Soon Skin Care, Inc. v. Marissa Brown
Plaintiff: Soon Skin Care, Inc.
Defendant: Marissa Brown
Case Number: 2:2020cv06264
Filed: July 14, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Dale S Fischer
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Stephen M Doniger counsel for Defendant Marissa Brown. Adding David Shein as counsel of record for Defendant Marissa Brown for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by Defendant Marissa Brown. (Doniger, Stephen)
September 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer granting Second Stipulation to Extend Time #19 for Defendant Marissa Brown to Respond to Initial Complaint shall have up to and including 9/21/2020. See Order for specifics. (jp)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 Second STIPULATION for Extension of Time to File Answer to September 21, 2020 re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Marissa Brown. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Doniger, Stephen)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Soon Skin Care, Inc., upon Defendant Marissa Brown served on 7/17/2020, answer due 9/6/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon Kimberly Brown/Occupant in compliance with Federal Rules of Civil Procedure by substituted service at home address and by also mailing a copy.Original Summons NOT returned. (Abeles, Jerrold)
July 31, 2020 Filing 17 STIPULATION Extending Time to Answer the complaint as to Marissa Brown answer now due 9/6/2020, re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Defendant Marissa Brown.(Attorney Stephen M Doniger added to party Marissa Brown(pty:dft))(Doniger, Stephen)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #14 Non-Resident Attorney James R Davis, II APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Soon Skin Care, Inc., designating Jerrold A Abeles as local counsel. (jp)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER by Judge Dale S. Fischer: granting #13 Non-Resident Attorney Michael A Grow APPLICATION to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Soon Skin Care, Inc., designating Jerrold A Abeles as local counsel. (jp)
July 17, 2020 Filing 14 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney James R. Davis, II to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Soon Skin Care, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Previously Paid on 7/17/2020, Receipt No. ACACDC-27258742) filed by Plaintiff Soon Skin Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Abeles, Jerrold)
July 17, 2020 Filing 13 APPLICATION of Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Grow to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Soon Skin Care, Inc. (Pro Hac Vice Fee - $400 Fee Paid, Receipt No. ACACDC-27258576) filed by Plaintiff Soon Skin Care, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Abeles, Jerrold)
July 17, 2020 Filing 12 REPORT ON THE FILING OF AN ACTION Regarding a Patent or a Trademark (Initial Notification) filed by Soon Skin Care, Inc.. (Abeles, Jerrold)
July 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER FOR CASES ASSIGNED TO JUDGE DALE S. FISCHER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Dale S. Fischer. If a party would be entitled to attorneys fees, counsel are referred to the Order Re Fees found on Court's website under Judge Fischer's Procedures and Schedules contained in the Judge's Requirements tab. Read all Orders carefully. They govern this case and differ in some respects from the Local Rules. COUNSEL ARE ORDERED TO PROVIDE A MANDATORY CHAMBERS COPY OF THE COMPLAINT, NOTICE OF REMOVAL, AND ANY OTHER INITIATING DOCUMENTS. (rfi)
July 14, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE TO COUNSEL RE: Copyright, Patent and Trademark Reporting Requirements. Counsel shall file the appropriate AO-120 and/or AO-121 form with the Clerk within 10 days. (lh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney James R. Davis, II. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE OF PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION DUE for Non-Resident Attorney Michael A. Grow. A document recently filed in this case lists you as an out-of-state attorney of record. However, the Court has not been able to locate any record that you are admitted to the Bar of this Court, and you have not filed an application to appear Pro Hac Vice in this case. Accordingly, within 5 business days of the date of this notice, you must either (1) have your local counsel file an application to appear Pro Hac Vice (Form G-64) and pay the applicable fee, or (2) complete the next section of this form and return it to the court at cacd_attyadm@cacd.uscourts.gov. You have been removed as counsel of record from the docket in this case, and you will not be added back to the docket until your Pro Hac Vice status has been resolved. (lh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendant Marissa Brown. (lh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (lh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Dale S. Fischer and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (lh)
July 14, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Plaintiff SOON SKIN CARE, INC, identifying Kayla Bertagna, Lisa Ballstaedt. (Abeles, Jerrold)
July 14, 2020 Filing 3 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by Plaintiff SOON SKIN CARE, INC. (Abeles, Jerrold)
July 14, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff SOON SKIN CARE, INC. (Abeles, Jerrold)
July 14, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27204083 - Fee: $400, filed by Plaintiff SOON SKIN CARE, INC. (Attorney Jerrold E Abeles added to party SOON SKIN CARE, INC(pty:pla))(Abeles, Jerrold)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Soon Skin Care, Inc. v. Marissa Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Soon Skin Care, Inc.
Represented By: Jerrold E Abeles
Represented By: Michael A Grow
Represented By: James R. Davis, II
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Marissa Brown
Represented By: Stephen M Doniger
Represented By: David Shein
Represented By: Scott A Burroughs
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?