Antonio Fernandez v. The Quad at Whittier, LLC et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: The Quad at Whittier, LLC, Does 1-10 and Big 5 Corp.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05406
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER AND NOTICE TO ALL PARTIES by Judge Dolly M. Gee. In light of Plaintiff's notice of settlement, indicating that the case has settled in its entirety, this action is placed in inactive status. By October 12, 2020, the parties shall file either (1) a stipulation and proposed order for dismissal of the action or judgment, or (2) a motion to reopen if settlement has not been consummated. Upon the failure to timely comply with this Order, this action shall be deemed dismissed as of October 13, 2020. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (iv)
August 11, 2020 Filing 21 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER APPROVING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO INITIAL COMPLAINT by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Upon Stipulation #18 , IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant Big 5 Corp. shall have until 8/28/2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (gk)
July 23, 2020 Filing 19 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, re Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Party(ies) (Pursuant to FRCP 41a(1)) #17 served on 7/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Seabock, Amanda)
July 23, 2020 Filing 18 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 28, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Big 5 Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shireen Banki Rogers added to party Big 5 Corp.(pty:dft))(Rogers, Shireen)
July 21, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE OF DISMISSAL filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez pursuant to FRCP 41a(1) without prejudice as to The Quad at Whittier, LLC. (Seabock, Amanda)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER DECLINING TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court ordered Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim asserted in the Complaint #8 . Having reviewed and considered Plaintiff's response to the Court's Order to Show Cause #14 , the Court declines to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the state law claim. Plaintiff alternatively seeks certification of an interlocutory appeal or the stay of any order declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction pending resolution of an appeal filed on 8/20/2019, in Ninth Circuit Case No. 19-55974. The Court concludes that Plaintiff has not satisfied the requirements for either certification of an interlocutory appeal or a stay pending appeal. The Court denies Plaintiff's request for a stay or certification of an interlocutory appeal. The Court dismisses the state law claim without prejudice. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 1, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Big 5 Corp. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Shireen Rogers, Attorney. (Handy, Russell)
June 30, 2020 Filing 14 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandezto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,, Order to Show Cause,,, #8 (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration, #3 Exhibit 1, #4 Exhibit 2, #5 proof of service)(Handy, Russell)
June 29, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant The Quad at Whittier, LLC served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: C T CORPORATION SYSTEM (Albert Damonte, intake specialist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
June 26, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Big 5 Corp. served on 6/23/2020, answer due 7/14/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: Corporation Service Company - Becky De George in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
June 26, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, re Notice to Parties ADA Disability Access Litigation (ADR-20) #10 served on 6/26/2020. (Handy, Russell)
June 25, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation. (kti)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THE COURT SHOULD NOT DECLINE TO EXERCISE SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION OVER PLAINTIFF'S STATE LAW CLAIM by Judge Dolly M. Gee: The Court orders Plaintiff to show cause in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim. In responding to this Order to Show Cause, Plaintiff shall identify the amount of statutory damages Plaintiff seeks to recover. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by 7/2/2020. Failure to timely or adequately respond to this Order to Show Cause may, without further warning, result in the Court declining to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and the dismissal of any such claim pursuant to 28 U.S.C. section 1367(c). Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
June 18, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Big 5 Corp., The Quad at Whittier, LLC. (car)
June 18, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 18, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
June 18, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26860478 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. The Quad at Whittier, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Quad at Whittier, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big 5 Corp.
Represented By: Shireen Banki Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?