Larry G. Philpot v. Funny or Die Media, Inc.
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Defendant: Funny or Die Media, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04801
Filed: May 29, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:501
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING Stipulation to Extend Time to Answer (More than 30 days) #13 by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court ORDERS that Defendant shall have up to and including September 22, 2020, to answer or otherwise respond to the Initial Complaint. Defendant Funny or Die Media, Inc. answer due 9/22/2020 (shb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 13 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 09/22/2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Funny or Die Media, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Segal, Jonathan)
July 16, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT of MJDAP case from Magistrate Judge Steve Kim to Judge Ronald S.W. Lew for all further proceedings. Any discovery matters that may be referred to a Magistrate Judge are assigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judges 2:20-cv-04801 RSWL(PVCx). (rn)
June 22, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Funny or Die Media, Inc. answer now due 7/24/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant Funny or Die Media, Inc..(Attorney Jonathan Louis Segal added to party Funny or Die Media, Inc.(pty:dft))(Segal, Jonathan)
June 11, 2020 Filing 10 SERVICE UNDER FRCP 5(b)(2)(D) Executed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot, upon Defendant Funny or Die Media, Inc. served on 6/3/2020, answer due 6/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the Clerks Office in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. (Kristensen, John)
June 2, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Funny or Die Media, Inc. (hr)
June 1, 2020 Filing 8 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
June 1, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons. The following error(s) was found: The caption of the summons must match the caption of the complaint verbatim. If the caption is too large to fit in the space provided, enter the name of the first party and then write see attached.Next, attach a face page of the complaint or a second page addendum to the Summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (jtil)
June 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge Steve Kim. (Attachments: #1 CV11C) (jtil)
May 29, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot, (Kristensen, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Kristensen, John)
May 29, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26616911 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Larry G. Philpot. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I) (Attorney John P Kristensen added to party Larry G. Philpot(pty:pla))(Kristensen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Larry G. Philpot v. Funny or Die Media, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Larry G. Philpot
Represented By: John P Kristensen
Represented By: Jesenia Anahy Martinez
Represented By: Jacob Joseph Ventura
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Funny or Die Media, Inc.
Represented By: Jonathan Louis Segal
Represented By: Camila Pedraza
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?