United States of America v. Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED IN LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA
Claimant: 8484 Wilshire Blvd, LLC
Case Number: 2:2020cv06316
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Christina A Snyder
Referring Judge: Karen L Stevenson
Nature of Suit: Forfeit/Penalty: Other
Cause of Action: 18:0981
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 28, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 28, 2020 Filing 24 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Daniel G Boyle counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Michael R. Sew Hoy is no longer counsel of record for the aforementioned party in this case for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff USA. (Boyle, Daniel)
August 28, 2020 Filing 23 NOTICE of Interested Parties filed by claimant 8484 Wilshire Blvd, LLC, identifying 8484 Wilshire Blvd LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
August 28, 2020 Filing 22 NOTICE TO FILER OF DEFICIENCIES in Electronically Filed Documents RE: Claim #20 by 8484 Wilshire Blvd, LLC. The following error(s) was/were found: Local Rule 7.1-1 No Notice of Interested Parties and/or no copies. In response to this notice, the Court may: (1) order an amended or correct document to be filed; (2) order the document stricken; or (3) take other action as the Court deems appropriate. You need not take any action in response to this notice unless and until the Court directs you to do so. (lc) Modified on 8/28/2020 (lc).
August 27, 2020 Filing 21 SERVICE OF SUMMONS AND COMPLAINT Executed by Plaintiff United States of America, by Publication on 7/27/2020 and 7/28/2020 upon Defendant Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California last date of publication 8/25/2020, answer due 9/14/2020. Publication was made in the www.forfeiture.gov. (Boyle, Daniel)
August 27, 2020 Filing 20 CLAIM filed by claimant 8484 Wilshire Blvd, LLC. (Richards, Ronald)
August 27, 2020 Filing 19 NOTICE of Appearance filed by attorney Ronald N Richards on behalf of Claimant 8484 Wilshire Blvd, LLC (Attorney Ronald N Richards added to party 8484 Wilshire Blvd, LLC(pty:clm))(Richards, Ronald)
August 4, 2020 Filing 18 PROCESS RECEIPT AND RETURN RE: POST AND WALK filed by Plaintiff United States of America (Boyle, Daniel)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 WRIT OF ENTRY AND ORDER THEREON #13 by Judge Christina A. Snyder: The United States, its agents, and representatives are authorized to enter the premises at 10727 Wilshire Boulevard, #PH4, Los Angeles, California for the purpose of conducting an inspection,inventory, and appraisal of the same property.The entry, inspection, inventory, and appraisal shall occur within 30 days of the date of this order, and shall be conducted by special agents and employees of the Internal Revenue Service, Federal Bureau of Investigation, United States Marshals Service, and agents and employees of any other law enforcement agenciesas may be necessary to effectively conduct the entry, inspection, inventory, and appraisal.A third party locksmith shall also be allowed to enter saidproperty for the purpose of providing the government agents andemployees access as may be necessary to effectively conduct theentry, inspection, and inventory (lc)
July 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03-Related Case- filed. Related Case No: 2:13-cv-01518 CAS. Case transferred from Judge John F. Walter to Judge Christina A. Snyder for all further proceedings. The case number will now reflect the initials of the transferee Judge 2:20-cv-06316 CAS(KSx). Signed by Judge Christina A. Snyder (rn)
July 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER RE TRANSFER PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 19-03 (Related Case) filed. Transfer of case declined by Judge Christina A. Snyder, for the reasons set forth on this order. Related Case No. 2:13-cv-01518 CAS (rn)
July 24, 2020 Filing 14 NOTICE OF RECORDED LIS PENDENS filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Attachment A)(Boyle, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 13 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Writ of of Entry filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Proposed Writ) (Boyle, Daniel)
July 21, 2020 Filing 12 DECLARATION of Dan G. Boyle re: Lead Trial Counsel filed by Plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 11 Notice of Withdrawal of Motion for Order #5 filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 17, 2020 Filing 10 Notice of Appearance or Withdrawal of Counsel: for attorney Michael Raymond Sew Hoy counsel for Plaintiff United States of America. Adding Michael R. Sew Hoy as counsel of record for United States of America for the reason indicated in the G-123 Notice. Filed by plaintiff United States of America. (Sew Hoy, Michael)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STANDING ORDER by Judge John F. Walter. READ THIS ORDER CAREFULLY. IT CONTROLS THE CASE AND DIFFERS IN SOME RESPECTS FROM THE LOCAL RULES. This action has been assigned to the calendar of Judge John F. Walter. (iv)
July 17, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE TO PARTIES OF COURT-DIRECTED ADR PROGRAM filed. (car)
July 17, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge John F. Walter and Magistrate Judge Karen L. Stevenson. (car)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Related Case(s) filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. Related Case(s): No. CV 20-6313; No. CV 20-6314; No. CV 20-6318; No. CV 20-6319; No. CV 20-6320; and No. CV 20-6321 (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 EX PARTE APPLICATION for Order for APPOINTING INTERNAL REVENUE SERVICE AS SUBSTITUTE CUSTODIAN IN PLACE OF THE U.S. MARSHALS SERVICE filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order) (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONFLICT MEMO filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA for the purpose of determining whether the above-referenced civil matter, being filed on July 16, 2020, was pending in the US Attorneys Office before the date on which Judge Andre Birotte, Jr. began receiving civil matters. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Boyle, Daniel)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT No Fee Required - US Government, filed by plaintiff UNITED STATES OF AMERICA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A) (Attorney Daniel G Boyle added to party UNITED STATES OF AMERICA(pty:pla))(Boyle, Daniel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Real Property Located in Los Angeles, California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: REAL PROPERTY LOCATED IN LOS ANGELES, CALIFORNIA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By: Daniel G Boyle
Represented By: Michael Raymond Sew Hoy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Claimant: 8484 Wilshire Blvd, LLC
Represented By: Ronald N Richards
Represented By: Geoffrey S Long
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?