Rochelle Sanders v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Rochelle Sanders
Defendant: FCA US LLC, Grammer Industries, Inc. and Chrysler Group LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06085
Filed: July 8, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Virginia A Phillips
Referring Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Sanders. Dismissal is Without Prejudice. (Talley, Stuart)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE STIPULATION EXTENDING TIME FOR SPECIALLY APPEARING DEFENDANT GRAMMER INDUSTRIES, INC. TO RESPOND TO INITIAL COMPLAINT [L.R. 8- 3] granting Stipulation #15 by Judge Virginia A. Phillips: The Parties having so stipulated, and good cause appearing, IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that the time for Specially Appearing Defendant Grammer Industries, Inc. to respond to Plaintiff's Complaint (including by a motion to dismiss) is extended from August 6, 2020 to September 18, 2020. (bm)
August 7, 2020 Filing 15 STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 18, 2020 filed by Defendant Grammer Industries, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Attorney Daniel Scott Hurwitz added to party Grammer Industries, Inc.(pty:dft))(Hurwitz, Daniel)
July 30, 2020 Filing 14 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to FCA US LLC answer now due 9/4/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant FCA US LLC.(Attorney David P Hansen added to party FCA US LLC(pty:dft))(Hansen, David)
July 24, 2020 Filing 13 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rochelle Sanders, upon Defendant FCA US LLC served on 7/15/2020, answer due 8/5/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Jessie Gastelum who is authorized to accept at CT Corproation in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Talley, Stuart)
July 24, 2020 Filing 12 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Rochelle Sanders, upon Defendant Grammer Industries, Inc. served on 7/16/2020, answer due 8/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Lisa Culler Intake Specialist authorized to accept in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure by service on a domestic corporation, unincorporated association, or public entity.Original Summons NOT returned. (Talley, Stuart)
July 13, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Virginia A. Phillips. (cch)
July 9, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Mark P Chalos. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
July 9, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Kenneth S Byrd. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (car)
July 9, 2020 Filing 8 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant FCA US LLC. (car)
July 9, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Grammer Industries, Inc. (car)
July 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 9, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Virginia A. Phillips and Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (car)
July 8, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Sanders. (Attachments: #1 Summons)(Talley, Stuart)
July 8, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Sanders, (Talley, Stuart)
July 8, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Sanders. (Talley, Stuart)
July 8, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27123688 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff Rochelle Sanders. (Attorney Stuart C Talley added to party Rochelle Sanders(pty:pla))(Talley, Stuart)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rochelle Sanders v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: David P Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Grammer Industries, Inc.
Represented By: Daniel Scott Hurwitz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chrysler Group LLC
Represented By: David P Hansen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Sanders
Represented By: Stuart C Talley
Represented By: Ian J Barlow
Represented By: William A Kershaw
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?