Miguel Hernandez v. Missy Enterprises, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: MIGUEL HERNANDEZ
Defendant: MISSY ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as TACOS EL CANELO NO. 2, 11555 GLENOAKS BLVD., LLC, 11555 Glenoaks Blvd., LLC. and Does 1 to 10
Case Number: 2:2020cv06291
Filed: July 15, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Maria A Audero
Referring Judge: Ronald SW Lew
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 27, 2020 Filing 10 Notice to Parties: ADA Disability Access Litigation (early mediation and stay program). (jre)
July 24, 2020 Filing 9 RESPONSE filed by Plaintiff Miguel Hernandezto Minutes of In Chambers Order/Directive - no proceeding held,, Order to Show Cause, #8 re: Supplemental Jurisdiction (Attachments: #1 Declaration, #2 Declaration)(Kim, Jason)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE (IN CHAMBERS) ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE RE EXERCISE OF SUPPLEMENTAL JURISDICTION RE STATE LAW CLAIMS by Judge Ronald S.W. Lew. The Court ORDERS Plaintiff to SHOW CAUSE in writing why the Court should exercise supplemental jurisdiction over the Unruh Act claim and all other state law claims asserted in the Complaint. Plaintiff shall file a Response to this Order to Show Cause by no later than July 24, 2020. See order for further details. (shb)
July 16, 2020 Filing 7 21 DAY Summons Issued re Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 as to Defendants 11555 Glenoaks Blvd., LLC., Missy Enterprises, Inc. (et)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (et)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Ronald S. W. Lew and Magistrate Judge Maria A. Audero. (et)
July 15, 2020 Filing 4 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 MIGUEL HERNANDEZ. (Kim, Jason)
July 15, 2020 Filing 3 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties (Kim, Jason)
July 15, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff MIGUEL HERNANDEZ. (Kim, Jason)
July 15, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27221886 - Fee: $400. (Attorney Jason J Kim added to party MIGUEL HERNANDEZ(pty:pla))(Kim, Jason)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miguel Hernandez v. Missy Enterprises, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: MISSY ENTERPRISES, INC. doing business as TACOS EL CANELO NO. 2
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11555 GLENOAKS BLVD., LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 11555 Glenoaks Blvd., LLC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Does 1 to 10
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MIGUEL HERNANDEZ
Represented By: Jason J Kim
Represented By: Jason T Yoon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?