Gong v. Westlend Financing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Chul Hyun Gong
Defendant: Westlend Financing, Inc., U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Stephanie Fuentes, LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Damian Ramirez, Reinoso Properties, Kristie Ahn, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Danny Ahn, Does 1 through 25, Inclusive, Ronald Alonzo and Westlend Financing, Inc. Lenders, A California Corporation doing business as American Capital Funding
Case Number: 2:2020cv05026
Filed: June 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Fernando M Olguin
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 31, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 31, 2020 Filing 27 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. On the court's own motion, the Motion to Dismiss #16 is taken off the 8/6/2020 calendar and placed under submission. No appearances are required on 8/6/2020. An order with the court's ruling will issue. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2020 Filing 26 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re Notice of Appearance #25 served on July 23, 2020. (McClendon, Regina)
July 23, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Regina J McClendon on behalf of Defendants LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (McClendon, Regina)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #21 , Request for Judicial Notice, #22 , Certificate/Notice of Interested Parties #23 served on 7/22/20. (Tom, Meagan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., identifying U.S. Bancorp, LSF9 Whole Loan Investment, Ltd., Ana Lisa Reinoso. (Tom, Meagan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 22 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint #21 filed by Defendants LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-31)(Tom, Meagan)
July 22, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's Complaint filed by Defendant LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/27/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attorney Meagan S Tom added to party LSF9 REO Investments, LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Meagan S Tom added to party Cesar Humberto Reinoso(pty:dft), Attorney Meagan S Tom added to party Reinoso Properties (pty:dft), Attorney Meagan S Tom added to party U.S. Bank Trust, N.A. (pty:dft)) (Tom, Meagan)
July 14, 2020 Filing 20 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Quality Loan Service Corporation, identifying Not applicable. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Starrett, Carl)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Fernando M. Olguin. Scheduling Conference set for 9/24/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (vdr)
July 10, 2020 Filing 18 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion to Dismiss #16 . The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. Compliance with Local Rule 7.1-1 is required no later than July 14, 2020. Local Rule 11-8 Memorandum/brief exceeding 10 pages shall contain table of contents. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. (iv)
July 9, 2020 Filing 17 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Ronald Alonzo, Stephanie Fuentes, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Damian Ramirez, re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint #16 served on 07/08/20. (Starrett, Carl)
July 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Complaint filed by defendant Ronald Alonzo, Stephanie Fuentes, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Damian Ramirez. Motion set for hearing on 8/6/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Fernando M. Olguin. (Attorney Carl H Starrett, II added to party Ronald Alonzo(pty:dft), Attorney Carl H Starrett, II added to party Stephanie Fuentes (pty:dft), Attorney Carl H Starrett, II added to party Quality Loan Service Corporation(pty:dft), Attorney Carl H Starrett, II added to party Damian Ramirez(pty:dft)) (Starrett, Carl)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE OF DISCREPANCY AND ORDER: by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, ORDERING Notice of Request for Admission submitted by Plaintiff Chul Hyun Gong received on 6/19/2020 is not to be filed but instead rejected. Denial based on: Discovery requests must be handled between the parties and only involve the court when they are a noticed motion re discovery. (iv)
June 25, 2020 Filing 14 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Danny Ahn, Kristie Ahn, Ronald Alonzo, Stephanie Fuentes, LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Damian Ramirez, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Westlend Financing, Inc. (iv)
June 25, 2020 Filing 13 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Danny Ahn, Kristie Ahn, Ronald Alonzo, Stephanie Fuentes, LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Damian Ramirez, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Westlend Financing, Inc. (iv)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Danny Ahn, Kristie Ahn, Ronald Alonzo, Stephanie Fuentes, LSF9 REO Investments, LLC, Quality Loan Service Corporation, Damian Ramirez, Cesar Humberto Reinoso, Reinoso Properties, U.S. Bank Trust, N.A., Westlend Financing, Inc. (iv)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Chul Hyun Gong. (iv)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Chul Hyun Gong. (iv)
June 25, 2020 Filing 9 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Chul Hyun Gong. (iv)
June 17, 2020 Filing 8 TEXT ONLY ENTRY by Chambers of Judge Fernando M. Olguin. This matter has been assigned to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin. The Court refers counsel to the Court's Initial Standing Order found on the Court's Website under Judge Olguin's Procedures and Schedules. Please read this Order carefully. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (vdr) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
June 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF DEFICIENCIES in Request to Issue Summons RE: Summons Request #5 , #6 . The following error(s) was found: The date and signature line must be left blank. The summons cannot be issued until this defect has been corrected. Please correct the defect and re-file your request. (iv)
June 17, 2020 Filing 6 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Chul Hyun Gong. (iv)
June 17, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint - (Discovery), #1 filed by Plaintiff Chul Hyun Gong. (iv)
June 5, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Fernando M. Olguin and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
June 5, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Chul Hyun Gong (car)
June 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants Case assigned to Judge Fernando M. Olguin for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg.(Filing fee $ 400 FEE PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiff Chul Hyun Gong. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gong v. Westlend Financing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Chul Hyun Gong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlend Financing, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank Trust, N.A.
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Stephanie Fuentes
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Represented By: Carl H Starrett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LSF9 REO Investments, LLC
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cesar Humberto Reinoso
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Damian Ramirez
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Represented By: Carl H Starrett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reinoso Properties
Represented By: Meagan S Tom
Represented By: Regina J McClendon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kristie Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Quality Loan Service Corporation
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Represented By: Carl H Starrett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Danny Ahn
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, Inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ronald Alonzo
Represented By: Melissa Robbins Coutts
Represented By: Carl H Starrett, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Westlend Financing, Inc. Lenders, A California Corporation doing business as American Capital Funding
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?