Injune David Choi v. The University of Southern California
Plaintiff: Injune David Choi
Defendant: The University of Southern California
Case Number: 2:2020cv05573
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Pedro V Castillo
Referring Judge: Dolly M Gee
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 16, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 21 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choito Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,,,,,, Order to Show Cause,,,,, #20 (Kim, Jae)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE WHY THIS CASE SHOULD NOT BE CONSOLIDATED WITH IN RE UNIVERSITY OF SOUTHERN CALIFORNIA TUITION AND FEES COVID-19 REFUND LITIGATION, CASE NUMBER CV 20-4066-DMG (PVCx) by Judge Dolly M. Gee: On 7/17/2020, the Court ordered four cases against Defendant University of Southern California ("USC") consolidated under the caption In re University of Southern California Tuition and Fees COVID-19 Refund Litigation, case number CV 20-4066-DMG (PVCx) ("Consolidation Order") (Doc. No. 53): Diaz, 20-4066; Watson, CV 20-4107; Greenberg, CV 20-4172; and Kerendian, CV 20-5190. Plaintiff Injune David Choi's Class Action Complaint makes similar factual allegations and raises similar claims against USC as those in the consolidated case. The Court therefore ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court's 7/17/2020 Consolidation Order should not be applied to this case, such that this case would be consolidated with In re University of Southern California Tuition and Fees COVID-19 Refund Litigation, case number CV 20-4066-DMG (PVCx), and administratively closed. Plaintiff shall file its response, if any, by 7/24/2020, and USC may file its response, if any, by 7/31/2020. Failure to respond shall be deemed consent to consolidation. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 INITIAL STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dolly M. Gee. (kti)
July 14, 2020 Filing 18 MINUTES OF IN CHAMBERS - TRANSFER OF CASE TO JUDGE GEE by Judge Dolly M. Gee: Please take notice that this action has been reassigned to the HONORABLE DOLLY M. GEE, United States District Judge, pursuant to the Order re Transfer Pursuant to General Order 19-03 filed on 7/14/2020. The case number will now read CV 20-5573-DMG (PVCx). Additional information about Judge Gee's procedures and schedules is available on the court's website at www.cacd.uscourts.gov. See document for further details. Court Reporter: Not Reported. (gk)
July 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:20-cv-04066 DMG(PVCx). Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue to Judge Dolly M. Gee and Magistrate Judge Pedro V. Castillo for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05573 DMG(PVCx). Signed by Judge Dolly M. Gee (rn)
July 9, 2020 Filing 16 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choi. Related Case(s): 2:20-cv-04066-DMG-PVC; 2:20-cv-04107-DMG-PVC; 2:20-cv-04172-DMG-PVC; and 2:20-cv-05190-DMG-PVC (Kim, Jae)
July 9, 2020 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choi. upon The University of Southern California waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/1/2020, answer due 8/31/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Leo P. Norton. (Ciolko, Edward)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Gary F. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Injune David Choi, designating (Eddie) Jae K Kim as local counsel #12 . (gk)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. Granting Application of Non-Resident Attorney Edward W. Ciolko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Injune David Choi, designating (Eddie) Jae K Kim as local counsel #11 . (gk)
June 25, 2020 Filing 12 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Gary F. Lynch to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Injune David Choi (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26958847) filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choi. (Attachments: #1 Certificates of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kim, Jae)
June 25, 2020 Filing 11 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Edward W. Ciolko to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Injune David Choi (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-26958749) filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choi. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Proposed Order) (Kim, Jae)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 24, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant The University of Southern California. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Edward W. Ciolko on behalf on Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Gary F Lynch on behalf of Plaintiff. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Patricia Donahue. (ghap)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choi. (Kim, Jae)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choi, identifying Injune David Choi and University of Southern California. (Kim, Jae)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choi. (Kim, Jae)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26925753 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Injune David Choi. (Attorney Jae Kook Kim added to party Injune David Choi(pty:pla))(Kim, Jae)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Injune David Choi v. The University of Southern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Injune David Choi
Represented By: Jae Kook Kim
Represented By: Gary F. Lynch
Represented By: Edward W. Ciolko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The University of Southern California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?