Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.65.223
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.65.223
Case Number: 2:2020cv05923
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Terry J Hatter
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
2 Judge: Sheri Pym
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PROTECTIVE ORDER by Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym (SEE ORDER FOR DETAILS). (kca)
July 28, 2020 Filing 11 Joint STIPULATION for Protective Order filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 5:18-cv-00787 TJH(SPx). Case transferred from Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott to Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr and Magistrate Judge Sheri Pym for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-05923 TJH(SPx). Signed by Judge Terry J. Hatter, Jr (rn)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendand John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.65.223. (Vondran, Steven)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 REMINDER NOTICE re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. Each party must file form CV-11C within the consent deadlines pursuant to L.R. 73-2. Additionally, the parties are directed to L.R. 73-2.2 Proof of Service. In any case in which only a magistrate judge is initially assigned, plaintiff must file a proof of service within 10 days of service of the summons and complaint as to each defendant. [See document for further details.] (san)
July 6, 2020 Filing 7 First NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Steven Charles Vondran on behalf of Defendant John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.65.223 (Attorney Steven Charles Vondran added to party John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.65.223(pty:dft))(Vondran, Steven)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO COUNSEL re Magistrate Judge Direct Assignment Program. This case has been randomly assigned to Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (Attachments: #1 CV-11C Statement of Consent to Proceed Before a United States Magistrate Judge) (ghap)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC identifying General Media Systems, LLC as Corporate Parent. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC, identifying General Media Systems, LLC (Corporate Parent) and John Doe (Defendant). (Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Bandlow, Lincoln)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27034503 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Strike 3 Holdings, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Lincoln D Bandlow added to party Strike 3 Holdings, LLC(pty:pla))(Bandlow, Lincoln)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC v. John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.65.223
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Strike 3 Holdings, LLC
Represented By: Lincoln D Bandlow
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Doe subscriber assigned IP address 172.112.65.223
Represented By: Steven Charles Vondran
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?