CHAITANYA ATHMAKURI v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Plaintiff: CHAITANYA ATHMAKURI
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Case Number: 2:2020cv04875
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Michael W Fitzgerald
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Other Immigration Actions
Cause of Action: 05:551
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 2, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Steven Andrew Brown. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
June 2, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Jonathan D Wasden. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
June 2, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Geoffrey Forney. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
June 2, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Bradley B Banias. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. (car)
June 2, 2020 Filing 22 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from District of Columbia
June 1, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Michael W. Fitzgerald and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
June 1, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 1:20-cv-01428-CRC, from U.S. District Court District of Columbia (Washington, DC). The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-04875 MWF-AGRx. (car)
June 1, 2020 Case transferred to the USDC for the Central District of California, pursuant to the Court Order entered 5/21/2020. Sent to Court via Extraction. (ztd) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Filing Petition for Writ of Mandamus with the D.C. Circuit Court of Appeals by Suman Anand, Shiney Anis Martina Robinson, Heta Bhavesh Parikh, Chaitanya Athmakuri and by DEVI SUSHMA SANIKANTI, SHRUTHI SOMASHEKAR (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Petition for Writ of Mandamus and Filing Fee)(Forney, Geoffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
May 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER granting in part and denying in part Defendant's #9 Motion to Transfer Venue or to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. See full Order for details. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/21/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
May 20, 2020 Filing 19 STATUS REPORT as to Moot Claims by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of John Peace)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: As explained in #18 Memorandum Opinion, the Government is hereby ORDERED to file a report by May 20, 2020 confirming which claims are moot and which remain. The Court will hold in abeyance its order dismissing the moot claims and severing/transferring the remaining claims until then. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/15/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
May 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MEMORANDUM OPINION re: the Government's #9 Motion to Transfer Venue or to Dismiss and for Summary Judgment. In a forthcoming minute order, the Court will direct the Government to file a report confirming which claims are moot and which remain. The Court will hold in abeyance the order that shall accompany this memorandum opinion dismissing the moot claims and severing/transferring the remaining claims until then. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 05/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 Appendix A: Chart of Mooted Claims, #2 Appendix B: Chart of Remaining Plaintiffs) (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
April 20, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Correction (Relating to Error in Citation) by NEHA ALLANGH, MADHUKAR RAO ANDUKURI, SUMEDHA ULHAS BHAGAT, MAHALAXMI BHANDARU, SHAYANI BOSE, HARITHA CHAVA, APARAJITA DEY, NIKHIL VITTHAL DIXIT LIMAYE, SHWETHA GANGADHAR SHET, SINDHUJA GHANTA, KAMALIKA GHOSH, BHAVYA SHREE GIRIDHAR KULKARNI, SAI KRISHNA PRIYA GOPISETTY, SRAVANTHI GUNTUKA, PARUL GUPTA, NABONITA RAOUL HIRA, NIDHI JAIN, ANUSHA KAKARLAPUDI, JYOTHSNA KINTHALI, PALLAVI KONDA, GAYATRI KUCHINA, NEHA KUMARI, ABRAHAM JOHN LNU, LEO PULIKOTTIL LUVIS, NAGA SAI NANDITI MANGIPUDI, SONALI MISHRA, ROSHINI MURALIDHARAN, SONY NAGENDRAPPA, LAKSHMI KANTHA BHAGYAREKHA PALURU, LALITHA PASEM, GIRISH PAWAR, RUKMINI PONNOLI, KANI AMUDHU RADHAKRISHNAN, KAVITHA RAJESWARAN, SUNITHA RAPOLU, DIMPLE AMAN RUSTAGI, ANU SAHU, VENKAYA KALYANI DEEPTI SALA, DEVI SUSHMA SANIKANTI, RAJIB SARKAR, ANIL SHARMA, HARIOM SHARMA, SWATI SHARMA, MADHULIKA SINGH, SHRUTHI SOMASHEKAR, DINESH CHANDRA SOMURI, DIVYA SUBRAMANIAN, SWETHA SUDHA, KAVANA SURESHA, KETKI SUBHASH TORGALKAR, PREETI SAINI UGRA, HIMASREE UPPALA, SWETHA REDDY VEDIRE, NEELIMA ATURI VENKATA RAMANA NAGA, VIJAKUMARI YESHHMALA re #12 Memorandum in Opposition,,,,,, (Forney, Geoffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
April 17, 2020 Filing 16 REPLY to opposition to motion re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Sever filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
April 16, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #15 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the Government shall file its Reply on or before April 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/16/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Filing 15 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Sever by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
April 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #14 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the Government shall file its Reply on or before April 15, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/10/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
April 9, 2020 Filing 14 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
April 2, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #13 Motion for Extension of Time to File Reply. It is hereby ORDERED that the Defendant shall file its reply on or before April 10, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 04/02/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
April 1, 2020 Filing 13 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment MOTION to Sever by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 27, 2020 Filing 12 Memorandum in opposition to re #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment filed by NEHA ALLANGH, MADHUKAR RAO ANDUKURI, SUMEDHA ULHAS BHAGAT, MAHALAXMI BHANDARU, SHAYANI BOSE, HARITHA CHAVA, APARAJITA DEY, NIKHIL VITTHAL DIXIT LIMAYE, SHWETHA GANGADHAR SHET, SINDHUJA GHANTA, KAMALIKA GHOSH, BHAVYA SHREE GIRIDHAR KULKARNI, SAI KRISHNA PRIYA GOPISETTY, SRAVANTHI GUNTUKA, PARUL GUPTA, NABONITA RAOUL HIRA, NIDHI JAIN, ANUSHA KAKARLAPUDI, JYOTHSNA KINTHALI, PALLAVI KONDA, GAYATRI KUCHINA, NEHA KUMARI, ABRAHAM JOHN LNU, LEO PULIKOTTIL LUVIS, NAGA SAI NANDITI MANGIPUDI, SONALI MISHRA, ROSHINI MURALIDHARAN, SONY NAGENDRAPPA, LAKSHMI KANTHA BHAGYAREKHA PALURU, LALITHA PASEM, GIRISH PAWAR, RUKMINI PONNOLI, KANI AMUDHU RADHAKRISHNAN, KAVITHA RAJESWARAN, SUNITHA RAPOLU, DIMPLE AMAN RUSTAGI, ANU SAHU, VENKAYA KALYANI DEEPTI SALA, DEVI SUSHMA SANIKANTI, RAJIB SARKAR, ANIL SHARMA, HARIOM SHARMA, SWATI SHARMA, MADHULIKA SINGH, SHRUTHI SOMASHEKAR, DINESH CHANDRA SOMURI, DIVYA SUBRAMANIAN, SWETHA SUDHA, KAVANA SURESHA, KETKI SUBHASH TORGALKAR, PREETI SAINI UGRA, HIMASREE UPPALA, SWETHA REDDY VEDIRE, NEELIMA ATURI VENKATA RAMANA NAGA, VIJAKUMARI YESHHMALA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Statement of Facts, #16 Text of Proposed Order)(Forney, Geoffrey) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Plaintiffs' #11 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Plaintiffs are hereby ORDERED to file their response on or before March 27, 2020. Any future extension motions shall state good cause for granting the motion. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/23/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 23, 2020 Filing 11 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #9 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction MOTION for Summary Judgment by NEHA ALLANGH, MADHUKAR RAO ANDUKURI, SUMEDHA ULHAS BHAGAT, MAHALAXMI BHANDARU, SHAYANI BOSE, HARITHA CHAVA, APARAJITA DEY, NIKHIL VITTHAL DIXIT LIMAYE, SHWETHA GANGADHAR SHET, SINDHUJA GHANTA, KAMALIKA GHOSH, BHAVYA SHREE GIRIDHAR KULKARNI, SAI KRISHNA PRIYA GOPISETTY, SRAVANTHI GUNTUKA, PARUL GUPTA, NABONITA RAOUL HIRA, NIDHI JAIN, ANUSHA KAKARLAPUDI, JYOTHSNA KINTHALI, PALLAVI KONDA, GAYATRI KUCHINA, NEHA KUMARI, ABRAHAM JOHN LNU, LEO PULIKOTTIL LUVIS, NAGA SAI NANDITI MANGIPUDI, SONALI MISHRA, ROSHINI MURALIDHARAN, SONY NAGENDRAPPA, LAKSHMI KANTHA BHAGYAREKHA PALURU, LALITHA PASEM, GIRISH PAWAR, RUKMINI PONNOLI, KANI AMUDHU RADHAKRISHNAN, KAVITHA RAJESWARAN, SUNITHA RAPOLU, DIMPLE AMAN RUSTAGI, ANU SAHU, VENKAYA KALYANI DEEPTI SALA, DEVI SUSHMA SANIKANTI, RAJIB SARKAR, ANIL SHARMA, HARIOM SHARMA, SWATI SHARMA, MADHULIKA SINGH, SHRUTHI SOMASHEKAR, DINESH CHANDRA SOMURI, DIVYA SUBRAMANIAN, SWETHA SUDHA, KAVANA SURESHA, KETKI SUBHASH TORGALKAR, PREETI SAINI UGRA, HIMASREE UPPALA, SWETHA REDDY VEDIRE, NEELIMA ATURI VENKATA RAMANA NAGA, VIJAKUMARI YESHHMALA (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Wasden, Jonathan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 10, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER: Defendant U.S. Citizenship and Immigration Services is hereby ORDERED to file a notice in Mukherjee v. USCIS, 20-cv-676, responding to Plaintiffs' #8 Notice of Related Case and inform the Court of its position as to whether these cases are related under this Court's Local Rules. See LCvR 40.5. Defendant shall file this Notice in Case # 20-cv-676 on or before Tuesday, March 17, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/10/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 10 Memorandum in opposition to re #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES. (Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION to Transfer Case or in the alternative, MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction , MOTION for Summary Judgment by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Statement of Facts, #3 Declaration of Dina Rosales (CSC), #4 Declaration Jennifer Roller (NSC), #5 Declaration John Peace (TSC), #6 Declaration Patrick Kernan (VSC), #7 Appendix A, #8 Text of Proposed Order, #9 Text of Proposed Order (alternative))(Walker, Johnny). Added MOTION to Sever, MOTION to Transfer Case on 3/30/2020 (ztd). [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 9, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF RELATED CASE by NEHA ALLANGH, MADHUKAR RAO ANDUKURI, SUMEDHA ULHAS BHAGAT, MAHALAXMI BHANDARU, SHAYANI BOSE, HARITHA CHAVA, APARAJITA DEY, NIKHIL VITTHAL DIXIT LIMAYE, SHWETHA GANGADHAR SHET, SINDHUJA GHANTA, KAMALIKA GHOSH, BHAVYA SHREE GIRIDHAR KULKARNI, SAI KRISHNA PRIYA GOPISETTY, SRAVANTHI GUNTUKA, PARUL GUPTA, NABONITA RAOUL HIRA, NIDHI JAIN, ANUSHA KAKARLAPUDI, JYOTHSNA KINTHALI, PALLAVI KONDA, GAYATRI KUCHINA, NEHA KUMARI, ABRAHAM JOHN LNU, LEO PULIKOTTIL LUVIS, NAGA SAI NANDITI MANGIPUDI, SONALI MISHRA, ROSHINI MURALIDHARAN, SONY NAGENDRAPPA, LAKSHMI KANTHA BHAGYAREKHA PALURU, LALITHA PASEM, GIRISH PAWAR, RUKMINI PONNOLI, KANI AMUDHU RADHAKRISHNAN, KAVITHA RAJESWARAN, SUNITHA RAPOLU, DIMPLE AMAN RUSTAGI, ANU SAHU, VENKAYA KALYANI DEEPTI SALA, DEVI SUSHMA SANIKANTI. Case related to Case No. 20-344. (adh, ) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Responses to Motion due by 3/9/2020 (lsj) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 4, 2020 Opinion or Order MINUTE ORDER granting Defendant's #7 Motion for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply. Defendant shall file its response to Plaintiffs' motion for preliminary injunction on or before March 9, 2020. Signed by Judge Christopher R. Cooper on 03/04/2020. (lccrc3) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
March 3, 2020 Filing 7 Unopposed MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply as to #6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES (Attachments: #1 Text of Proposed Order)(Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
February 26, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by NEHA ALLANGH, MADHUKAR RAO ANDUKURI, SUMEDHA ULHAS BHAGAT, MAHALAXMI BHANDARU, SHAYANI BOSE, HARITHA CHAVA, APARAJITA DEY, NIKHIL VITTHAL DIXIT LIMAYE, SHWETHA GANGADHAR SHET, SINDHUJA GHANTA, KAMALIKA GHOSH, BHAVYA SHREE GIRIDHAR KULKARNI, SAI KRISHNA PRIYA GOPISETTY, SRAVANTHI GUNTUKA, PARUL GUPTA, NABONITA RAOUL HIRA, NIDHI JAIN, ANUSHA KAKARLAPUDI, JYOTHSNA KINTHALI, PALLAVI KONDA, GAYATRI KUCHINA, NEHA KUMARI, ABRAHAM JOHN LNU, LEO PULIKOTTIL LUVIS, NAGA SAI NANDITI MANGIPUDI, SONALI MISHRA, ROSHINI MURALIDHARAN, SONY NAGENDRAPPA, LAKSHMI KANTHA BHAGYAREKHA PALURU, LALITHA PASEM, GIRISH PAWAR, RUKMINI PONNOLI, KANI AMUDHU RADHAKRISHNAN, KAVITHA RAJESWARAN, SUNITHA RAPOLU, DIMPLE AMAN RUSTAGI, ANU SAHU, VENKAYA KALYANI DEEPTI SALA, DEVI SUSHMA SANIKANTI, RAJIB SARKAR, ANIL SHARMA, HARIOM SHARMA, SWATI SHARMA, MADHULIKA SINGH, SHRUTHI SOMASHEKAR, DINESH CHANDRA SOMURI, DIVYA SUBRAMANIAN, SWETHA SUDHA, KAVANA SURESHA, KETKI SUBHASH TORGALKAR, PREETI SAINI UGRA, HIMASREE UPPALA, SWETHA REDDY VEDIRE, NEELIMA ATURI VENKATA RAMANA NAGA, VIJAKUMARI YESHHMALA (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support, #2 Text of Proposed Order, #3 Exhibit 1 USCIS Historic Processing Times, #4 Exhibit 2 Declaration of Plaintiffs, #5 Exhibit 3 CA Service Center Form I-539 Times, #6 Exhibit 4 CA Service Center Form I-765 Times, #7 Exhibit 5 NE Service Center Form I-539 Times, #8 Exhibit 6 NE Service Center Form I-765 Times, #9 Exhibit 7 TX Service Center Form I-539 Times, #10 Exhibit 8 TX Service Center Form I-765 Times, #11 Exhibit 9 VT Service Center Form I-539 Times, #12 Exhibit 10 VT Service Center Form I-765 Times, #13 Exhibit 11 Roller Declaration, #14 Exhibit 12 2019 Unified Regulatory Agenda, #15 Exhibit 13 2017 Unified Regulatory Agenda, #16 Exhibit 14 Table of Plaintiffs' Form I-539 Times, #17 Exhibit 15 Table of Plaintiffs' Form I-765 Times)(Wasden, Jonathan) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 5 AMENDED COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES filed by HIMASREE UPPALA, MADHULIKA SINGH, MADHUKAR RAO ANDUKURI, DEVI SUSHMA SANIKANTI, SWETHA REDDY VEDIRE, KETKI SUBHASH TORGALKAR, ANIL SHARMA, LALITHA PASEM, VENKAYA KALYANI DEEPTI SALA, NABONITA RAOUL HIRA, LAKSHMI KANTHA BHAGYAREKHA PALURU, ANUSHA KAKARLAPUDI, NIDHI JAIN, PREETI SAINI UGRA, SRAVANTHI GUNTUKA, NEHA KUMARI, GAYATRI KUCHINA, DIVYA SUBRAMANIAN, APARAJITA DEY, SUNITHA RAPOLU, ROSHINI MURALIDHARAN, SWETHA SUDHA, GIRISH PAWAR, BHAVYA SHREE GIRIDHAR KULKARNI, KAVANA SURESHA, KANI AMUDHU RADHAKRISHNAN, RAJIB SARKAR, HARIOM SHARMA, NIKHIL VITTHAL DIXIT LIMAYE, SWATI SHARMA, DIMPLE AMAN RUSTAGI, HARITHA CHAVA, SINDHUJA GHANTA, SHAYANI BOSE, NAGA SAI NANDITI MANGIPUDI, NEELIMA ATURI VENKATA RAMANA NAGA, SHRUTHI SOMASHEKAR, ABRAHAM JOHN LNU, VIJAKUMARI YESHHMALA, LEO PULIKOTTIL LUVIS, DINESH CHANDRA SOMURI, PALLAVI KONDA, SHWETHA GANGADHAR SHET, NEHA ALLANGH, KAVITHA RAJESWARAN, PARUL GUPTA, RUKMINI PONNOLI, SAI KRISHNA PRIYA GOPISETTY, SONY NAGENDRAPPA, KAMALIKA GHOSH, SUMEDHA ULHAS BHAGAT, MAHALAXMI BHANDARU, JYOTHSNA KINTHALI, ANU SAHU, SONALI MISHRA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table 1: Length of Pending I-539s, #2 Exhibit Table 2: Length of Pending I-765s)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
February 21, 2020 Filing 4 RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES served on 2/10/2020 (Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
February 13, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Johnny Hillary Walker, III on behalf of All Defendants (Walker, Johnny) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 SUMMONS (3) Issued Electronically as to UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (Attachment: #1 Notice and Consent)(zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
February 10, 2020 Case Assigned to Judge Christopher R. Cooper. (zsb) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number ADCDC-6810055) filed by HIMASREE UPPALA, MADHULIKA SINGH, MADHUKAR RAO ANDUKURI, DEVI SUSHMA SANIKANTI, SWETHA REDDY VEDIRE, KETKI SUBHASH TORGALKAR, ANIL SHARMA, LALITHA PASEM, VENKAYA KALYANI DEEPTI SALA, NABONITA RAOUL HIRA, LAKSHMI KANTHA BHAGYAREKHA PALURU, ANUSHA KAKARLAPUDI, NIDHI JAIN, PREETI SAINI UGRA, SRAVANTHI GUNTUKA, NEHA KUMARI, GAYATRI KUCHINA, DIVYA SUBRAMANIAN, APARAJITA DEY, SUNITHA RAPOLU, ROSHINI MURALIDHARAN, SWETHA SUDHA, GIRISH PAWAR, BHAVYA SHREE GIRIDHAR KULKARNI, KAVANA SURESHA, KANI AMUDHU RADHAKRISHNAN, RAJIB SARKAR, HARIOM SHARMA, NIKHIL VITTHAL DIXIT LIMAYE, SWATI SHARMA, DIMPLE AMAN RUSTAGI, HARITHA CHAVA, SINDHUJA GHANTA, SHAYANI BOSE, NAGA SAI NANDITI MANGIPUDI, NEELIMA ATURI VENKATA RAMANA NAGA, SHRUTHI SOMASHEKAR, ABRAHAM JOHN LNU, VIJAKUMARI YESHHMALA, LEO PULIKOTTIL LUVIS, DINESH CHANDRA SOMURI, PALLAVI KONDA, SHWETHA GANGADHAR SHET, NEHA ALLANGH, KAVITHA RAJESWARAN, PARUL GUPTA, RUKMINI PONNOLI, SAI KRISHNA PRIYA GOPISETTY, SONY NAGENDRAPPA, KAMALIKA GHOSH, SUMEDHA ULHAS BHAGAT, MAHALAXMI BHANDARU, JYONTHSNA KINTHALI, ANU SAHU, SONALI MISHRA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Table 1--Length of Pending I-539s, #2 Exhibit Table 2 -- Length of Pending I-765s, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Summons Request for Summons DHS GC, #5 Summons Request for Summons USAG, #6 Summons Request for Summons US Attorney)(Brown, Steven) [Transferred from District of Columbia on 6/2/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: CHAITANYA ATHMAKURI v. UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: UNITED STATES CITIZENSHIP AND IMMIGRATION SERVICES
Represented By: Johnny Hillary Walker, III
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: CHAITANYA ATHMAKURI
Represented By: Geoffrey Forney
Represented By: Steven Andrew Brown
Represented By: Jonathan D Wasden
Represented By: Bradley B Banias
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?