Amos Media Company v. EPDF.PUB
Plaintiff: Amos Media Company and Amos Media Company an Ohio corporation doing business as Scott Publishing Co.
Defendant: EPDF.PUB
Case Number: 2:2020cv05206
Filed: June 11, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Alicia G Rosenberg
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE of Non-Receipt of Opposition and Reply In Support of Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by plaintiff Amos Media Company. (Chen, Dillon)
July 10, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference filed by plaintiff Amos Media Company. Motion set for hearing on 8/11/2020 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Joseph S. Leventhal In Support of Motion for Leave to Serve Third Party Subpoenas Prior to Rule 26(f) Conference, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Proposed Order)(Leventhal, Joseph)
June 22, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Amos Media Company. (Leventhal, Joseph)
June 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
June 12, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (car)
June 12, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant EPDF.PUB. (car)
June 12, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 12, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and Magistrate Judge Alicia G. Rosenberg. (car)
June 11, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Amos Media Company. (Leventhal, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Amos Media Company. (Leventhal, Joseph)
June 11, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26776265 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Amos Media Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1) (Attorney Joseph S Leventhal added to party Amos Media Company(pty:pla))(Leventhal, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amos Media Company v. EPDF.PUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Media Company
Represented By: Joseph S Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amos Media Company an Ohio corporation doing business as Scott Publishing Co.
Represented By: Joseph S Leventhal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: EPDF.PUB
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?