Kirk Kara Corp. v. George P. Thompson, Jr. et al
Plaintiff: Kirk Kara Corp.
Defendant: George P. Thompson, Jr. and DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Case Number: 2:2020cv04941
Filed: June 3, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants DOES, George P. Thompson, Jr. amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 , filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp.(Bezdikian, Sareen)
June 11, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp., upon Defendant George P. Thompson, Jr. served on 6/8/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kamlyn Burnett, Authorized to Accept Service. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at business address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons returned. (Bezdikian, Sareen)
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant George P. Thompson, Jr. (jtil)
June 4, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (jtil)
June 3, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Kirk Kara Corp.. (Bezdikian, Sareen)
June 3, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp., (Bezdikian, Sareen)
June 3, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp.. (Bezdikian, Sareen)
June 3, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp.. (Bezdikian, Sareen)
June 3, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26676402 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Kirk Kara Corp.. (Attorney Sareen Bezdikian added to party Kirk Kara Corp.(pty:pla))(Bezdikian, Sareen)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kirk Kara Corp. v. George P. Thompson, Jr. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kirk Kara Corp.
Represented By: Sareen Bezdikian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: George P. Thompson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 through 10, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?