United States of America v. All Right and Title to Real Property Known as the Mountain of Beverly Hills
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: All Right and Title to Real Property Known as the Mountain of Beverly Hills
Claimant: MH Land Holdings I-D, LLC, MH Land Holdings I-B, LLC, MH Land Holdings I-C, LLC and MH Land Holdings I-A, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06313
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 1, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 1, 2020 Filing 22 CORRECTED #20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim #16 , Claim #17 , Claim #18 , Claim #19 Filed 9/1/2020 by 4 different MH Land Holdings claimants. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. NOTE: Filer failed to add himself in as attorney of record for the 4 claimants. Clerk has added attorney of record accordingly, so that attorney can receive Notice of Electronic filing. In response to this notice, the Court ma y: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 21 CERTIFICATION AND NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by Claimants MH Land Holdings I-A, LLC, MH Land Holdings I-B, LLC, MH Land Holdings I-C, LLC, MH Land Holdings I-D, LLC, (Woolner, Rolf)
September 1, 2020 Filing 20 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim #19 , Claim #16 , Claim #18 , Claim #17 by 4 different MH Land Holdings claimants. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. NOTE: Filer failed to add himself in as attorney of record for the 4 claimants. Clerk has added attorney of record accordingly, so that attorney can receive Notice of Electronic filing. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc)
September 1, 2020 Filing 19 CLAIM filed by Claimant MH Land Holdings I-C, LLC. (Woolner, Rolf)
September 1, 2020 Filing 18 CLAIM filed by Claimant MH Land Holdings I-B, LLC. (Woolner, Rolf)
September 1, 2020 Filing 17 CLAIM filed by Claimant MH Land Holdings I-A, LLC. (Woolner, Rolf)
September 1, 2020 Filing 16 CLAIM filed by Claimant MH Land Holdings I-D, LLC. (Woolner, Rolf)
August 28, 2020 Filing 15 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel G Boyle counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Michael R. Sew Hoy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff USA. (Boyle, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 14 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 7/27/2020 and 7/28/2020 upon Defendant All Right and Title to Real Property Known as the Mountain of Beverly Hills last date of publication 8/25/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:13-cv-01518 CAS. Case transferred from Judge Consuelo B. Marshall to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06313 CAS(KSx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Christina A. Snyder, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:13-cv-01518 CAS (rn)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STANDING ORDER upon filing of the complaint by Judge Consuelo B. Marshall. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. It controls this case and may differ in some respects from the Local Rules. (ys)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order #5 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE OF ERRATA filed by Plaintiff United States of America. correcting Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 (Attachments: #1 Complaint, #2 Exhibit A)(Boyle, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Michael R. Sew Hoy as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Consuelo B. Marshall and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (ghap)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): No. CV 20-6314; No. CV 20-6316; No. CV 20-6318; No. CV 20-6319; No. CV 20-6320; and No. CV 20-6321 (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for APPOINTING INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN IN PLACE OF THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONFLICT MEMO filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on July 16, 2020, was pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. began receiving civil matters. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Daniel G Boyle added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Boyle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. All Right and Title to Real Property Known as the Mountain of Beverly Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: All Right and Title to Real Property Known as the Mountain of Beverly Hills
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Daniel G Boyle
Represented By: Michael Raymond Sew Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MH Land Holdings I-D, LLC
Represented By: Rolf S Woolner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MH Land Holdings I-B, LLC
Represented By: Rolf S Woolner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MH Land Holdings I-C, LLC
Represented By: Rolf S Woolner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: MH Land Holdings I-A, LLC
Represented By: Rolf S Woolner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?