Ronnie R. Govea v. Ben Lee et al
Plaintiff: Ronnie R. Govea
Defendant: C. Bingham, R. Jackson, Ana Monterrosa, S. Gates and Ben Lee
Case Number: 2:2020cv05443
Filed: June 18, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Dolly M Gee
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson: granting #9 REQUEST for Enlargement of Time to File. Plaintiff shall file the response to the Court's Order Dismissing the Complaint with Leave to Amend no later than August 21, 2020. (hr)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 REQUEST for a time enlargement to response to the court's memorandum and order filed by Plaintiff Ronnie R. Govea. (et)
July 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER STRIKING DKT. NO. #6 AND DKT. NO. #7 by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. Because the second IFP request and civil rights complaint are, in fact, redundant of the original Complaint and IFP request, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that they are STRICKEN from the docket. Plaintiff is reminded to file a First Amended Complaint or Notice of Voluntary Dismissal that complies with the Court's July 1, 2020 Order no later than July 22, 2020. (see document for further details) (hr)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MEMORANDUM AND ORDER DISMISSING COMPLAINT IN PART WITH LEAVE TO AMEND by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson, re Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 . If Plaintiff still wishes to pursue this action, he is granted twenty-one (21) days from the date of this Memorandum and Order within which to file one of the following: (1) a First Amended Complaint that corrects the defects identified above; or (2) a signed document entitled Notice of Voluntary Dismissal, in which Plaintiff dismisses, without prejudice, Defendants Bingham, Jackson, and Gates. (see document for further details) (Attachments: #1 Blank Civil Rights Complaint Form, #2 Blank Notice of Dismissal Form) (hr)
June 30, 2020 Filing 7 **STRICKEN PER MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER #8 ** REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by Plaintiff Ronnie R. Govea. (hr) Modified on 7/9/2020 (hr).
June 30, 2020 Filing 6 **STRICKEN PER MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER #8 ** FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants C. Bingham, S. Gates, R. Jackson, Ben Lee, Ana Monterrosa amending Complaint (Prisoner Civil Rights) #1 filed by Plaintiff Ronnie R. Govea ; JURY DEMAND(hr) Modified on 7/9/2020 (hr).
June 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER RE REQUEST TO PROCEED WITHOUT PREPAYMENT OF FILING FEES by Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. IT IS ORDERED that the Request to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees is hereby GRANTED. #2 [SEE ORDER FOR FURTHER INFORMATION] (gr)
June 18, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
June 18, 2020 Filing 2 REQUEST to Proceed Without Prepayment of Filing Fees with Declaration in Support filed by plaintiff Ronnie R. Govea. (ghap)
June 18, 2020 Filing 1 CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT filed against Defendants C. Bingham, S. Gates, R. Jackson, Ben Lee, Ana Monterrosa pursuant to 42 U.S.C. 1983. Case assigned to Judge Dolly M. Gee and referred to Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson., filed by plaintiff Ronnie R. Govea. (ghap)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ronnie R. Govea v. Ben Lee et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ronnie R. Govea
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. Bingham
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: R. Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ana Monterrosa
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: S. Gates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Lee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?