EZ Logistics LLC v. American Eel Depot Corp.
Plaintiff: EZ Logistics LLC
Defendant: American Eel Depot Corp.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05203
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Consuelo B Marshall
Referring Judge: Alka Sagar
Nature of Suit: Contract: Marine
Cause of Action: 28:1333
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2020 Filing 12 DEFAULT BY CLERK F.R.Civ.P.55(a) as to American Eel Depot Corp (shb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 REQUEST for Clerk to Enter Default against defendant American Eel Depot Corp. filed by plaintiff EZ Logistics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Declaration) (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff EZ Logistics LLC, upon Defendant American Eel Depot Corp. served on 6/22/2020, answer due 7/13/2020. in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
June 12, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR: Due to clerical error Re: Summons Issued (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #6 . Document # 6 Due to clerical error. The docket clerk docketed the 21 DAY Summons for 2:20-cv-5194-SVW (JPRx) onto the wrong case number. (ghap)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant American Eel Depot Corp.. (shb)
June 11, 2020 Filing 6 [NOTICE OF CLERICAL ERROR ISSUED ON 6/12/2020, SEE DOCKET ENTRY NO. 8] 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant American Eel Depot Corp. (ghap) Modified on 6/12/2020 (ghap).
June 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Alka Sagar. (ghap)
June 11, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff EZ Logistics LLC, identifying none. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff EZ Logistics LLC. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff EZ Logistics LLC. (Kehagiaras, Andrew)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26775133 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff EZ Logistics LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit) (Attorney Andrew D Kehagiaras added to party EZ Logistics LLC(pty:pla))(Kehagiaras, Andrew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: EZ Logistics LLC v. American Eel Depot Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: EZ Logistics LLC
Represented By: Andrew D Kehagiaras
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Eel Depot Corp.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?