James O Rourke et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Plaintiff: Joan O'Rourke, James O'Rourke, James O Rourke and Joan O Rourke
Defendant: Fairbanks Morse Company, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Viking Pump, Inc., ITT LLC, fka ITT Corporation, fka ITT Industries, Inc.; individually and as successor in interest to Bell & Gossett Company, Foster Engineering Company and Kennedy Valve Company, Ingersoll-Rand Company, Warren Pumps LLC, Calaveras Asbestos Ltd, Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc, Bae Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc., Hollingsworth & Vose Company, Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc., Gould Pumps, Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Buffalo Pumps, Inc., Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC, Astra Flooring Company, John Crane Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC f/k/a Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Campbell Industries Inc, SB Decking, CRANE CO. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to CHAPMAN VALVE COMPANY);, Parker Hannifin Corporation, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc., Armstrong International, Inc., Duriron Comapny, DAP, Inc., BF Goodrich Company, J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc., M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., DEERE AND COMPANY, Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc., IMO Industries Inc, Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc., The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, FMC Corporation, SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc., Lorillard Tobacco Company, General Electric, Triple A Machine Shop Inc, Union Carbide Corporation, The W.W. Henry Company, CBS Corporation, ITT LLC, Metalclad Insulation LLC, Goodrich Corporation, J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., ITT Corporation, Crane Co., Crown Cork and Seal USA, Inc., Hollingsworth and Vose Company, Westinghouse Electric Corporation, Goulds Pumps LLC, The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, Does 1 through 300, Metalclad Insulation Corporation, Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc., Viacom, Inc., ITT Industries, Inc., Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, SB Decking as successor-in-interest to Selby Battersby and Co. formerly doing business as Selby, Battersby & Company and Frasers Boiler Service, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv04884
Filed: June 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Referring Judge: Stephen V Wilson
Nature of Suit: P.I. : Asbestos
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 22, 2020 Filing 158 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rebecca Anne Bellow counsel for Defendant Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc.. Filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attorney Rebecca Anne Bellow added to party Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc. (pty:dft))(Bellow, Rebecca)
September 18, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant DAP, Inc. [Submitted with docket entry no. 156-1](mrgo)
September 18, 2020 Filing 157 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant DAP, Inc., identifying Dicks-Armstrong-Pontius, Inc.; Beecham Home Improvement Products Inc.; Plough, Inc.; USG Industries, Inc.; La Mirada Products Co., Inc.. (Attorney Justin E Garratt added to party DAP, Inc.(pty:dft))(Garratt, Justin)
September 18, 2020 Filing 156 NOTICE filed by Defendant DAP, Inc.. Notice of Filing of State Court Answer (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Garratt, Justin)
September 17, 2020 CONFORMED COPY OF STATE COURT ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery), filed by defendant Union Carbide Corporation. [Submitted with docket entry no. 153](mrgo)
September 17, 2020 Filing 155 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation, identifying The Dow Chemical Company; DowDuPont Inc.. (Landis, Ryan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 154 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ryan S Landis on behalf of Defendant Union Carbide Corporation (Attorney Ryan S Landis added to party Union Carbide Corporation(pty:dft))(Landis, Ryan)
September 17, 2020 Filing 153 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Union Carbide Corporation. (Landis, Ryan)
September 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 152 CIVIL TRIAL PREPARATION ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson - Jury Trial set for 2/16/2021 09:00 AM, with a Pretrial Conference set for 2/8/2021 at 3:00 PM. (pc)
August 14, 2020 Filing 151 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron L. Britton counsel for Defendants Armstrong International, Inc., Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc.. Adding Aaron L. Britton as counsel of record for Armstrong International, Inc. and Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Armstrong International, Inc. and Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.. (Attorney Aaron L. Britton added to party Armstrong International, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Aaron L. Britton added to party Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc. (pty:dft))(Britton, Aaron)
August 14, 2020 Filing 150 AFFIDAVIT RE: PLAINTIFFS PROOFS OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS & COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiffs James O Rourke, Joan O Rourke (Eyerly, Michael)
August 12, 2020 Filing 149 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Lorillard Tobacco Company.(Haeusler, Rita)
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 148 IN CHAMBERS ORDER-TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson re: #138 MOTION to Dismiss the first through fourth causes of action in the Complaint filed by Defendant Lorillard Tobacco Company; and #140 MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Hollingsworth and Vose Company - In light of the Stipulations (Dkts 146 and 147), the motions to dismiss are denied as moot. The hearing previously scheduled for 08/17/2020 at 1:30 p.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 3, 2020 Filing 147 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to Defendant Hollingsworth & Vose Company filed by Plaintiffs James O Rourke, Joan O Rourke.(Eyerly, Michael)
August 3, 2020 Filing 146 STIPULATION to Dismiss Case pursuant to certain claims against Defendant R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Co. filed by Plaintiffs James O Rourke, Joan O Rourke.(Eyerly, Michael)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 145 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS re NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company as to Aldrich Pump LLC, BankruptcyCourt case number 20-30608 #134 by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. The Court having received Defendant's notice of bankruptcy, stays all proceedings as to Aldrich Pump LLC. Defendant notify the Court immediately upon resolution of the bankruptcy proceedings. Case stayed. (mrgo)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 144 ORDER by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: granting #143 Non-Resident Attorney Tina Schaefer APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of defendant R.J. REYNOLDS TOBACCO COMPANY, designating Rita M. Haeusler as local counsel. (mrgo)
July 23, 2020 Filing 143 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Tina Schaefer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Defendant Lorillard Tobacco Company (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27335173) filed by defendant Lorillard Tobacco Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita)
July 7, 2020 Filing 142 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Hollingsworth and Vose Company (Haeusler, Rita)
July 7, 2020 Filing 141 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #140 filed by Defendant Hollingsworth and Vose Company. (Haeusler, Rita)
July 7, 2020 Filing 140 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Hollingsworth and Vose Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Mary Olohan, #2 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita)
July 7, 2020 Filing 139 RULE 7.1(a) NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Lorillard Tobacco Company, identifying R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Company; R.J. Reynolds Tobacco Holding, Inc.; Reynolds American Inc.; British American Tobacco, p.l.c.. (Haeusler, Rita)
July 7, 2020 Filing 138 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss the first through fourth causes of action in the Complaint filed by Defendant Lorillard Tobacco Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/17/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Rita M. Haeusler, #2 Proposed Order) (Haeusler, Rita)
July 1, 2020 Filing 136 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. On June 30, 2020, the Court granted the Stipulation to Dismiss Defendant Deere and Company #130 . Accordingly, the Court denies as moot the Motion to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction Defendant Deere and Company #59 , previously scheduled for 7/6/2020, at 1:30 PM. No appearance is necessary. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (smo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 137 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION TO DISMISS DEFENDANT DEERE & COMPANY by Judge Stephen V. Wilson, re Stipulation to Dismiss Party #130 . Deere and Company terminated. (mrgo) Modified on 7/1/2020 (mrgo).
June 26, 2020 Filing 135 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc, (Brignoni, Samantha)
June 26, 2020 Filing 134 NOTICE OF FILING BANKRUPTCY filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. as to Aldrich Pump LLC, Bankruptcy Court case number 20-30608. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C)(Crochet, Carla)
June 26, 2020 Filing 133 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Answer to Complaint (Discovery) #131 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (gk)
June 25, 2020 Filing 132 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC.(Scadden, James)
June 25, 2020 Filing 131 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation.(Attorney James G Scadden added to party Air and Liquid Systems Corporation(pty:dft))(Scadden, James)
June 24, 2020 Filing 130 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Deere and Company filed by Defendant Deere and Company. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Wiegmann, Yakov)
June 22, 2020 Filing 129 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, Defendant Astra Flooring Company's Answer to Plaintiffs' Complaint for Personal Injuries and Loss of Consortium; Demand for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Astra Flooring Company.(Desai, Mihir)
June 22, 2020 Filing 128 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Francis D Pond on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Pond, Francis)
June 22, 2020 Filing 127 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation, (Patterson, Christopher)
June 22, 2020 Filing 126 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Parker Hannifin Corporation.(Attorney Christopher Sean Patterson added to party Parker Hannifin Corporation(pty:dft))(Patterson, Christopher)
June 19, 2020 Filing 125 NOTICE of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information: for attorney J. Scott Wood counsel for Defendant Campbell Industries Inc. Changing e-mail to swood@foleymansfield.com. Filed by Defendant Campbell Industries Inc. (Wood, J.)
June 19, 2020 Filing 124 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Timothy C Pieper on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Attorney Timothy C Pieper added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Pieper, Timothy)
June 19, 2020 Filing 123 DISCLOSURE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure filed by Defendant FMC Corporation (Schatz, Russell)
June 19, 2020 Filing 122 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr on behalf of Defendant FMC Corporation (Schatz, Russell)
June 19, 2020 Filing 121 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, for Personal Injuries and Loss of Consortium filed by FMC Corporation FMC Corporation.(Attorney Russell W Schatz, Jr added to party FMC Corporation(pty:dft))(Schatz, Russell)
June 19, 2020 Filing 120 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samantha Brignoni counsel for Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. Adding Edward R. Ulloa as counsel of record for Defendant, Viking Pump, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. (Brignoni, Samantha)
June 19, 2020 Filing 119 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samantha Brignoni counsel for Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. Adding Michael B. Giaquinto as counsel of record for Defendant, Viking Pump, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. (Brignoni, Samantha)
June 19, 2020 Filing 118 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samantha Brignoni counsel for Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. Adding Samantha Brignoni as counsel of record for Defendant, Viking Pump, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc.. (Brignoni, Samantha)
June 19, 2020 Filing 117 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc., identifying Viking Pump, Inc. is a wholly owned subsidiary of IDEX Corporation. (Brignoni, Samantha)
June 19, 2020 Filing 116 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Viking Pump, Inc..(Attorney Samantha Brignoni added to party Viking Pump, Inc.(pty:dft))(Brignoni, Samantha)
June 18, 2020 Filing 115 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Bae Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc. (Watson, Alan)
June 18, 2020 Filing 114 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant Bae Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc..(Attorney Alan J Watson added to party Bae Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc.(pty:dft))(Watson, Alan)
June 17, 2020 Filing 113 Local Rule 7.1-1 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The W.W. Henry Company, identifying ARDEX AMERICA. (Martin, Nicolas)
June 17, 2020 Filing 112 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, Answer to Complaint for Personal Injury and Loss of Consortium filed by Defendant The W.W. Henry Company.(Attorney Nicolas P Martin added to party The W.W. Henry Company(pty:dft))(Martin, Nicolas)
June 17, 2020 Filing 111 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Judge Stephen V. Wilson: The scheduling conference previously scheduled for 07/06/2020 at 10:30 a.m. is vacated and off-calendar. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pc) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 16, 2020 Filing 110 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samantha Brignoni counsel for Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc. Adding Kimberly Solomon as counsel of record for Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.. (Brignoni, Samantha)
June 16, 2020 Filing 109 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Samantha Brignoni counsel for Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc. Adding Samantha Brignoni as counsel of record for Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.. (Attorney Samantha Brignoni added to party Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc(pty:dft))(Brignoni, Samantha)
June 16, 2020 Filing 108 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael B Giaquinto counsel for Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc. Michael B. Giaquinto is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company, Inc.. (Giaquinto, Michael)
June 16, 2020 Filing 107 Defendant Astra Flooring Company's Certification of Interested Entities or Persons / Disclosure Statement Pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure, Rule 7.1 and Local Rule 3-15 of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Astra Flooring Company, (Desai, Mihir)
June 16, 2020 Filing 106 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Mihir Desai counsel for Defendant Astra Flooring Company. Adding Mihir Desai as counsel of record for Astra Flooring Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Astra Flooring Company. (Desai, Mihir)
June 16, 2020 Filing 105 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Francis D Pond counsel for Defendant Astra Flooring Company. Adding Frank D. Pond as counsel of record for Astra Flooring Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Astra Flooring Company. (Pond, Francis)
June 15, 2020 Filing 104 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc.(Attorney Michael B Giaquinto added to party Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc(pty:dft))(Giaquinto, Michael)
June 15, 2020 Filing 103 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Goodrich Corporation Goodrich Corporation.(Glaspy, David)
June 15, 2020 Filing 102 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation identifying Goodrich Corporation as Corporate Parent. (Glaspy, David)
June 15, 2020 Filing 101 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney David M Glaspy counsel for Defendant Goodrich Corporation. Adding David M. Glaspy as counsel of record for Goodrich Corporation for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation. (Glaspy, David)
June 15, 2020 Filing 100 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Goodrich Corporation.(Attorney David M Glaspy added to party Goodrich Corporation(pty:dft))(Glaspy, David)
June 15, 2020 Filing 99 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Dana L Burch counsel for Defendant Astra Flooring Company. Adding Dana L. Burch as counsel of record for Astra Flooring Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Astra Flooring Company. (Attorney Dana L Burch added to party Astra Flooring Company(pty:dft))(Burch, Dana)
June 12, 2020 Filing 98 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Crane Co., (Davis, Geoffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 97 DISCLOSURE of Statement Pursuant to Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 7.1 filed by Defendant Crane Co. (Davis, Geoffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 96 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Crane Co..(Davis, Geoffrey)
June 12, 2020 Filing 95 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick James Foley counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Adding Patrick James Foley as counsel of record for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Foley, Patrick)
June 12, 2020 Filing 94 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Tina Ladan Baravarian counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Adding Tina L. Baravarian as counsel of record for Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attorney Tina Ladan Baravarian added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft))(Baravarian, Tina)
June 12, 2020 Filing 93 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Patrick James Foley counsel for Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. Adding Patrick J. Foley as counsel of record for The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company. (Attorney Patrick James Foley added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft))(Foley, Patrick)
June 12, 2020 Filing 92 DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANYS NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES - CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, identifying The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company and BlackRock, Inc.. (Attorney Galen Bo Chuan Wang added to party The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company(pty:dft))(Wang, Galen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 91 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER ON BEHALF OF DEFENDANT THE GOODYEAR TIRE & RUBBER COMPANY filed by Defendant The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Wang, Galen)
June 12, 2020 Filing 90 NOTICE - Defendant ITT Corporation, now known as ITT LLC's Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant ITT LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
June 12, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE - Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company's Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
June 12, 2020 Filing 88 NOTICE - Defendant Goulds Pumps Inc. now known as Goulds Pumps, LLC's Notice of Filing of State Court Answer to Complaint filed by Defendant Gould Pumps. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Duffy, Joseph)
June 12, 2020 Filing 87 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant ITT LLC identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 12, 2020 Filing 86 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 12, 2020 Filing 85 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT and Notice of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Gould Pumps identifying ITT Inc. as Corporate Parent. (Duffy, Joseph)
June 12, 2020 Filing 84 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Amy Jo Talarico counsel for Defendants Gould Pumps, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc., ITT LLC. Adding Amy J. Talarico as counsel of record for Goulds Pumps Inc., now known as Goulds Pumps, LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company; and ITT Corporation, now known as ITT LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps Inc., now known as Goulds Pumps, LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company; and ITT Corporation, now known as ITT LLC. (Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Gould Pumps(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Amy Jo Talarico added to party ITT LLC(pty:dft))(Talarico, Amy)
June 12, 2020 Filing 83 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Joseph Duffy counsel for Defendants Gould Pumps, Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc., ITT LLC. Adding Joseph Duffy as counsel of record for Goulds Pumps Inc., now known as Goulds Pumps, LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company; and ITT Corporation, now known as ITT LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants Goulds Pumps Inc., now known as Goulds Pumps, LLC; Hill Brothers Chemical Company; and ITT Corporation, now known as ITT LLC. (Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Gould Pumps(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Joseph Duffy added to party ITT LLC(pty:dft))(Duffy, Joseph)
June 12, 2020 Filing 82 NOTICE filed by defendant Air and Liquid Systems Corporation. JOINDER IN NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Powell, Glen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 81 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc, identifying Colfax Corporation, a publicly traded company, Colfax Fluid Handling LLC, and Imo Holdings, Inc.. (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 80 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey on behalf of Defendant IMO Industries Inc (Bailey, Bobbie)
June 11, 2020 Filing 79 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by Defendant IMO Industries Inc.(Attorney Bobbie Rae Bailey added to party IMO Industries Inc(pty:dft))(Bailey, Bobbie)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 78 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Stephen V. Wilson:DEFICIENCY IN ATTORNEY'S BUSINESS OR CONTACT INFORMATION. The contact information for attorney J Scott Wood is deficient in that no email address is listed on the Court's docket.If you are counsel of record in a case currently pending in this district and you need to update your business or contact information, you must file and serve Form G-06 ("Notice of Change of Attorney Business or Contact Information") in each of your pending cases. Doing so will satisfy your notice obligation under Local Rule 83-2.4. In addition, if you are a registered CM/ECF User, you mustlog in to your CM/ECF account and update your information directly in the CM/ECF System. See Local Rule 5-4.8.1. (lc)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 77 NEW CASE ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Stephen V. Wilson. (pc)
June 10, 2020 Filing 76 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Frederic W Norris counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Adding Frederic W. Norris as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Attorney Frederic W Norris added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft))(Norris, Frederic)
June 9, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Michael Howard Schuck on behalf of Defendant Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC (Attorney Michael Howard Schuck added to party Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Schuck, Michael)
June 9, 2020 Filing 74 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andy Justin Goetz on behalf of Defendant Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC (Goetz, Andy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 73 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Defendant SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (Crochet, Carla)
June 9, 2020 Filing 72 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Andy Justin Goetz on behalf of Defendant Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC (Attorney Andy Justin Goetz added to party Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Goetz, Andy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 71 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. (Barba, Luis)
June 9, 2020 Filing 70 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Defendant SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (Attorney Carla Lynn Crochet added to party SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft))(Crochet, Carla)
June 9, 2020 Filing 69 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc. (Barba, Luis)
June 9, 2020 Filing 68 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Armstrong International, Inc..(Attorney Luis Alfonso Barba added to party Armstrong International, Inc.(pty:dft))(Barba, Luis)
June 9, 2020 Filing 67 DISCLOSURE STATEMENT AND NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc. (Barba, Luis)
June 9, 2020 Filing 66 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc..(Attorney Luis Alfonso Barba added to party Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc. (pty:dft))(Barba, Luis)
June 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 65 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Otis D. Wright, II. Case transferred from Judge Otis D. Wright, II to the calendar of Judge Stephen V. Wilson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-04884 SVW(Ex). (rn)
June 9, 2020 Filing 64 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Carla Lynn Crochet on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company (Attorney Carla Lynn Crochet added to party Ingersoll-Rand Company(pty:dft))(Crochet, Carla)
June 9, 2020 Filing 63 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt on behalf of Defendant Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC (Attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt added to party Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Milbrodt, Jeremy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 62 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt on behalf of Defendant SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (Attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt added to party SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.(pty:dft))(Milbrodt, Jeremy)
June 9, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt on behalf of Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company (Attorney Jeremy David Milbrodt added to party Ingersoll-Rand Company(pty:dft))(Milbrodt, Jeremy)
June 8, 2020 CONFORMED FILED STAMPED 5/28/20 IN STATE COURT OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (SEE DOCUMENT WITHIN DOCKET NO. 53).(lc)
June 8, 2020 CONFORMED FILED STAMPED 5/28/20 IN STATE COURT OF COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant ALDRICH PUMP LLC, erroneously sued as Ingersoll-Rand Company, and as successor in interest to The Aldrich COmpany. (SEE FILING WITHIN DOCKET NO. 51)(lc)
June 8, 2020 CONFORMED FILED STAMPED COPY IN STATE COURT ON 5/27/20 OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery filed by defendant SB Decking. (SEE DOCUMENT WITHIN DOCKET NO. 48)(lc)
June 8, 2020 CONFORMED FILED 5/28/20 IN STATE COURT COPY OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (SEE ATTACHMENT ON DOCKET NO. 40-1)(lc)
June 8, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY IN STATE COURT ON 5/28/20 OF ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery) with JURY DEMAND filed by defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc. (SEE ATTACHMENT TO DOCKET NO. 31 -1).(lc)
June 8, 2020 Filing 60 NOTICE OF MOTION re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction #59 filed by Defendant Deere and Company. Motion set for hearing on 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Wiegmann, Yakov)
June 8, 2020 Filing 59 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss for Lack of Jurisdiction filed by Defendant Deere and Company. Motion set for hearing on 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM before Judge Otis D. Wright II. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Yakov P. Wiegmann, #2 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Yakov P. Wiegmann, #3 Declaration of Paul Wilczynski, #4 Exhibit A to Paul Wilczynski Declaration, #5 Proposed Order) (Attorney Yakov Paul Wiegmann added to party Deere and Company(pty:dft)) (Wiegmann, Yakov)
June 8, 2020 Filing 58 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Deere and Company (Wiegmann, Yakov)
June 8, 2020 Filing 57 AMENDED ANSWER to Plaintiffs' Unverified Complaint for Damages filed by Defendant Deere and Company. (Wiegmann, Yakov)
June 8, 2020 Filing 56 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC identifying Chevron Corporation and Phillips 66 as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 8, 2020 Filing 55 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, JURY DEMAND. filed by Defendant Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC.(Attorney Arpi Galfayan added to party Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC(pty:dft))(Galfayan, Arpi)
June 8, 2020 Filing 54 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 8, 2020 Filing 53 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 8, 2020 Filing 52 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company identifying Trane Technologies plc as Corporate Parent. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 8, 2020 Filing 51 NOTICE OF FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS' COMPLAINT FOR PERSONAL INJURIES AND LOSS OF CONSORTIUM; DEMAND FOR JURY TRIAL filed by Defendant Ingersoll-Rand Company. (Galfayan, Arpi)
June 8, 2020 Filing 50 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Defendant SB Decking identifying DEFENDANT as Corporate Parent. (Meyers, Lesa)
June 8, 2020 Filing 49 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant John Crane Inc..(Weglarz, Claire)
June 8, 2020 Filing 48 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE ANSWER filed by DEFENDANT SB Decking. (Meyers, Lesa)
June 8, 2020 Filing 47 DISCLOSURE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure filed by Defendant Campbell Industries Inc (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 8, 2020 Filing 46 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant Campbell Industries Inc. Adding Suzanna L. Minasian as counsel of record for Campbell Industries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Campbell Industries. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 8, 2020 Filing 45 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Lorillard Tobacco Company answer now due 7/7/2020; Hollingsworth and Vose Company answer now due 7/7/2020, re Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by defendants Lorillard Tobacco Company; Hollingsworth and Vose Company.(Attorney Rita M Haeusler added to party Hollingsworth and Vose Company (pty:dft), Attorney Rita M Haeusler added to party Lorillard Tobacco Company(pty:dft))(Haeusler, Rita)
June 8, 2020 Filing 44 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Ovsanna Thomas counsel for Defendant Campbell Industries Inc. Adding Ovsanna Thomas as counsel of record for Defendant Campbell Industries for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Campbell Industries. (Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 8, 2020 Filing 43 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND for Personal Injuries and Request for Jury Trial filed by Defendant Campbell Industries Inc.(Attorney Ovsanna Thomas added to party Campbell Industries Inc(pty:dft))(Thomas, Ovsanna)
June 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Percy Anderson. Case transferred from Judge Percy Anderson to the calendar of Judge Otis D. Wright, II for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-04884 ODW(Ex). (rn)
June 8, 2020 Filing 41 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC, identifying ENTRX LLC (Holding Company); Central National Insurance Company (ACE Group); Industrial Underwriters (ACE Group); Motor Vehicle Insurance Company (ACE Group); Hartford Fire Insurance Company (Hartford Group); Hartford Accident and Indemnity Company (Hartford Group); First State Insurance Company (Hartford Group); Continental Casualty Company (CNA Group); Harbor Insurance Company (CNA Group); Northbrook Insurance Company (Allstate); Granite State Insurance Company (AIG Group); National Union Fire Insurance Company of Pittsburgh, PA (AIG Group); American Home Insurance Company (AIG Group); Transport Insurance Company; American Motorist Insurance Company, in liquidation (Chubb Group).. (Scott, Connor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 40 NOTICE Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Metalclad Insulation LLC's Answer To Complaint)(Scott, Connor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 39 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., identifying Terra Millennium Corporation; Firemans Fund Insurance Co./Allianz/Enstar; Resolute Management; and RiverStone.. (Scott, Connor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE Of Re-Filing State Court Answer To Complaint filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.'s State Court Answer To Complaint)(Scott, Connor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 35 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Connor Matthew Scott counsel for Defendants J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Connor M. Scott as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Connor Matthew Scott added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Connor Matthew Scott added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Scott, Connor)
June 8, 2020 Filing 34 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Bradford J DeJardin counsel for Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Bradford J. DeJardin as counsel of record for Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Bradford J DeJardin added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(DeJardin, Bradford)
June 8, 2020 Filing 33 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Christopher W Wood counsel for Defendant J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.. Adding Christopher W. Wood as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.. (Attorney Christopher W Wood added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft))(Wood, Christopher)
June 8, 2020 Filing 32 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Julia M Beckley counsel for Defendants J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC. Adding Julia M. Beckley as counsel of record for J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Metalclad Insulation LLC for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.; Metalclad Insulation LLC. (Attorney Julia M Beckley added to party J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.(pty:dft), Attorney Julia M Beckley added to party Metalclad Insulation LLC(pty:dft))(Beckley, Julia)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 37 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson. Both the Court and the attorneys bear responsibility for the progress of litigation in the Federal Courts. (See order for further details) (yl)
June 5, 2020 Filing 36 SCHEDULING MEETING OFCOUNSEL by Judge Percy Anderson. Scheduling Conference is set for July 6, 2020 at 10:30 a.m. This action has been assigned to the calendar of United States District Judge Percy Anderson. The responsibility for the progress of litigation in the federal courts falls not only upon the attorneys in the action, but upon the court as well. (See order for further details) (yl)
June 5, 2020 Filing 31 DISCLOSURE of Rule 7.1 Disclosure filed by Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc. (Etemad, Neusha)
June 5, 2020 Filing 30 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neusha Etemad counsel for Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. Adding Neusha Etemad as counsel of record for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Etemad, Neusha)
June 5, 2020 Filing 29 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Neusha Etemad counsel for Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. Adding Melanie L. Ameele as counsel of record for Cleaver-Brooks, Inc. for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Cleaver-Brooks, Inc.. (Attorney Neusha Etemad added to party Cleaver Brooks, Inc.(pty:dft))(Etemad, Neusha)
June 5, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE OF RE-FILING STATE COURT ANSWER TO PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT filed by Defendant Cleaver Brooks, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Answer & Demand for Jury)(Etemad, Neusha)
June 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 27 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge R. Gary Klausner. Case transferred from Judge R. Gary Klausner to the calendar of Judge Percy Anderson for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2:20-cv-04884 PA(Ex). (rn)
June 4, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENGERY CORPORATION Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, served on 06/04/20. (Hugo, Edward)
June 4, 2020 Filing 25 DECLINATION TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Hugo, Edward)
June 4, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by DEFENDANT Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, identifying AMEC FOSTER WHEELER. (Hugo, Edward)
June 4, 2020 Filing 23 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Edward R Hugo counsel for Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation. Adding CHARLES S. PARK as counsel of record for 161430 for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENGERY CORPORATION. (Hugo, Edward)
June 4, 2020 Filing 22 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, filed by DEFENDANT FOSTER WHEELER ENGERY CORPORATION Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation.(Attorney Edward R Hugo added to party Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation(pty:dft))(Hugo, Edward)
June 4, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney James G Scadden on behalf of Defendant Warren Pumps LLC (Attorney James G Scadden added to party Warren Pumps LLC(pty:dft))(Scadden, James)
June 4, 2020 Filing 20 JOINDER filed by Defendant General Electric joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Jamison, Kevin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant General Electric, (Jamison, Kevin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D Jamison on behalf of Defendant General Electric (Jamison, Kevin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 17 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant General Electric.(Attorney Kevin D Jamison added to party General Electric(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 16 JOINDER filed by Defendant CBS Corporation joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Jamison, Kevin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant CBS Corporation, identifying ViacomCBS Inc. and National Amusements, Inc.. (Jamison, Kevin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Kevin D Jamison on behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation (Jamison, Kevin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint - (Discovery),,,,, with JURY DEMAND filed by Defendant CBS Corporation.(Attorney Kevin D Jamison added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft))(Jamison, Kevin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant General Electric (Attorney Erin N Empting added to party General Electric(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Erin N Empting on behalf of Defendant CBS Corporation (Attorney Erin N Empting added to party CBS Corporation(pty:dft))(Empting, Erin)
June 4, 2020 Filing 10 JOINDER filed by Defendant Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation (Hugo, Edward)
June 4, 2020 Filing 9 DISCLOSURE AND CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Warren Pumps LLC, identifying Colfax Corporation. (Attorney Glen R Powell added to party Warren Pumps LLC(pty:dft))(Powell, Glen)
June 4, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF JOINDER IN NOTICE OF REMOVAL filed by defendant Warren Pumps LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6)(Powell, Glen)
June 3, 2020 Filing 7 JOINDER filed by Defendant Crane Co. joining in Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit 2 - Preliminary Fact Sheet, #3 Exhibit 3 - Defendant Crane Co.s Notice Of Filing Of Notice Of Joinder In Removal Under 28 U.S.C. 1442(A))(Davis, Geoffrey)
June 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge R. Gary Klausner. (sw)
June 2, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge R. Gary Klausner and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (ghap)
June 1, 2020 CONFORMED FILED COPY OF COMPLAINT against Defendants Air and Liquid Systems Corporation, Armstrong International, Inc., Astra Flooring Company, BF Goodrich Company, Bae Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc., CBS Corporation, Calaveras Asbestos Ltd, Campbell Industries Inc, Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC, Cleaver Brooks, Inc., Crane Co., Crown Cork and Seal USA, Inc., DAP, Inc., Deere and Company, Does 1 through 300, Duriron Comapny, FMC Corporation, Fairbanks Morse Company, Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation, Frasers Boiler Service, Inc., General Electric, Gould Pumps, Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc., Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc., Hollingsworth and Vose Company, IMO Industries Inc, ITT LLC, Ingersoll-Rand Company, J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc., John Crane Inc., Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc, Lorillard Tobacco Company, M. Slayen and Associates, Inc., Metalclad Insulation LLC, Parker Hannifin Corporation, SB Decking, SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc., The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company, The W.W. Henry Company, Triple A Machine Shop Inc, Union Carbide Corporation, Viking Pump, Inc., Warren Pumps LLC. Jury Demanded., filed by plaintiffs Joan O Rourke, James O Rourke. (FILED IN STATE COURT ON 4/24/2020 SUBMITTED ATTACHED EXHIBIT A 14) (ghap)
June 1, 2020 Filing 3 DISCLOSURE of Statement to Federal Court re Notice of Removal (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendant John Crane Inc. (Weglarz, Claire)
June 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Defendant John Crane Inc.. (Weglarz, Claire)
June 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Los Angeles County Superior Court, case number 20STCV15845 Receipt No: ACACDC-26642161 - Fee: $400, filed by Defendant John Crane Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit J, #11 Exhibit K, #12 Exhibit L) (Attorney Claire C Weglarz added to party John Crane Inc.(pty:dft))(Weglarz, Claire)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: James O Rourke et al v. Air and Liquid Systems Corporation et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O'Rourke
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James O Rourke
Represented By: Michael C Eyerly
Represented By: Patrick A DeBlase
Represented By: Eric L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Joan O Rourke
Represented By: Michael C Eyerly
Represented By: Patrick A DeBlase
Represented By: Eric L Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fairbanks Morse Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cleaver Brooks, Inc.
Represented By: Gary D Sharp
Represented By: Neusha Etemad
Represented By: Melanie L Ameele
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viking Pump, Inc.
Represented By: Samantha Brignoni
Represented By: Edward R Ulloa
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC, fka ITT Corporation, fka ITT Industries, Inc.; individually and as successor in interest to Bell & Gossett Company, Foster Engineering Company and Kennedy Valve Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingersoll-Rand Company
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warren Pumps LLC
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Calaveras Asbestos Ltd
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kelly-Moore Paint Company Inc
Represented By: Michael B Giaquinto
Represented By: Samantha Brignoni
Represented By: Kimberly Erin Marks Solomon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bae Systems San Diego Ship Repair, Inc.
Represented By: Alan J Watson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollingsworth & Vose Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed & Co., Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gould Pumps
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air & Liquid Systems Corporation, sued individually and as successor-in-interest to Buffalo Pumps, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chevron Philips Chemical Company, LLC
Represented By: Michael Howard Schuck
Represented By: Andy Justin Goetz
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Astra Flooring Company
Represented By: Mihir Desai
Represented By: Dana L Burch
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Crane Inc.
Represented By: Claire C Weglarz
Represented By: Fred B Lee
Represented By: Macy M Chan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC f/k/a Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Campbell Industries Inc
Represented By: Ovsanna Thomas
Represented By: J Scott Wood
Represented By: Suzanna Lianna Minasian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CRANE CO. (sued individually and as successor-in-interest to CHAPMAN VALVE COMPANY);
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parker Hannifin Corporation
Represented By: Christopher Sean Patterson
Represented By: Robert Kum
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hill Brothers Chemical Company, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Armstrong International, Inc.
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Aaron L. Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Duriron Comapny
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DAP, Inc.
Represented By: Nicole Elisabet Gage
Represented By: Justin E Garratt
Represented By: Monica Williams Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: BF Goodrich Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe & Son, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Slayen and Associates, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DEERE AND COMPANY
Represented By: Yakov Paul Wiegmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork & Seal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: IMO Industries Inc
Represented By: Frederick W Gatt
Represented By: Olga Guadalupe Pena
Represented By: Bobbie Rae Bailey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fraser's Boiler Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire & Rubber Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Foster Wheeler Energy Corporation
Represented By: Charles S Park
Represented By: Edward R Hugo
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FMC Corporation
Represented By: Russell W Schatz, Jr
Represented By: Timothy C Pieper
Represented By: Francis D Pond
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SYD Carpenter Marine Contractor, Inc.
Represented By: Carla Lynn Crochet
Represented By: Arpi Galfayan
Represented By: Kenneth B Prindle
Represented By: Jeremy David Milbrodt
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lorillard Tobacco Company
Represented By: Robby S Naoufal
Represented By: Tina M. Schaefer
Represented By: Rita M Haeusler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Electric
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Triple A Machine Shop Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Union Carbide Corporation
Represented By: Farah Sohaili Nicol
Represented By: Stephen M Nichols
Represented By: Ryan S Landis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The W.W. Henry Company
Represented By: Nicolas P Martin
Represented By: Cyrian Barraca Tabuena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CBS Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation LLC
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Julia M Beckley
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goodrich Corporation
Represented By: David M Glaspy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J.T. Thorpe and Son, Inc.
Represented By: Christopher W Wood
Represented By: Frederic W Norris
Represented By: Julia M Beckley
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Corporation
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crane Co.
Represented By: Geoffrey M Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Crown Cork and Seal USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hollingsworth and Vose Company
Represented By: Robby S Naoufal
Represented By: Rita M Haeusler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westinghouse Electric Corporation
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Goulds Pumps LLC
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Goodyear Tire and Rubber Company
Represented By: Patrick James Foley
Represented By: Galen Bo Chuan Wang
Represented By: Tina Ladan Baravarian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 300
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Metalclad Insulation Corporation
Represented By: Bradford J DeJardin
Represented By: Julia M Beckley
Represented By: Connor Matthew Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Greene, Tweed and Co., Inc.
Represented By: Luis Alfonso Barba
Represented By: Christine D Calareso
Represented By: Rebecca Anne Bellow
Represented By: Aaron L. Britton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Viacom, Inc.
Represented By: Kevin D Jamison
Represented By: Erin N Empting
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ITT Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Joseph Duffy
Represented By: Amy Jo Talarico
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Air and Liquid Systems Corporation
Represented By: Michael J Pietrykowski
Represented By: Glen R Powell
Represented By: James G Scadden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SB Decking as successor-in-interest to Selby Battersby and Co. formerly doing business as Selby, Battersby & Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frasers Boiler Service, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?