Henry Reynolds v. Andrew Saul
Plaintiff: Henry Reynolds
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Case Number: 2:2020cv06337
Filed: July 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Central District of California
Presiding Judge: Cormac J Carney
Referring Judge: Kenly Kiya Kato
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2020 Filing 9 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed by Plaintiff Henry Reynolds, upon Plaintiff Andrew Saul served on 8/12/2020, answer due 12/10/2020. Service of the Summons and Complaint were executed upon the United States Attorneys Office by delivering a copy to Civil Process Clerk. Executed upon the Attorney Generals Office of the United States by delivering a copy to Civil Clerk. Executed upon the officer agency or corporation by delivering a copy to Civil Clerk. Service was executed in compliance with California Code of Civil Procedure. Due diligence declaration NOT attached. Registered or certified mail return receipt attached. Original Summons NOT returned. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Aghai, Sima)
August 18, 2020 Filing 8 CONSENT TO PROCEED before Magistrate Judge, in accordance with Title 28 Section 636(c) and F.R.CIV.P 73(b), filed by Defendant Andrew Saul. (Attorney Armand D Roth added to party Andrew Saul(pty:dft))(Roth, Armand)
July 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER by Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (iva)
July 16, 2020 Filing 6 60 DAY Summons issued re Complaint #1 as to defendant Andrew Saul. (esa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE OF ASSIGNMENT to District Judge Cormac J. Carney and referred to Magistrate Judge Kenly Kiya Kato. (esa)
July 16, 2020 Filing 4 CERTIFICATE of Interested Parties filed by plaintiff Henry Reynolds, (Aghai, Sima)
July 16, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET filed by Plaintiff Henry Reynolds. (Aghai, Sima)
July 16, 2020 Filing 2 Request for Clerk to Issue Summons on Complaint (Attorney Civil Case Opening) #1 filed by plaintiff Henry Reynolds. (Aghai, Sima)
July 16, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Receipt No: ACACDC-27236252 - Fee: $400, filed by plaintiff Henry Reynolds. (Attorney Sima G Aghai added to party Henry Reynolds(pty:pla))(Aghai, Sima)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Central District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henry Reynolds v. Andrew Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Saul
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-SSA
Represented By: Assistant US Attorney LA-CV
Represented By: Armand D Roth
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Henry Reynolds
Represented By: Sima G Aghai
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?