Jimmy Wheat v. United States of America
Petitioner: Jimmy Wheat
Respondent: United States of America
Case Number: 2:2020cv05810
Filed: June 24, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Vacate Sentence
Cause of Action: 28:2255
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 24, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 24, 2020 Filing 4 OPPOSITION filed by Respondent United States of America. (Attorney Jeffrey M Chemerinsky added to party United States of America(pty:res))(Chemerinsky, Jeffrey)
July 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 MINUTE IN CHAMBERS - ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson: The Court is in receipt of petitioner Jimmy Wheat's Motion to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 #1 , filed on 6/24/2020. The Court orders a briefing schedule. The government's opposition shall be filed no later than 8/1/2020. Petitioner's reply if any shall be filed no later than 8/15/2020. (jp)
June 29, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson for motion filed under 28 U.S.C. 2255. (lh)
June 24, 2020 Filing 1 MOTION to Vacate, Set Aside or Correct Sentence pursuant to 28 USC 2255 assigned to Judge Percy Anderson. For docketing entries refer to CR Case # 2:18-cr-00205-PA, filed by Petitioner Jimmy Wheat. (lh)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Jimmy Wheat v. United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: United States of America
Represented By: Assistant 2241-2255 US Attorney LA-CR
Represented By: Jeffrey M Chemerinsky
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Jimmy Wheat
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?