Antonio Fernandez v. Regency Centers, L.P. et al
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Defendant: Does 1-10, Big 5 Corp., Regency Centers Corporation and Regency Centers, L.P.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05594
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Patrick J Walsh
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 13, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): ORDER DISMISSING ACTION by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court, having been advised by the Plaintiff that this action has been settled by a Notice of Settlement and Request to Vacate All Currently Set Dates #15 , hereby orders all proceedings, if any, vacated and the action dismissed without prejudice. Further, the Court retains jurisdiction for sixty (60) days to vacate this order and to reopen the action upon showing of good cause that the settlement has not been completed. (Made JS-6. Case Terminated.) (bm)
August 11, 2020 Filing 15 NOTICE of Settlement and request to vacate all currently set dates filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Seabock, Amanda)
August 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER (In Chambers): Order to Show Cause re: Supplemental Jurisdiction by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to show cause in writing no later than August 21, 2020 why it should not decline to exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim. (see document for further details) (bm)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING STIPULATION AND REQUEST TO EXTEND TIME TO FILE A RESPONSE TO INITIAL COMPLAINT #12 by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: Defendants REGENCY CENTERS, L.P., REGENCY CENTERS CORPORATION, and BIG 5 CORP.,shall have until August 28, 2020, to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. (bm)
July 23, 2020 Filing 12 Joint STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to August 28, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Big 5 Corp.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Shireen Banki Rogers added to party Big 5 Corp.(pty:dft))(Rogers, Shireen)
July 7, 2020 Filing 11 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Regency Centers Corporation served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Agent for Service of Process: UNITED AGENT GROUP SERVICES INC-(Tiffany Phillips, receptionist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 7, 2020 Filing 10 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Regency Centers, L.P. served on 7/1/2020, answer due 7/22/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon UNITED AGENT GROUP SERVICES INC-(Tiffany Phillips, receptionist) in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons returned. (Handy, Russell)
July 1, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE AND ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF SERVICE of Summons and Complaint returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, upon Defendant Big 5 Corp. acknowledgment sent by Plaintiff on 6/30/2020, answer due 7/21/2020. Acknowledgment of Service signed by Shireen Rogers, Attorney. (Handy, Russell)
June 25, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 24, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Big 5 Corp., Regency Centers Corporation, Regency Centers, L.P. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Patrick J. Walsh. (ghap)
June 24, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 24, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez, (Handy, Russell)
June 24, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Handy, Russell)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-26933585 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Antonio Fernandez. (Attorney Russell C Handy added to party Antonio Fernandez(pty:pla))(Handy, Russell)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Antonio Fernandez v. Regency Centers, L.P. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1-10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Big 5 Corp.
Represented By: Shireen Banki Rogers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Centers Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Regency Centers, L.P.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Antonio Fernandez
Represented By: Amanda Lockhart Seabock
Represented By: Raymond George Ballister, Jr
Represented By: Dennis Jay Price, II
Represented By: Russell C Handy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?