unless the Court so directs. (lh)
May 26, 2020 Filing 4 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendant United States of America. (lh)
May 26, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
May 26, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Stephen V. Wilson and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (lh)
May 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26547690 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rhiannon Enriquez. (Attachments: #1 Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Certificate) (Attorney Marc A Karlin added to party Rhiannon Enriquez (pty:pla))(Karlin, Marc)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rhiannon Enriquez v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rhiannon Enriquez
Represented By: Marc A Karlin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?