(PS) N. S B v. Pascarella
Petitioner: N. S B
Respondent: John Pascarella
Case Number: 2:2020cv05742
Filed: June 26, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Philip S Gutierrez
Referring Judge: Gail J Standish
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 2, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 2, 2020 Filing 24 NOTICE OF RECEIPT OF CASE TRANSFERRED IN: Formerly Case Number: 2:20-cv-00029 KJM-KJN, from Eastern District of California. The above-referenced case has been transferred to this district and assigned the above civil case number 2:20-cv-05742 PSG (GJSx). (esa)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 21 STANDING ORDER REGARDING NEWLY ASSIGNED CASES by Judge Philip S. Gutierrez. (ji)
June 30, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (esa)
June 30, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Philip S. Gutierrez and Magistrate Judge Gail J. Standish. (esa)
June 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER RETURNING CASE FOR REASSIGNMENT by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. ORDER case returned to the Clerk for random reassignment pursuant to General Order 19-03. Case randomly reassigned from Judge Ronald S.W. Lew to Judge Philip S. Gutierrez for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05742 PSG(GJSx). (rn)
June 30, 2020 Filing 19 ORIGINAL file, certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received from California Eastern
June 26, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #18 Order served on N. S B. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
June 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 6/26/2020 GRANTING Defendants' motion to transfer to the Central District of California (ECF No. #4 ); DENYING Defendants' motion to dismiss (ECF No. #6 ) WITHOUT PREJUDICEfor administrative purposes only; TRANSFERRING this matter forthwith to the Central District of California; and VACATING the hearing on defendants' motions, set for 7/2/2020. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
June 24, 2020 Filing 17 STATEMENT of NON-OPPOSITION by John Pascarella to #4 Motion to Change Venue. (Botros, Samantha) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
June 18, 2020 Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by N. S B.(Kaminski, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
May 12, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Order on Motion for Electronic Filing served on N. S B. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
May 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 5/12/2020 DENYING #14 Motion for Electronic Filing. (Coll, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
May 4, 2020 Filing 14 MOTION for ELECTRONIC CASE FILING by N. S B. (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order served on N. S B. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
April 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 4/15/2020 DENYING #12 plaintiff's Motion to file electronically; GRANTING plaintiff an extension of time to file his opposition by 6/18/2020. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by 6/25/2020, and the hearing on these motions is CONTINUED to 7/2/2020, at 10:00 a.m., in Courtroom 25.(Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 12 MOTION for PERMISSION to E-FILE by N. S B. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
April 13, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to file an opposition to the #6 Motion to Dismiss by N. S B. Motion Hearing set for 4/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Becknal, R) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
February 5, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order served on N. S B. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 2/4/2020 GRANTING #9 Plaintiff's Motion for Extension; plaintiff shall file his opposition by 4/16/2020. Defendant's reply, if any, is due by 4/23/2020. The hearing on the #6 Motion to Dismiss and #4 the Motion to Change Venue is CONTINUED to 4/30/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Kastilahn, A) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Filing 9 MOTION for 60-DAY EXTENSION OF TIME to File an Opposition to #4 Motion to Change Venue, #7 Request for Judicial Notice, #6 Motion to Dismiss by N. S B. (Tupolo, A) Modified on 2/4/2020 (Tupolo, A). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 31, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order, served on N. S B. (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman on 1/31/2020 CONTINUING #4 Motion to Change Venue and #6 Motion to Dismiss Hearings to 3/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. Plaintiff shall file a written opposition, or a statement of non-opposition, on or before 2/20/2020. Defendant may file a written reply to Plaintiff's opposition on or before 2/27/2020. The Initial Scheduling Conference, currently set for 5/14/2020, is VACATED, and will be rescheduled if and when necessary. (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by John Pascarella in re #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Botros, Samantha) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by John Pascarella. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Botros, Samantha) Modified on 1/10/2020 (Becknal, R). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 5 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by John Pascarella re #4 Motion to Change Venue. (Botros, Samantha) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 9, 2020 Filing 4 MOTION to CHANGE VENUE by John Pascarella. Motion Hearing set for 2/13/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Botros, Samantha) Modified on 1/10/2020 (Becknal, R). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 6, 2020 Filing 3 AMENDED CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Huang, H) [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 2 [DISREGARD] CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/14/2020 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 25 (KJN) before Magistrate Judge Kendall J. Newman. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Kaminski, H) Modified on 1/6/2020 (Huang, H). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]
January 3, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Solano County Superior Court, case number FCS052783 by John Pascarella. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-8650084) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Botros, Samantha). [Transferred from California Eastern on 6/30/2020.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PS) N. S B v. Pascarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: John Pascarella
Represented By: Lisa Von Eschen
Represented By: Samantha A Botros
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: N. S B
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?