Unicolors, Inc. v. Bealls, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Defendant: Beall's, Inc., Boscov's Department Store, LLC, VF Outlet, Inc., Does 1 through 10,, Gabriel Brothers, Inc., Variety Wholesalers, Inc., Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC, Rainbow USA, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc., Factory Connection, LLC, Does 1 through 10, VF Outlet, Inc. a Delaware Corporation, individually and doing business as Kontoor Brands, Boscovs Department Store, LLC, Variety Wholesalers, Inc. a North Carolina Corporation, individually and doing business as Roses Stores and Bealls, Inc.
Case Number: 2:2020cv05946
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: John A Kronstadt
Referring Judge: John E McDermott
Nature of Suit: Copyright
Cause of Action: 17:101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 17 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant VF Outlet, Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lyanne Gares, c/o Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 28, 2020 Filing 16 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Variety Wholesalers, Inc. served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lyanne Gares, c/o Corporation Service Company, Registered Agent for Service of Process in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., upon Defendant Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC served on 8/27/2020, answer due 9/17/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Amy McLaren c/o The Corporation Trust Company, Registered Agent for Service in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by personal service.Original Summons NOT returned. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 28, 2020 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. upon Boscovs Department Store, LLC waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020; Gabriel Brothers, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/28/2020, answer due 9/28/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Yvette J. Sutton, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 STANDING ORDERS FOR CIVIL CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE JOHN A. KRONSTADT upon filing of the complaint by Judge John A. Kronstadt. Please read each Order carefully as they differ in some respects from the Local Rules. Counsel are advised that the Court, at any time, may amend one or more of its Standing Orders. It is the responsibility of counsel to refer to this Court's Procedures and Schedules found on the website for the United States District Court, Central District of California (www.cacd.uscourts.gov) to obtain the operative order. The Court thanks the parties and their counsel for their anticipated cooperation in carrying out these requirements. (cw)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER TO REASSIGN CASE due to self-recusal pursuant to General Order 19-03 by Judge Dean D. Pregerson. Case transferred from Judge Dean D. Pregerson to the calendar of Judge John A. Kronstadt for all further proceedings. Case number now reads as 2;20-cv-05946 JAK(JEMx). (rn)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Otis D. Wright, II, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:19-cv-06223 ODW(MAAx) (rn)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. upon Rainbow USA, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020; The TJX Companies, Inc. waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/13/2020, answer due 9/11/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Yvette J. Sutton, Attorney. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 2, 2020 Filing 9 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants Bealls, Inc., Boscovs Department Store, LLC, Factory Connection, LLC, Gabriel Brothers, Inc., Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC, Rainbow USA, Inc., The TJX Companies, Inc., VF Outlet, Inc., Variety Wholesalers, Inc. (car)
July 2, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 2, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dean D. Pregerson and Magistrate Judge John E. McDermott. (car)
July 1, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. Related Case(s): 2:19-cv-06223-ODW-MAA (Burroughs, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Filing 5 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION regarding a copyright (Initial Notification) filed by Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Burroughs, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc., (Burroughs, Scott)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27040374 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Unicolors, Inc.. (Attorney Scott A Burroughs added to party Unicolors, Inc.(pty:pla))(Burroughs, Scott)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Unicolors, Inc. v. Bealls, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Beall's, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boscov's Department Store, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VF Outlet, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10,
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Brothers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Variety Wholesalers, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gordon Brothers Retail Partners, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rainbow USA, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The TJX Companies, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Factory Connection, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 through 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: VF Outlet, Inc. a Delaware Corporation, individually and doing business as Kontoor Brands
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Boscovs Department Store, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Variety Wholesalers, Inc. a North Carolina Corporation, individually and doing business as Roses Stores
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bealls, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Unicolors, Inc.
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Represented By: Trevor William Barrett
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: Justin M Gomes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?