Kathleen Marie Boedeker v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Kathleen Marie Boedeker
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv05066
Filed: June 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XIV
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 8, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE TO COUNSEL: ALL PARTIES having consented to proceed before a United States Magistrate Judge, this case has been reassigned to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick for all further proceedings. Please use the case number CV20-5066 E on all documents subsequently filed to ensure the proper routing of all filings. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. TEXT ONLY ENTRY. (sn)
July 7, 2020 Filing 12 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Michael K Marriott added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Marriott, Michael)
July 6, 2020 Filing 11 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Marie Boedeker. (Shapiro, Brian)
July 6, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Kathleen Marie Boedeker, upon Defendant Andrew Saul served on 6/25/2020, answer due 10/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Attorney General. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to General Counsel. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1)(Shapiro, Brian)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Plaintiff shall promptly serve the Summons and Complaint on defendant, and shall file a proof of such service within 30 days of the date of this Order. Failure to comply with this aspect of this Order may result in the issuance of an Order to Show Cause Re Dismissal for Failure to Prosecute. It is Ordered that defendant's time to plead to the complaint is extended such that defendant's pleading must be filed within 90 days of service of the complaint. Defendant shall file a transcript of the administrative proceedings at the same time that defendant pleads to the complaint. A paper copy of the transcript of the administrative proceedings must be submitted directly to the chambers within 24 hours of the time defendant pleads to the complaint. Within 30 days of the filing of defendant's answer, the plaintiff shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand. Within 30 days of the filing of plaintiff's motion for summary judgment or remand, defendant shall file a motion for summary judgment or remand. If either party believes that the case cannot be resolved by motion, such party shall so advise the Court and the opposing party in writing. The Court will take the motions under submissions without oral argument, unless the Court otherwise orders. (sp)
June 10, 2020 Filing 8 60 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint #1 as to Defendant Andrew Saul. (sp)
June 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER Re Request to Proceed in Forma Pauperis by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick: granting #3 REQUEST to Proceed in Forma Pauperis with Declaration in Support (CV-60). (sp)
June 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
June 8, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Marie Boedeker, (Shapiro, Brian)
June 8, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Marie Boedeker. (Shapiro, Brian)
June 8, 2020 Filing 3 REQUEST to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Marie Boedeker. (Shapiro, Brian)
June 8, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Marie Boedeker. (Shapiro, Brian)
June 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with In Forma Pauperis request, filed by Plaintiff Kathleen Marie Boedeker. (Attorney Brian C Shapiro added to party Kathleen Marie Boedeker(pty:pla))(Shapiro, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kathleen Marie Boedeker v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Michael K Marriott
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kathleen Marie Boedeker
Represented By: Brian C Shapiro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?