Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong et al v. Carnival Corporation & PLC et al
Plaintiff: Estate of Ronald Wong, Benjamin Wong and Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. and Carnival Corporation & PLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv04727
Filed: May 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Med. Malpractice
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Proposed Order) (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
July 10, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rica Santos counsel for Defendant Carnival Corporation & PLC. Adding Rica Santos as counsel of record for Carnival Corporation; Carnival PLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Carnival Corporation; Carnival PLC. (Attorney Rica Santos added to party Carnival Corporation & PLC(pty:dft))(Santos, Rica)
July 10, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Defendants Carnival Corporation & PLC. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge R. Gary Klausner. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Certificate of Service) (Nakamura, Angel)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-02267 RGK(SKx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian and Judge Dolly M. Gee to Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Steve Kim for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-04727 RGK(SKx). Signed by Judge R. Gary Klausner (rn)
June 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #15 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time to respond to the Complaint is extended by 30 days. The deadline for Defendants to file their responses is moved to 7/10/2020. (gk)
June 17, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. Related Case(s): 2:20-CV-02458; 2:20-CV-02267 (Maltzman, Jeffrey)
June 17, 2020 Filing 18 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Jonathan W Hughes counsel for Defendant Carnival Corporation & PLC. Adding Jonathan W. Hughes as counsel of record for Carnival Corporation & plc for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Carnival Corporation & plc. (Attorney Jonathan W Hughes added to party Carnival Corporation & PLC(pty:dft))(Hughes, Jonathan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 17 Certification and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Carnival Corporation & PLC, identifying Micky Arison, Chairman of the Boards of Carnival Corporation, and certain members of the Arison family and trusts for their benefit. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Nakamura, Angel)
June 17, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Angel Tang Nakamura on behalf of Defendant Carnival Corporation & PLC (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Service)(Attorney Angel Tang Nakamura added to party Carnival Corporation & PLC(pty:dft))(Nakamura, Angel)
June 16, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to All Defendants, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
June 3, 2020 Filing 14 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong, Benjamin Wong, Estate of Ronald Wong, upon Defendant All Defendants. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Cordova, Alison)
June 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd., identifying Carnival Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nield, Edgar)
June 1, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Edgar R Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Edgar R Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Nield, Edgar)
June 1, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Jeffrey B Maltzman added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Maltzman, Jeffrey)
June 1, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Rafaela Patricia Castells added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(Castells, Rafaela)
June 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield on behalf of Defendant Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Attorney Gabrielle DeSantis-Nield added to party Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.(pty:dft))(DeSantis-Nield, Gabrielle)
May 28, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Electronic Filing re Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #7 , Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 e-mailed to Caroline A. Rietz at creitz@amlawoffice.com bounced due to Email address does not exist. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (ir) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
May 28, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendants Carnival Corporation & PLC, Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd. (esa)
May 28, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
May 28, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Jacqueline Chooljian. (esa)
May 27, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wong, Estate of Ronald Wong, Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong. (Nishimura, Nanci)
May 27, 2020 Filing 3 Notification of CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Benjamin Wong, Estate of Ronald Wong, Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong, (Nishimura, Nanci)
May 27, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiffs Benjamin Wong, Estate of Ronald Wong, Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong. (Nishimura, Nanci)
May 27, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26587054 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong, Benjamin Wong, Estate of Ronald Wong. (Attorney Nanci E Nishimura added to party Benjamin Wong(pty:pla), Attorney Nanci E Nishimura added to party Estate of Ronald Wong(pty:pla), Attorney Nanci E Nishimura added to party Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong(pty:pla))(Nishimura, Nanci)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong et al v. Carnival Corporation & PLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Estate of Ronald Wong
Represented By: Nanci E Nishimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Benjamin Wong
Represented By: Nanci E Nishimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eva Yuk Wah Ma Wong
Represented By: Nanci E Nishimura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Princess Cruise Lines, Ltd.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Carnival Corporation & PLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?