Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc. v. City of Los Angeles et al
Plaintiff: Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc. and Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc. doing business as Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles
Defendant: Eric Garcetti, City of Los Angeles, City Council of the City of Los Angeles and Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Intervenor Defendant: Strategic Actions for a Just Economy and Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action
Amicus Curiae: Amici Curiae Cities and Counties, Adrienna Wong and National Housing Law Project
Case Number: 2:2020cv05193
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John E McDermott
Referring Judge: Dean D Pregerson
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 30, 2021 Filing 91 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Gigi Y-Co My Lam counsel for Intervenor Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. Gigi Lam is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor-Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attorney Gigi Y-Co My Lam added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:intvd), Attorney Gigi Y-Co My Lam added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:intvd))(Lam, Gigi Y-Co)
January 13, 2021 Filing 90 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Matthew Frederick Warren counsel for Intervenor Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. Matthew Warren is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Intervenor-Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attorney Matthew Frederick Warren added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:intvd), Attorney Matthew Frederick Warren added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:intvd))(Warren, Matthew)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 89 ORDER STAYING CASE PENDING APPEAL by Judge Dean D. Pregerso: By stipulation of the parties and the Courts finding of good cause, all proceedings in this Court are stayed pending resolution of Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc. dba Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles (AAGLAs) appeal of this Courts November 13, 2020 decision denying AAGLAs Motion for Preliminary Injunction. (shb)
November 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 88 ORDER from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals filed re: Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #84 filed by Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. CCA # 20-56251. The appeal filed November 25, 2020 is a preliminary injunction appeal. Accordingly, Ninth Circuit Rule 3-3 shall apply. [See document for all details.] (mat)
November 27, 2020 Filing 87 NOTIFICATION from Ninth Circuit Court of Appeals of case number assigned and briefing schedule. Appeal Docket No. 20-56251 assigned to Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #84 as to plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (mat)
November 25, 2020 Filing 86 Joint STIPULATION to Stay Case pending Appeal of Order Re Preliminary Injunction filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dennington, Douglas)
November 25, 2020 Filing 85 REPRESENTATION STATEMENT re Notice of Appeal to 9th Circuit Court of Appeals, #84 . (Dennington, Douglas)
November 25, 2020 Filing 84 NOTICE OF APPEAL to the 9th Circuit Court of Appeals filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. Appeal of Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction #80 . (Appeal Fee - $505 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-29207593.) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Dennington, Douglas)
November 25, 2020 Filing 83 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Defendant City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti for Court Reporter. Court will contact Alfred Martinez at alfred.martinez@lacity.org with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Zhong, Elaine)
November 25, 2020 Filing 82 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Intervenor-Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy for Court Reporter. Court will contact Greg Wise at gwise@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Nath, Rohit)
November 20, 2020 Filing 81 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc. for Court Reporter. Court will contact Patricia Johnson at pjohnson@rutan.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Dennington, Douglas)
November 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 80 ORDER DENYING PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #46 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: DENYING Without Prejudice #46 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction.See order for further details. (shb)
November 4, 2020 Filing 79 NOTICE of Change of address by John A Ramirez attorney for Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 18575 Jamboree Road, 9th Floor, Irvine, CA 92612. Filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Ramirez, John)
November 4, 2020 Filing 78 NOTICE of Change of address by Kelsey Quist attorney for Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 18575 Jamboree Road, 9th Floor, Irvine, CA 92612. Filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Quist, Kelsey)
November 3, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE of Change of address by Peter J. Howell attorney for Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 18575 Jamboree Road, 9th Floor, Irvine, CA 92612. Filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Howell, Peter)
November 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 76 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND RELATED DEADLINES #74 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. By stipulation of the parties and the Court's finding of good cause, the Rule 26 Scheduling Conference presently set for November 9, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. is continued to December 7, 2020, at 1:30 p.m. The Court further continues the deadline for filing the Joint Report under Rule 26(f), and for serving initial disclosures pursuant to Rule 26(a)(1)(A) to November 30, 2020. (et)
November 2, 2020 Filing 75 NOTICE of Change of address by Douglas J Dennington attorney for Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. Changing attorneys address to 18575 Jamboree Road, 9th Floor, Irvine, CA 92612. Filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Dennington, Douglas)
November 2, 2020 Filing 74 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Rule 26 Scheduling Conference from November 9, 2020 to December 7, 2020 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dennington, Douglas)
October 28, 2020 Filing 73 Notice of Electronic Filing re Motion Hearing,, Order on Motion for Preliminary Injunction, #72 e-mailed to Sophia TonNu bounced due to No longer at firm. The primary e-mail address associated with the attorney record has been deleted. Pursuant to Local Rules it is the attorneys obligation to maintain all personal contact information including e-mail address in the CM/ECF system. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (lmh) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
October 26, 2020 Filing 72 MINUTES OF TELEPHONE MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION RE CITY OF LOS ANGELES EVICTION MORATORIUM #46 held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Case called; appearances made. Court and counsel confer as reflected on the record. The matter is taken under submission. Court Reporter: Maria Bustillos. (shb)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 71 ORDER GRANTING MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AS AMICI CURIAE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION TO MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION BY THE CITY OF CHICAGO AND TWENTY LOCAL GOVERNMENTS #67 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED: For the reasons stated in the motion filed by the City of Chicago and Twenty Local Governments, the Unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Brief as Amici Curiae is GRANTED. (et)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 70 ORDER GRANTING NATIONAL HOUSING LAW PROJECT'S MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF AMICUS CURIAE #65 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. [See Order for further details.] (et)
October 19, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 69 ORDER RE: MOTION FOR LEAVE TO FILE BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE IN OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUCTION #61 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. It is hereby ORDERED that the motion for leave to file the proposed Brief of Amici Curiae is GRANTED. It is further ORDERED that the Brief of Amici Curiae attached to the motion is deemed filed with this Court upon entry of this Order. (et)
October 19, 2020 Filing 68 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 Response to [dkt 63] Plaintiffs Objections to Intervenor-Defendants Opposition Evidence filed by Intervenor Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attorney Kathryn Ann Eidmann added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:intvd), Attorney Kathryn Ann Eidmann added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:intvd))(Eidmann, Kathryn)
October 13, 2020 Filing 67 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Amici Curiae Cities and Counties. Motion set for hearing on 10/26/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Proposed Brief of Amici Curiae Cities and County, #2 Proposed Order Granting Leave to File Amicus Brief) (TonNu, Sophia)
October 13, 2020 Filing 66 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Amicus Amici Curiae Cities and Counties, (TonNu, Sophia)
October 13, 2020 Filing 65 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Amicus Curiae National Housing Law Project. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Order, #2 Exhibit Proposed Amicus Brief) (Attorney Deborah Thrope added to party National Housing Law Project(pty:am)) (Thrope, Deborah)
October 13, 2020 Filing 64 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Sophia T TonNu counsel for Amicus Amici Curiae Cities and Counties. Adding Sophia T. TonNu as counsel of record for Amici Curiae Cities and Counties for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Amici Curiae Cities and Counties. (Attorney Sophia T TonNu added to party Amici Curiae Cities and Counties(pty:am))(TonNu, Sophia)
October 12, 2020 Filing 63 OBJECTION IN SUPPORT OF re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Dennington, Douglas)
October 12, 2020 Filing 62 REPLY In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Dennington, Douglas)
October 9, 2020 Filing 61 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to File Amicus Brief filed by Counsel for Amici Adrienna Wong. (Attachments: #1 BRIEF OF AMICI CURIAE SCHOLARS IN SUPPORT OF INTERVENORS OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #2 Proposed Order) (Attorney Adrienna Wong added to party Adrienna Wong(pty:am)) (Wong, Adrienna)
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 60 ORDER GRANTING JOINT STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO PLAINTIFFS THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: By stipulation of the parties and the Courts finding of good cause, the deadline for the City Defendants and Defendant-Intervenors to respond to Plaintiffs complaint is here by extended to twenty-one (21) days after the Court issues an order deciding Plaintiffs motion for preliminary injunction (ECF No. 46). (shb)
October 8, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 59 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson, re Stipulation for Extension of Time to File Response/Reply, #58 : By stipulation of the parties and the Courts finding of good cause, Plaintiff will serve its Reply Briefs to both the Citys and Intervenors Oppositions to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction on Monday, October 12, 2020; Plaintiff will file its Reply Briefs to both the Citys and Intervenors Oppositions to Plaintiffs Motion for Preliminary Injunction with this Court on Tuesday, October 13, 2020. (shb)
October 7, 2020 Filing 58 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Reply as to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Extending Time to File Reply)(Dennington, Douglas)
October 6, 2020 Filing 57 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to 21 days after ruling on plaintiff's motion for preliminary injunction re Amended Complaint/Petition, #42 filed by Intervenor-Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Nath, Rohit)
October 5, 2020 Filing 56 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 Intervenors' Request for Judicial Notice in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5)(Nath, Rohit)
October 5, 2020 Filing 55 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 Intervenors' Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction filed by Intervenor Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attachments: #1 Supplemental Declaration of Cynthia Strathmann, #2 Declaration of Professor Emily Benfer, #3 Declaration of Ranit Mishori, #4 Declaration of Dr. Sam Tsemberis, #5 Exhibit A to Declaration of Dr. Sam Tsemberis, #6 Exhibit B to Declaration of Dr. Sam Tsemberis, #7 Declaration of Gabriel B. (English translation), #8 Declaration of Gabriel B. (Spanish), #9 Declaration of Maria Sanchez regarding English translation of Declaration of Gabriel B., #10 Declaration of Danny C., #11 Declaration of Drew Cookson, #12 Declaration of Francisco Duenas, #13 Declaration of Pedro M. (English translation), #14 Declaration of Pedro M. (Spanish), #15 Declaration of William Lacker regarding English translation of Declaration of Pedro M., #16 Declaration of Paola R., #17 Declaration of Sonia R., #18 Declaration of Susana S. (English translation), #19 Declaration of Susana S. (Spanish), #20 Declaration of William Lacker regarding English translation of Declaration of Susana S., #21 Declaration of Eugenia T. (English translation), #22 Declaration of Eugenia T. (Spanish), #23 Declaration of William Lacker regarding English translation of Declaration of Eugenia T.)(Nath, Rohit)
October 5, 2020 Filing 54 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANTS' OPPOSITION re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit FF, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit TT, #23 Exhibit U, #24 Exhibit V, #25 Exhibit W, #26 Exhibit X, #27 Exhibit Y, #28 Exhibit Z, #29 Exhibit ZZ)(Breithaupt, Deborah)
October 5, 2020 Filing 53 Opposition to Motion for Preliminary Injunction Opposition re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Breithaupt, Deborah)
September 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 52 ORDER CONTINUING HEARING DATE FOR PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION, #51 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: By stipulation of the parties and the Courts finding of good cause, the hearing date for Plaintiffs motion for a preliminary injunction is re-set to October 26, 2020, at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9C. The deadlines to serve opposition and reply papers are adjusted accordingly. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
September 23, 2020 Filing 51 Joint STIPULATION to Continue Hearing Date for Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction from October 19, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. to October 26, 2020 at 10:00 a.m. Re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Intervenor-Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Rohit D Nath added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:intvd), Attorney Rohit D Nath added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:intvd))(Nath, Rohit)
September 23, 2020 Filing 50 DECLARATION of Fred Smith In Support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Dennington, Douglas)
September 23, 2020 Filing 49 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Motion Related Document, #48 . The following error(s) was/were found: Incorrect event selected. Correct event to be used is: Civil Events Other Filings Notices - Select - Notice of Lodging. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (shb)
September 22, 2020 Filing 48 [Proposed] Order Granting Motion for Preliminary Injunction re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Dennington, Douglas)
September 21, 2020 Filing 47 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium #46 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8)(Dennington, Douglas)
September 21, 2020 Filing 46 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Preliminary Injunction re City of LA Eviction Moratorium filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. Motion set for hearing on 10/19/2020 at 10:00 AM before Judge Dean D. Pregerson. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Dean Yukelson, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Declaration Evelyn Garci, #4 Exhibit A, #5 Declaration Natalie Adomian, #6 Declaration Adam Rosenberg) (Dennington, Douglas)
September 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 45 ORDER #44 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Defendants' responsive pleading to the Third Amended Complaint shall be extended to, and including, October 10, 2020. The Rule 26 Scheduling Conference presently set for September 14, 2020, is continued to November 9, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. (lom)
September 2, 2020 Filing 44 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to October 10, 2020 re Amended Complaint/Petition, #42 , Order,, Set/Reset Hearing, #36 filed by Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Breithaupt, Deborah)
August 27, 2020 Filing 43 TRANSCRIPT ORDER as to Intervenor-Defendants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy for Court Reporter. Court will contact Greg Wise at gwise@susmangodfrey.com with further instructions regarding this order. Transcript preparation will not begin until payment has been satisfied with the court reporter. (Nath, Rohit)
August 27, 2020 Filing 42 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against DEFENDANTS City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Does, Eric Garcetti amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.(Dennington, Douglas)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 41 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: By stipulation, #40 of the parties and the Courts finding of good cause, Plaintiff may file a Third Amended Complaint on or before August 27, 2020. IT IS SO ORDERED. (shb)
August 26, 2020 Filing 40 Third STIPULATION to Amend Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Dennington, Douglas)
August 20, 2020 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Craig Castellanet on behalf of Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy (Attorney Craig Castellanet added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:bkmov), Attorney Craig Castellanet added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:bkmov))(Castellanet, Craig)
August 18, 2020 Filing 38 NOTICE OF FILING TRANSCRIPT filed for proceedings 8/3/2020 re Transcript #37 THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (Baird, Miriam) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
August 18, 2020 Filing 37 TRANSCRIPT for proceedings held on 8/3/2020 10:00 AM. Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder: miriam baird, phone number mvb11893@aol.com. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Electronic Court Recorder before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. Notice of Intent to Redact due within 7 days of this date. Redaction Request due 9/8/2020. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 9/18/2020. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 11/16/2020. (Baird, Miriam)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Scheduling Conference set for September 14, 2020 at 1:30 p.m. This matter is set for a scheduling conference in Courtroom 9C, before the Honorable Dean D. Pregerson, located at 350 West 1st Street, Los Angeles, California 90012. The conferencewill be held pursuant to Federal Rules of Civil Procedure 16(b). Lead trial counsel shall attend the scheduling conference. See order for further details. (shb)
August 7, 2020 Filing 35 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Does, Eric Garcetti amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.(Dennington, Douglas)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 34 ORDER by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: By stipulation of the parties and the Courts finding of good cause, Plaintiff may file a Second Amended Complaint on or before August 7, 2020. Defendants responsive pleading to the Second Amended Complaint shall be extended to, and including August 28, 2020. (shb)
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO INTERVENE, #13 AS DEFENDANTS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: See order for further details. (shb)
August 4, 2020 Filing 32 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to Amend filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Granting Extension to File and Respond to 2nd Amended Complaint)(Dennington, Douglas)
August 3, 2020 Filing 31 MINUTES OF MOTION TO INTERVENE HELD VIA TELEPHONE #13 held before Judge Dean D. Pregerson: Case called; appearances made. Court and counsel confer as reflected on the record. The matter is taken under submission. Plaintiff to file amended complaint by August 4, 2020. Responsive pleading due no later than August 28, 2020. Court Reporter: Miriam Baird. (shb)
July 30, 2020 Filing 30 STIPULATION to AMEND THE FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT AND CITY DEFENDANTS EXTENSION IN RESPONSE PERIOD TO AUGUST 28, 2020 Amended Complaint/Petition #14 filed by Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Breithaupt, Deborah)
July 29, 2020 Filing 29 NOTICE RE HEARING TO BE HELD VIA TELEPHONE by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Pursuant the Central District of California's Continuity of Operations Plan (COOP), and the Court's phased reopening, the matter #13 set for hearing August 3, 2020 at 10:00 A.M. will be held via telephone. The Courts clerk will supply the contact information to counsel. THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2020 Filing 28 SCHEDULING NOTICE (IN CHAMBERS) BY Dean D. Pregerson. The Motion to Intervene as Defendants, filed July 1, 2020 #13 failed to include start time. On the Courts own motion, the matter will be heard on August 3, 2020, at 10:00 AM.THERE IS NO PDF DOCUMENT ASSOCIATED WITH THIS ENTRY. (pg) TEXT ONLY ENTRY
July 23, 2020 Filing 27 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Gigi Y-Co My Lam on behalf of Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy (Lam, Gigi Y-Co)
July 22, 2020 Filing 26 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Alisa Marie Randell on behalf of Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy (Attorney Alisa Marie Randell added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:bkmov), Attorney Alisa Marie Randell added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:bkmov))(Randell, Alisa)
July 22, 2020 Filing 25 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Faizah Malik on behalf of Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy (Malik, Faizah)
July 22, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Lauren Nicole Zack on behalf of Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy (Zack, Lauren)
July 21, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. correcting Reply (Motion related), #22 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Eidmann, Kathryn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY in support of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Defendants and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 Proposed Intervenors' Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Intervene filed by Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Eidmann, Kathryn)
July 20, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Rohit D Nath counsel for Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. Adding Rohit D. Nath as counsel of record for Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attorney Rohit D Nath added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:bkmov), Attorney Rohit D Nath added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:bkmov))(Nath, Rohit)
July 20, 2020 Filing 20 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman counsel for Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. Adding Krista Kauble Pachman as counsel of record for Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:bkmov), Attorney Krysta Kauble Pachman added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:bkmov))(Kauble Pachman, Krysta)
July 20, 2020 Filing 19 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Marc M Seltzer counsel for Movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. Adding Marc M. Seltzer as counsel of record for Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action and Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attorney Marc M Seltzer added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:bkmov), Attorney Marc M Seltzer added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:bkmov))(Seltzer, Marc)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS by Judge Dean D. Pregerson: This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Counsel are encouraged to review the Central Districts website for additional information. The address is http://www.cacd.uscourts.gov. It is not necessary to clear a motion date with the Court Clerk prior to filing the motion. The Court hears motions only on Mondays at 10:00 a.m. See order for further detaisls. (shb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE Non-Opposition To Motion To Intervene filed by Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti. (Breithaupt, Deborah)
July 13, 2020 Filing 16 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Defendants and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9)(Dennington, Douglas)
July 13, 2020 Filing 15 OPPOSITION IN SUPPORT OF re: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Defendants and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof #13 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.. (Dennington, Douglas)
July 6, 2020 Filing 14 First AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Defendants amending Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 , filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.(Dennington, Douglas)
July 1, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Intervene Notice of Motion and Motion to Intervene as Defendants and Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support Thereof filed by movants Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action, Strategic Actions for a Just Economy. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Proposed Order) (Attorney Kathryn Ann Eidmann added to party Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action(pty:bkmov), Attorney Kathryn Ann Eidmann added to party Strategic Actions for a Just Economy(pty:bkmov)) (Eidmann, Kathryn)
June 24, 2020 Filing 12 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Elaine Zhong counsel for Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti. Adding Elaine Zhong as counsel of record for City of Los Angeles; Eric Garcetti in his official capacity; City Council of the City of Los Angeles in its official capacity for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendants City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti, City Council of the City of Los Angeles. (Attorney Elaine Zhong added to party City Council of the City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Elaine Zhong added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Elaine Zhong added to party Eric Garcetti(pty:dft))(Zhong, Elaine)
June 24, 2020 Filing 11 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to City Council of the City of Los Angeles answer now due 8/3/2020; Eric Garcetti answer now due 8/3/2020; City of Los Angeles answer now due 8/3/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles; Eric Garcetti; City of Los Angeles.(Attorney Deborah J Breithaupt added to party City Council of the City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah J Breithaupt added to party City of Los Angeles(pty:dft), Attorney Deborah J Breithaupt added to party Eric Garcetti(pty:dft))(Breithaupt, Deborah)
June 17, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., re Notice to Parties of Court-Directed ADR Program (ADR-8) - optional html form #6 , Notice of Assignment to United States Judges(CV-18) - optional html form #5 served on June 17, 2020. (Dennington, Douglas)
June 15, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., upon Defendant City Council of the City of Los Angeles served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon City Council of the City of Los Angeles in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dennington, Douglas)
June 15, 2020 Filing 8 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., upon Defendant City of Los Angeles served on 6/12/2020, answer due 7/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Defendant City of Los Angeles in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Dennington, Douglas)
June 11, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 as to Defendants City Council of the City of Los Angeles, City of Los Angeles, Eric Garcetti. (ghap)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (ghap)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by PLAINTIFF Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., dba Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles, (Dennington, Douglas)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening), #1 filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., dba Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles. (Dennington, Douglas)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Movant Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., dba Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles. (Dennington, Douglas)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26771990 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., dba Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles. (Attorney Douglas J Dennington added to party Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc., dba Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles(pty:bkmov))(Dennington, Douglas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc. v. City of Los Angeles et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Eric Garcetti
Represented By: Elaine Zhong
Represented By: Deborah J Breithaupt
Represented By: Craig Takenaka
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Represented By: David J Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Elaine Zhong
Represented By: Deborah J Breithaupt
Represented By: Craig Takenaka
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Represented By: David J Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: City Council of the City of Los Angeles
Represented By: Elaine Zhong
Represented By: Deborah J Breithaupt
Represented By: Craig Takenaka
Represented By: Matthew Alex Scherb
Represented By: David J Michaelson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 25, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc.
Represented By: John A Ramirez
Represented By: Peter J. Howell
Represented By: Kelsey Quist
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Apartment Association of Los Angeles County, Inc. doing business as Apartment Association of Greater Los Angeles
Represented By: John A Ramirez
Represented By: Peter J. Howell
Represented By: Kelsey Quist
Represented By: Douglas J Dennington
Represented By: Peter J Howell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Strategic Actions for a Just Economy
Represented By: Rohit D Nath
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Gigi Y-Co My Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor defendant: Alliance of Californians for Community Empowerment Action
Represented By: Rohit D Nath
Represented By: Kathryn Ann Eidmann
Represented By: Matthew Frederick Warren
Represented By: Gigi Y-Co My Lam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Amici Curiae Cities and Counties
Represented By: Sophia T TonNu
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: Adrienna Wong
Represented By: Adrienna Wong
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Amicus curiae: National Housing Law Project
Represented By: Deborah Thrope
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?