Wylmina Hettinga v. Gavin Newsom et al
Plaintiff: Wylmina Hettinga and Wylmina E Hettinga
Defendant: The State of California, Alex Padilla, Gavin Newsom and DOES 1 to 4
Case Number: 2:2020cv06092
Filed: July 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Percy Anderson
Referring Judge: Douglas F McCormick
2 Judge: Jean P Rosenbluth
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER IN CHAMBERS - Order re: Declination to Appear Before a Magistrate Judge (Dkt. 12) by Judge Percy Anderson. To the extent Plaintiff intends to contest or object to this assignment, her objection is overruled. A district judge remains assigned to this matter and all dispositive rulings require the approval of the assigned District Judge. (mrgo)
August 24, 2020 Filing 15 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Wylmina E Hettinga. (Hettinga, Wylmina)
August 20, 2020 Filing 14 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE filed by Plaintiff Wylmina E Hettinga. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Hettinga, Wylmina)
August 20, 2020 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed filed by Plaintiff Wylmina E Hettinga. upon Gavin Newsom waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/11/2020, answer due 9/9/2020; Alex Padilla waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/11/2020, answer due 9/9/2020; The State of California waiver sent by Plaintiff on 7/11/2020, answer due 9/9/2020. Waiver of Service signed by Gabrielle Boutin, Esq. (Hettinga, Wylmina)
August 20, 2020 Filing 12 NOTICE Declination to appear before a magistrate judge filed by Plaintiff Wylmina E Hettinga. (Hettinga, Wylmina)
July 31, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick: Granting #5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Electronic Filing. The applicant must register to use the Courts CM/ECF System within five (5) days of being served with this order. Registration information is available at the Pro Se Litigant E-Filing web page located on the Courts website. Upon registering, the applicant will receive a CM/ECF login and password that will allow him/her to file non-sealed documents electronically in this case only. Any documents being submitted under seal must be manually filed with the Clerk. (es)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STANDING ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. (lom)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SELF-REPRESENTATION ORDER by Judge Percy Anderson. (See document for details) (mrgo)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Fernando M. Olguin, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 8:20-cv-00767 FMO(DFM) (rn)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO Local Rule 83-1.3.1 and General Order 19-03 -Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 8:20-cv-00767 FMO(DFM). Case referred from Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth to Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick for 194. The case number will now read as follows: 2:20-cv-06092 PA(DFM). Signed by Magistrate Judge Douglas F. McCormick. (rn)
July 13, 2020 Filing 6 STATEMENT of Related Cases filed by Plaintiff Wylmina Hettinga (es)
July 13, 2020 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Pro Se Litigant to electronically file documents in a specific case filed by plaintiff Wylmina Hettinga. (es)
July 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTES (IN CHAMBERS) Order re Service of Complaint by Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth: *See document for details.* (es)
July 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (jtil)
July 7, 2020 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff Wylmina Hettinga. (jtil)
July 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT filed by Plaintiff Wylmina Hettinga against Defendants Gavin Newsom, Alex Padilla and The State of California. Case assigned to Judge Percy Anderson and referred to Magistrate Judge Jean P. Rosenbluth. (Filing fee $400 Paid). (Attachments: #1 CV71) (jtil)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wylmina Hettinga v. Gavin Newsom et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wylmina Hettinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Wylmina E Hettinga
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The State of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Alex Padilla
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gavin Newsom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: DOES 1 to 4
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?