Cecia Gutierrez Morales v. Chad F. Wolf et al
Plaintiff: Cecia Gutierrez Morales
Defendant: Deputy Director Matthew T. Albence, Warden James Janecka, Director David Marin and Department of Homeland Security Secretary
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf, Matthew T. Albence, David Marin and James Janecka
Case Number: 2:2020cv04982
Filed: June 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Douglas F McCormick
Referring Judge: Josephine L Staton
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus - Alien Detainee
Cause of Action: 28:2241
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Case filed by Respondents-Defendants Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarin Rim, #2 Proposed Order, #3 Proof of Service) (Carpenter, Aaron)
July 6, 2020 Filing 21 STATEMENT OF CONSENT TO PROCEED before the assigned Magistrate Judge filed by Plaintiff Cecia Gutierrez Morales. (Rapoport, Joshua)
June 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER REQUIRING ANSWER/RETURN TO PETITION by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Notice: The court has issued a ruling on preliminary review. Pursuant to the Agreement on Acceptance of Service between the Clerk of Court and the United States Attorneys Office, this Notice constitutes service under Fed. R. Civ. P. 4. (Attachments: #1 Petition) (nbo)
June 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER Accepting Findings and Recommendation of United States Magistrate Judge by Judge Josephine L. Staton that the TRO Application #2 is DENIED. (jp)
June 16, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY filed by Respondents Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad F. Wolf to Objection #17 (Carpenter, Aaron)
June 15, 2020 Filing 17 OBJECTIONS to Order,,, Set/Reset Deadlines,, #16 filed by Petitioner Cecia Gutierrez Morales. (Rapoport, Joshua)
June 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 Findings and Recommendation re: Petitioner's Ex Parte Application for a Temporary Restraining Order by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. For the reasons stated above, IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Petitioner's Application for a TRO be DENIED. In light of the nature of the relief sought by Petitioner, any objections to these Findings and Recommendations shall be filed and served no later than 5:00 p.m. on Monday, June 15, 2020. Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations.' Any reply to such objections shall be filed and served no later than Tuesday, June 16, 2020. *See document for details.* (es)
June 10, 2020 Filing 15 REPLY support APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Respondents-Defendants from continuing to detain Plaintiff-Petitioner in violation of the Due Process Clause of the Fifth Amendment #2 filed by Petitioner Cecia Gutierrez Morales. (Attachments: #1 Supplement)(Rapoport, Joshua)
June 9, 2020 Filing 14 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Counsel are notified that Petitioner shall file their reply to the opposition to the Temporary Restraining Order #2 by no later than June 10, 2020, at 12:00 pm. The Court will determine whether a telephonic hearing will be helpful after receiving Petitioner's reply. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nbo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 8, 2020 Filing 13 60 DAY Summons Issued re Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 as to Respondent Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad F. Wolf. (es)
June 8, 2020 Filing 12 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Respondents-Defendants from continuing to detain Plaintiff-Petitioner in violation of the Due Process Clause of the Fifth Amendment #2 filed by Respondents Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad F. Wolf. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Sarin Rim)(Carpenter, Aaron)
June 8, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 , Notice of Deficiency in Request to Issue Summons,, #10 filed by plaintiff Cecia Gutierrez Morales. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Rapoport, Joshua)
June 8, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #7 . The following error(s) was found: The case number and/or judge(s)initials are incorrect. Summons is not directed to the defendant(s). The defendants name must appear in the To:section of the summons. If defendant names do not fit in the space provided, enter only the name of the first defendant and write see attached, then attach face page of complaint or addendum to summons. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (es)
June 5, 2020 Filing 9 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Aaron C G Carpenter counsel for Respondents Matthew T. Albence, James Janecka, David Marin, Chad F. Wolf. Adding Aaron C.G. Carpenter as counsel of record for Chad F. Wolf, Matthew T. Albence, David Marin, James Janecka for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Respondents-Defendants Chad F. Wolf, Matthew T. Albence, David Marin, James Janecka. (Attorney Aaron C G Carpenter added to party Matthew T. Albence(pty:res), Attorney Aaron C G Carpenter added to party James Janecka(pty:res), Attorney Aaron C G Carpenter added to party David Marin(pty:res), Attorney Aaron C G Carpenter added to party Chad F. Wolf(pty:res))(Carpenter, Aaron)
June 5, 2020 Filing 8 SCHEDULING NOTICE by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. Counsel are notified that Respondent shall file their opposition to the Temporary Restraining Order #2 by no later than June 8, 2020, at 5:00 pm. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (nbo) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 5, 2020 Filing 7 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Petition for Writ of Habeas Corpus, #1 filed by plaintiff Cecia Gutierrez Morales. (Attachments: #1 Supplement, #2 Supplement)(Rapoport, Joshua)
June 5, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF REFERENCE to a U.S. Magistrate Judge. This case has been assigned to the calendar of the Honorable District Judge Josephine L. Staton and referred to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick, who is authorized to consider preliminary matters and conduct all further hearings as may be appropriate or necessary. Pursuant to Local Rule 83-2.4, the Court must be notified within five (5) days of any address change. See notice for additional details. (jtil)
June 4, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Cecia Gutierrez Morales. (Rapoport, Joshua)
June 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Cecia Gutierrez Morales, (Rapoport, Joshua)
June 4, 2020 Filing 2 APPLICATION for Temporary Restraining Order as to enjoining Respondents-Defendants from continuing to detain Plaintiff-Petitioner in violation of the Due Process Clause of the Fifth Amendment filed by plaintiff Cecia Gutierrez Morales. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration Declaration of Fraser D. Muir, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order) (Rapoport, Joshua)
June 4, 2020 Filing 1 PETITION for Writ of Habeas Corpus by a Person in Federal Custody (28 USC 2241), Receipt No. ACACDC-26693200 for $5 filing fee, filed by plaintiff Cecia Gutierrez Morales. (Attorney Joshua Zirker Rapoport added to party Cecia Gutierrez Morales(pty:pla))(Rapoport, Joshua)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cecia Gutierrez Morales v. Chad F. Wolf et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cecia Gutierrez Morales
Represented By: Joshua Zirker Rapoport
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Director Matthew T. Albence
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Warden James Janecka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Director David Marin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Homeland Security Secretary
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Chad F. Wolf
Represented By: Aaron C G Carpenter
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: Matthew T. Albence
Represented By: Aaron C G Carpenter
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: David Marin
Represented By: Aaron C G Carpenter
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: James Janecka
Represented By: Aaron C G Carpenter
Represented By: OIL-DCS Trial Attorney
Represented By: Assistant 2241-194 US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?