Frank Deville et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Frank Deville, Dee Deville and Dee Anetionette Deville
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association, Does 1-20, inclusive, Bank of America, N.A., Wells Fargo Bank N.A., Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, All Persons Unknown, U S Bank National Association, Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1 and Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7
Case Number: 2:2020cv05576
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Jesus G Bernal
Referring Judge: Andre Birotte
2 Judge: Charles F Eick
Nature of Suit: Truth in Lending
Cause of Action: 15:1640
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2020 Filing 115 SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA N.A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT DOCKET #110 PLIANTIFFS CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 18, 2020 Filing 114 SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFEDNANTS: SPECIALIZED LOAN LLC, TOWD POINT MASTER FUNDING TRUST 2019-PM7, TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-1, US BANK N.A AS INDENTURED TRUSTEE AND AS TRUSTEE DOCKET #112 PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 18, 2020 Filing 113 SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR PLAINTIFFS RESPONSE IN OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS WELLS FARGO BANK N.A REPLY TO MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT DOCKET #111 PLAINTIFFS CORRECTED PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 17, 2020 Filing 112 REPLY OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE REPLY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC, TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-1, TOWD POINT MASTER FUNDING TRUST 2019-PM7, U.S. BANK N.A. AS INDENTURED TRUSTEE AND AS TRUSTEE REPLY IN SUPPORT OF THE MOTION TO DISMISS DOCKET #109 PLAINTIFFS REPLY OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 17, 2020 Filing 111 REPLY OPPOSITION PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE REPLY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK N.A. REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO DISMISS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT DOCKET #108 PLAINTIFFS REPLY OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 17, 2020 Filing 110 REPLY opposition PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE REPLY OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BANK OF AMERICA N.A REPLY BRIEF IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO DISMISSAL TO FIRST COMPLAINT DOCKET #107 PLAINTIFFS REPLY OPPOSITION filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 17, 2020 Filing 109 RESPONSE IN SUPPORT of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #68 filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7, Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1, U S Bank National Association. (Mase, Andrew)
August 17, 2020 Filing 108 REPLY Reply to Opposition to Motion NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Barasch, Adam)
August 17, 2020 Filing 107 REPLY In Support Of NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #54 filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (Campbell, John)
August 17, 2020 Filing 106 SUPPLEMENT Plaintiffs Frank Deville And Dee Deville Opposition To Defendants Request For Judicial Notice Wells Fargo Bank N.A. Docket #78 Plaintiffs Opposition To Defendants Judicial Notice filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Dee Anetionette)
August 17, 2020 Filing 105 SUPPLEMENT Plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Corrected Notice Of Motion For Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7, Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1, U.S Bank N.A As Indentured Trustee And As Trustee docket #99 , CORRECTED NOTICE OF MOTION filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Dee Anetionette)
August 17, 2020 Filing 104 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Dee Anetionette)
August 14, 2020 Filing 103 SUPPLEMENT to Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Response in Opposition to Motion #81 #82 PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE CORRECTED NOTICE OF MOTION FOR OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANTS BANK OF AMERICA N.A, DISMISSAL TO PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 13, 2020 Filing 102 REPLY opposition PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE MOTION AND DECLARATION to docket #91 AND #87 , filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 13, 2020 Filing 101 DECLARATION of Frank Deville and Dee Deville for Proof OF filing Attorney General filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 12, 2020 Filing 100 SUPPLEMENT PLAINTIFFS OBJECTION TO DOCKET # 69, JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 12, 2020 Filing 99 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #68 Plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 11, 2020 Filing 98 First EX PARTE APPLICATION to Extend Time to File Answer to 9/9/2020 filed by Plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Anetionette Deville. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order request for extension of time, #2 Supplement proof of service for request for extension) (Deville, Frank)
August 11, 2020 Filing 97 SUPPLEMENT to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS REPLY FOR DEFENDANTS (DOCKET #68,77 AND 54)MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING SET FOR 8/31/2020 TO 10/5/2020 DEFENDANTS HAVE SET HEARING ALL ON THE SAME DAY MAKING IT DIFFICULT TO #92 SUPPLEMENT FOR PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE REPLY OPPOSITION AND DECLARATION OF FRANK DEVILLE FILED DATED 8/11/2020 IN RESPONSE TO THEIR OPPOSITION, FOR DEFENDANT WELLS FARGO BANK N.A FILED DATED 8/10/2020 DOCKET #94 filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Dee Anetionette)
August 11, 2020 Filing 96 SUPPLEMENT to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS REPLY FOR DEFENDANTS (DOCKET #68,77 AND 54)MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING SET FOR 8/31/2020 TO 10/5/2020 DEFENDANTS HAVE SET HEARING ALL ON THE SAME DAY MAKING IT DIFFICULT TO #92 PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION FILED ON 8/8/2020 DOCKET #92 ,PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE AMENDED REPLY OPPOSITION AND DECLARATION OF FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE DATED 8/11/2020 TO IN RESPONSE TO DEFENDANTS SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC, TOWD POINT MASTER TRUST 2019-PM7, TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-1, U.S. BANK AS INDENTURED TRUSTEE AND AS TRUSTEE OPPOSITION RESPONSE DOCKET #93 TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION: DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE,this supplement is PLAINTIFFS REPLY 'S TO DOCKET #93 filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Dee Anetionette)
August 11, 2020 Filing 95 SUPPLEMENT to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS REPLY FOR DEFENDANTS (DOCKET #68,77 AND 54)MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING SET FOR 8/31/2020 TO 10/5/2020 DEFENDANTS HAVE SET HEARING ALL ON THE SAME DAY MAKING IT DIFFICULT TO #92 PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE REPLY OPPOSITION AND DECLARATION OF FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE TO DEFENDANTS SPECIALIZED LOAN SERVICING LLC, TOWD POINT MASTER TRUST 2019-PM7, TOWD POINT MORTGAGE TRUST 2020-1, U.S. BANK AS INDENTURED TRUSTEE AND AS TRUSTEE OPPISITION TO PLAINTIFFS EX PARTE APPLICATION: DECLARATION OF ANDREW MASE filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Dee Anetionette)
August 10, 2020 Filing 94 DECLARATION of Adam N. Barasch ISO Opposition to Plaintiffs' re First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS REPLY FOR DEFENDANTS (DOCKET #68,77 AND 54)MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING SET FOR 8/31/2020 TO 10/5/2020 DEFENDANTS HAVE SET HEARING ALL ON THE SAME DAY MAKING IT DIFFICULT TO #92 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Barasch, Adam)
August 10, 2020 Filing 93 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS REPLY FOR DEFENDANTS (DOCKET #68,77 AND 54)MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING SET FOR 8/31/2020 TO 10/5/2020 DEFENDANTS HAVE SET HEARING ALL ON THE SAME DAY MAKING IT DIFFICULT TO #92 -Opposition to Plaintiffs' Ex Parte Application; Declaration of Andrew Mase filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7, Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1, U S Bank National Association. (Mase, Andrew)
August 8, 2020 Filing 92 First EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for CONTINUING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS REPLY FOR DEFENDANTS (DOCKET #68,77 AND 54)MOTION TO DISMISS HEARING SET FOR 8/31/2020 TO 10/5/2020 DEFENDANTS HAVE SET HEARING ALL ON THE SAME DAY MAKING IT DIFFICULT TO FAIRLY REPLY TO ALL SO PLAINTIFFS SEEK AN ORDER TO CHANGE HEARING DATE TO OCTOBER 5, 2020 filed by Plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Anetionette Deville. (Attachments: #1 Declaration OF PLAINTIFFS FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE, #2 Proposed Order FOR CONTINUANCE OF HEARING, #3 Supplement PROOF OF SERVICE FOR EX PARTE CONTINUANCE OF HEARING) (Deville, Frank)
August 7, 2020 Filing 91 JOINDER filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. joining in MEMORANDUM in Opposition to Motion, #87 . (Barasch, Adam)
August 6, 2020 Filing 90 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Anetionette Deville, re Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 . doc# 60, was the first order made but was denied because scheduled in error with the wrong judge, denied without prejudice to #88 , Notice of Motion, #89 served on 8/4/2020. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Deville, Frank)
August 6, 2020 Filing 89 NOTICE OF MOTION re Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 . doc# 60, was the first order made but was denied because scheduled in error with the wrong judge, denied without prejudice to #88 filed by Frank Deville and Dee Deville filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 6, 2020 Filing 88 Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 . doc# 60, was the first order made but was denied because scheduled in error with the wrong judge, denied without prejudice to allow plaintiffs to receive relief pursuit to rule 60 filed by plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Anetionette Deville. Motion set for hearing on 9/7/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Deville, Frank)
August 5, 2020 Filing 87 MEMORANDUM in Opposition to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases #59 filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, U S Bank National Association, Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1, Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7. (Attorney Andrew Jonathan Mase added to party Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Jonathan Mase added to party Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7(pty:dft))(Mase, Andrew)
August 5, 2020 Filing 86 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Anetionette Deville, re Proof of Service (subsequent documents) #85 AMENDED PROOF OF SERVICE for third amended civil cover sheet served on 8/4/2020. (Deville, Frank)
August 4, 2020 Filing 85 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Anetionette Deville, re Civil Cover Sheet (CV-71) #83 THIRD AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET served on 8/4/2020. (Deville, Frank)
August 4, 2020 Filing 84 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Anetionette Deville, re Summons Issued #62 , Summons Issued #64 , Summons Issued #66 , Summons Issued #67 , Summons Issued #63 additional service on Attorney for the defendants served on July 29, 2020. (Deville, Frank)
August 4, 2020 Filing 83 THIRD AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 4, 2020 Filing 82 Second NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to AMEND Response in Opposition to Motion #81 filed by Plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Anetionette Deville. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Deville, Frank)
August 3, 2020 Filing 81 OPPOSITION to NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #54 Plaintiffs filed by Frank Deville and Dee Deville filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
August 3, 2020 Filing 80 JOINDER in NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #68 -Notice of Joinder and Joinder to Motion to Dismiss {ECF 68-69] filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, U S Bank National Association. (Mase, Andrew)
July 31, 2020 Filing 79 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A., re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 , Request for Judicial Notice #78 served on 7-31-20. (Barasch, Adam)
July 31, 2020 Filing 78 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint #77 filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-8 to Request for Judicial Notice)(Barasch, Adam)
July 31, 2020 Filing 77 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Attorney Adam N Barasch added to party Wells Fargo Bank N.A.(pty:dft)) (Barasch, Adam)
July 30, 2020 Filing 76 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon TOWD Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. PLAINTIFFS' SERVED AN AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ALL PARTIES INCLUDING ATTORNEY GENERAL BY CERTIFIED MAIL (Deville, Frank)
July 30, 2020 Filing 75 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon TOWD Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. PLAINTIFFS' SERVED AN AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ALL PARTIES INCLUDING ATTORNEY GENERAL BY CERTIFIED MAIL (Deville, Frank)
July 30, 2020 Filing 74 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. PLAINTIFFS' SERVIED AN AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ALL PARTIES INCLUDING ATTORNEY GENERAL BY CERTIFIED MAIL (Deville, Frank)
July 30, 2020 Filing 73 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bank of America N.A in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. PLAINTIFFS' SERVED AN AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ALL PARTIES INCLUDING ATTORNEY GENERAL BY CERTIFIED MAIL (Deville, Frank)
July 30, 2020 Filing 72 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon U.S Bank N.A (as indentured trustee) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. SERVED AN AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ALL PARTIES INCLUDING ATTORNEY GENERAL BY CERTIFIED MAIL (Deville, Frank)
July 30, 2020 Filing 71 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Wells Fargo N.A in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. SERVED AN AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT TO ALL PARTIES INCLUDING THE ATTORNEY GENERAL BY CERTIFIED MAIL (Deville, Frank)
July 30, 2020 Filing 70 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon U.S. Bank N.A (as Trustee) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. SERVED AN AMENDED SUMMONS, AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET AND FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT ON ALL PARTIES INCLUDING THE ATTORNEY GENERAL (Deville, Frank)
July 30, 2020 Filing 69 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE re NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #68 filed by Defendants Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, U S Bank National Association. (Mase, Andrew)
July 30, 2020 Filing 68 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, U S Bank National Association. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attorney Andrew Jonathan Mase added to party Specialized Loan Servicing LLC(pty:dft), Attorney Andrew Jonathan Mase added to party U S Bank National Association(pty:dft)) (Mase, Andrew)
July 29, 2020 Filing 67 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant U S Bank National Association as indentured trustee. (twdb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 66 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC (individually). (twdb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 65 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (twdb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 64 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to Towd Point Master Funding 2019 PM7 for defendant U.S. Bank National Association(as servicing agent for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7). (twdb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 63 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant U S Bank National Association (as trustee). (twdb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 62 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to Towd Point Mortgage for Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (twdb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 61 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A.. (twdb)
July 29, 2020 Filing 60 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) by Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. Plaintiff's "[Motion for] Rule 60. Relief from a Judgment or Order," filed 7/8/20, "Motion to Alter Judgment etc.," filed 7/9/20, and "Amended Motion for Relief from Judgment, etc.," filed 7/24/20, are denied. (See document for further details.) (sp)
July 24, 2020 Filing 59 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Consolidate Cases filed by plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Frank Deville. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order to consolidate case, #2 Supplement proof of service) (Deville, Frank)
July 24, 2020 Filing 58 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Deville, re Supplement(Motion related), #57 PROOF OF SERVICE FOR AMENDED MOTION TO ALTER JUDGEMENT served on 7/24/2020. (Deville, Frank)
July 24, 2020 Filing 57 SUPPLEMENT to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 . Relief From Judgement or Order #27 AMENDED MOTION TO ALTER JUDGEMENT filed by Plaintiff Dee Deville. (Deville, Frank)
July 24, 2020 Filing 56 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint #54 . The following error(s) was/were found: Proposed Document was not submitted as separate attachment. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 23, 2020 Filing 55 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A., identifying BAC North America Holding Company, NB Holdings Corporation, Bank of America Corporation. (Campbell, John)
July 23, 2020 Filing 54 NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' First Amended Complaint filed by Defendant Bank of America, N.A.. Motion set for hearing on 8/31/2020 at 09:00 AM before Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (Attorney John Owen Campbell added to party Bank of America, N.A.(pty:dft)) (Campbell, John)
July 20, 2020 Filing 53 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Specialized Loan Servicing, LLC (INDIVIDUAL DEFENDANT) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Deville, Frank)
July 20, 2020 Filing 52 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Bank of America N.A in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Deville, Frank)
July 20, 2020 Filing 51 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Wells Fargo N.A in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Deville, Frank)
July 19, 2020 Filing 50 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon TOWD Point Master Funding 2019-PM7 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Deville, Frank)
July 19, 2020 Filing 49 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon TOWD Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1 in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Deville, Frank)
July 19, 2020 Filing 48 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon U.S Bank National Association (as indentured trustee) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Deville, Frank)
July 19, 2020 Filing 47 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, upon Defendant All Plaintiffs. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon U.S Bank National Association (as trustee) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by method of service not specified.Original Summons NOT returned. (Deville, Frank)
July 19, 2020 Filing 46 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by plaintiffs' Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Deville, re Errata,, #45 duplicate E-filing/Cosmetic errors in the docket text served on 7/17/2020. (Deville, Frank)
July 19, 2020 Filing 45 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff Dee Deville. correcting Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #32 , Summons Issued #39 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days),,, #34 , Summons Issued #38 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #36 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #33 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #35 , Summons Issued #40 , Summons Issued #43 , Service of Summons and Complaint Returned Executed (21 days), #31 Cosmetic errors in the docket text/duplicate E-filing (Deville, Frank)
July 17, 2020 Filing 44 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC individually. (twdb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 43 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, Towd Point Mortgage, Trust 2020-1. (twdb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 42 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant U.S. Bank National Association(as trustee). (twdb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 41 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Bank of America, N.A.. (twdb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 40 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant U.S. Bank National Association(as servicing agent for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7). (twdb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 39 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (twdb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 38 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (twdb)
July 17, 2020 Filing 37 21 DAY Summons Issued re Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (lc)
July 13, 2020 Filing 36 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, Frank Deville, upon Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, et al served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Natalie E. Lea, (see attachment) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 35 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, Frank Deville, upon Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, et al served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Natalie E. Lea, (see attachment) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
July 13, 2020 Filing 34 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, Frank Deville, upon Defendant All Persons Unknown served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; Bank of America, N.A. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; Specialized Loan Servicing LLC served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; U S Bank National Association served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; U.S. Bank National Association(as servicing agent for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7) served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; U.S. Bank National Association(as Indenture Trustee ) served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020; Wells Fargo Bank N.A. served on 7/6/2020, answer due 7/27/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Natalie E. Lea for Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, et al in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
July 9, 2020 Filing 33 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, Frank Deville, upon Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, et al served on 7/8/2020, answer due 7/29/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Natalie E. Lea, (see attachment) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
July 9, 2020 Filing 32 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, Frank Deville, upon Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC, et al served on 7/3/2020, answer due 7/24/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Natalie E. Lea, (see attachment) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by mailing a copy. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
July 9, 2020 Filing 31 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Dee Deville, Frank Deville, upon Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC served on 7/2/2020, answer due 7/23/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent Natalie E. Lea, (see attachment) in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure service by mail. Original Summons NOT returned. (twdb)
July 9, 2020 Filing 30 PROOF OF SERVICE filed by Plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Deville, re Deficiency in Electronically Filed Documents (G-112A) - optional html form,, #28 , First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 . Relief From Judgement or Order #27 , Supplement(Motion related), #29 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 27 for incorrect hearing date] served on 7/9/2020. (Deville, Frank)
July 9, 2020 Filing 29 SUPPLEMENT to First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 . Relief From Judgement or Order #27 CORRECTION OF DOCKET # 27 for incorrect hearing date] filed by Plaintiff Dee Deville. (Deville, Frank)
July 9, 2020 Filing 28 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 . Relief From Judgement or Order #27 . The following error(s) was/were found: lacking notice of motion. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (twdb)
July 8, 2020 Filing 27 First NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION to Alter Judgment re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 . Relief From Judgement or Order filed by plaintiffs Frank Deville and Dee Deville Dee Deville. Motion set for hearing on 8/7/2020 at 09:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Frank Deville and Dee Deville) (Deville, Frank)
July 6, 2020 Filing 26 REQUEST for Order to Transfer case back to Judge Andre Birotte Jr. filed by plaintiffs Dee Deville, Frank Deville. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (twdb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 25 Amended 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant U S Bank National Association (as indenture trustee). (twdb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 24 Amended 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant U S Bank National Association. (twdb)
July 6, 2020 Filing 23 Amended 21 DAY Summons Issued re First Amended Complaint/Petition #18 as to defendant U S Bank National Association. (twdb)
July 3, 2020 Filing 21 AMENDED CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
July 3, 2020 Filing 20 DECLARATION of Frank Deville and Dee Deville re Transferring Case purs GO 19-03 (Related Case)(CV-34), #13 Declaration filed by both plaintiffs filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville. (Deville, Frank)
July 3, 2020 Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT re Affidavit #3 AMENDED AFFIDAVIT filed by Plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville (Deville, Dee Anetionette)
July 3, 2020 Filing 18 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Defendants All Plaintiffs amending Complaint - (Discovery), #1 , filed by plaintiffs Dee Anetionette Deville(Deville, Dee Anetionette)
July 2, 2020 Filing 22 Notice, Consent, and Reference of a Civil Action to A Magistrate Judge/CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by plaintiff Dee Anetionette Deville, Frank Deville. (twdb)
June 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Jesus G. Bernal. (ima)
June 26, 2020 Filing 17 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to defendant U.S. Bank National Association(as servicing agent for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7), U.S. Bank National Association(as Indenture Trustee ). (twdb)
June 26, 2020 Filing 16 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to defendant U.S. Bank National Association (as Indenture Trustee ). (twdb)
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER by Judge Jesus G. Bernal: Granting #4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (twdb)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:20-cv-00158 JGB. Case transferred from Judge Andre Birotte Jr to Judge Jesus G. Bernal for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05576 JGB(Ex). Signed by Judge Jesus G. Bernal (rn)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Andre Birotte Jr. (cb)
June 23, 2020 Filing 11 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Andre Birotte Jr and Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick. (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Bank of America, N.A. (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant U.S. Bank National Association(as servicing agent for Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7). (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant U.S. Bank National Association(as Trustee ). (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 6 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Specialized Loan Servicing LLC. (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 5 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint - (Discovery), #1 as to Defendant Wells Fargo Bank N.A. (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 4 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by Plaintiffs Dee Deville, Frank Deville. (Attachments: #1 Lodged Proposed Order) (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 3 AFFIDAVIT OF FRANK DEVILLE AND DEE DEVILLE filed by Plaintiffs Dee Deville, Frank Deville (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiffs Dee Deville, Frank Deville (car)
June 23, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Defendants. Case assigned to Judge Andre Birotte Jr for all further proceedings. Discovery referred to Magistrate Judge Charles F. Eick.(Filing fee $ 400 PAID) Jury Demanded, filed by Plaintiffs Dee Deville, Frank Deville. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet) (car)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frank Deville et al v. Specialized Loan Servicing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frank Deville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Deville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dee Anetionette Deville
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-20, inclusive
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bank of America, N.A.
Represented By: John Owen Campbell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank N.A.
Represented By: Mary Kate Sullivan
Represented By: Adam N Barasch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Specialized Loan Servicing LLC
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Persons Unknown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U S Bank National Association
Represented By: Timothy M Ryan
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towd Point Mortgage Trust 2020-1
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Towd Point Master Funding Trust 2019-PM7
Represented By: Andrew Jonathan Mase
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?